California Northern District Court
Judge:Donna M Ryu
Referred: Pslc Grc
Case #: 4:23-cv-04795
Nature of Suit555 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Prison Condition
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Sep 19, 2023

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Monday, October 02, 2023
3 3 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Mon 10/02 4:42 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Richard K. Odell.. (msr, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 19, 2023
2 2 oth_evt Notice of Assignment of Prisoner Case to Magistrate Judge Tue 09/19 5:26 PM
Notice of Assignment of Prisoner Case to Magistrate Judge (msr, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
1 1 oth_evt Clerk's Notice re: CDCR Email Filing Violation Tue 09/19 5:26 PM
CLERKS NOTICE: The filer failed to submit this S.1983 complaint through the email procedures required by General Order No. 76. If the filer does not, by the deadline below, either resubmit the documents through the email procedures or file a motion seeking permission to file the complaint by mail, this case will be dismissed without prejudice. Email resubmission deadline: 10/3/2023 (msr, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Complaint,
Att: 2 Envelope,
Att: 3 IFP