California Northern District Court
Judge:Edward J Davila
Case #: 5:23-cv-04818
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Contract Dispute
Case Filed:Sep 19, 2023
Last checked: Sunday Mar 17, 2024 2:24 AM PDT
3rd party defendant
North American Systems International, Inc.
2901 E 78th Street
Bloomington, MN 55425
Represented By
Emilio Romolo Giuliani, III
Maslon LLP
contact info
Terrance C. Newby
Maslon LLP
contact info
Anthony David Phillips
Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani, LLP
contact info
3rd party defendant
Sycomp, a Technology Company
1325 J Street, Suite 1550
Sacramento, CA 95814
Represented By
Genevieve Christine Duran
Carr Mcclellan, P.C.
contact info
John Craig Crawford
Carr Mcclellan P.C.
contact info
3rd party plaintiff
Gen Digital, Inc.
Represented By
Anthony David Phillips
Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani, LLP
contact info
Michael William Stebbins
Silicon Valley Law Group
contact info
Marc George VanNiekerk
Silicon Valley Law Group
contact info
Defendant
Gen Digital, Inc.
Represented By
Michael William Stebbins
Silicon Valley Law Group
contact info
Marc George VanNiekerk
Silicon Valley Law Group
contact info
Plaintiff
DXC Technology Company
Represented By
Cheryl Ann Cauley
Baker Botts L.L.P.
contact info
Karan Singh Dhadialla
Baker Botts
contact info

GPO Mar 13 2024
ORDER RE 49 PARTIES' PROTECTIVE ORDER DISPUTE. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 3/13/2024. (svklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2024)
GPO Jun 07 2024
ORDER GRANTING 18 MOTION TO DISMISS; GRANTING 21 MOTION TO SEVER; DENYING 41 MOTION FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 6/7/2024.(ejdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2024)

Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, December 20, 2024
81 81 misc Stipulation without Proposed Order Fri 12/20 4:43 PM
STIPULATION Joint Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice filed by DXC Technology Company. (Cauley, Cheryl)
Related: [-]