Georgia Northern District Court
Judge:J P Boulee
Case #: 1:23-cv-04145
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:2201 Declaratory Judgment (Insurance)
Case Filed:Sep 14, 2023
Terminated:Jan 04, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Mar 12, 2024 4:37 AM EDT
Defendant
BPV Partners, LLC
Defendant
Sharlice Edwards
Defendant
McDonald's Corporation
Defendant
McDonald's USA, LLC
Defendant
Vineyard Management Corporation
Plaintiff
Main Street America Assurance Company
Represented By
Olivia Brooke Dabbs
Cruser Mitchell Novitz Sanchez Gaston & Zimet LLP
contact info
Craig P. Terrett
Cruser Mitchell Law Firm
contact info


Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Thursday, January 04, 2024
misc Clerks Entry of Dismissal Thu 01/04 9:27 AM
Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING5 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(A)(i) (nmb)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case Thu 01/04 9:28 AM
Civil Case Terminated. (nmb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 03, 2024
5 5 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Wed 01/03 3:14 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Main Street America Assurance Company (Dabbs, Olivia)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 19, 2023
4 4 1 pgs order Order to Show Cause Tue 12/19 2:51 PM
ORDER: No later than 1/2/2024, Plaintiff is ORDERED to show cause why this case should not be dismissed for failure to effectuate service of process in the limits provided by Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4. The Clerk is DIRECTED to submit the case at the expiration of the applicable time period. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 12/19/2023. (nmb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 20, 2023
3 3 30+ pgs order Order Wed 09/20 10:05 AM
STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 9/20/2023. (jkl)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 14, 2023
2 2 service Electronic Summons Issued Tue 09/19 2:57 PM
Electronic Summons Issued as to BPV Partners, LLC, Sharlice Edwards, McDonald's Corporation, McDonald's USA, LLC, & Vineyard Management Corporation. (pdt)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 09/19 2:49 PM
COMPLAINT filed by Main Street America Assurance Company. (Filing fee $402, receipt number AGANDC-12885316) (pdt)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet