Georgia Northern District Court
Judge:Mark H Cohen
Case #: 1:23-cv-04222
Nature of Suit230 Real Property - Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Case Filed:Sep 19, 2023
Terminated:Oct 30, 2023
Last checked: Sunday Mar 17, 2024 5:34 AM EDT
Defendant
Kiara Burt
1700 Diplomat Lane 1700K
Kennesaw, GA 30144
Plaintiff
Star Barrett Lakes, LLC
1800 Barrett Lakes Blvd. NW
Kennesaw, GA 30144


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Friday, November 03, 2023
10 10 2 pgs order Order Fri 11/03 10:21 AM
ORDER denying9 Objections to Report and Recommendation filed by Kiara Burt. Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 11/3/2023. (dob)
Related: [-]
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Fri 11/03 10:22 AM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Kiara Burt re10 Order. (dob)
Related: [-]
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Fri 11/03 10:22 AM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Star Barrett Lakes, LLC re10 Order. (dob)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 02, 2023
9 9 respoth Objections to Report and Recommendation Thu 11/02 12:26 PM
OBJECTIONS and Response to2 Report and Recommendation filed by Kiara Burt. (dob)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 30, 2023
8 8 misc Judgment - Clerk Mon 10/30 11:29 AM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT entered dismissing action without prejudice for want of prosecution. (dob)
Related: [-]
7 7 2 pgs order Order Mon 10/30 11:22 AM
ORDER dismissing action without prejudice for want of prosecution. Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 10/30/2023. (dob)
Related: [-]
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Mon 10/30 11:30 AM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Kiara Burt re8 Clerk's Judgment,7 Order. (dob)
Related: [-]
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Mon 10/30 11:30 AM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Star Barrett Lakes, LLC re8 Clerk's Judgment,7 Order. (dob)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case Mon 10/30 11:31 AM
Civil Case Terminated. (dob)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 11, 2023
6 6 3 pgs order Order Wed 10/11 10:46 AM
ORDER overruling4 Objections to Report and Recommendation filed by Kiara Burt. Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 10/11/2023. (dob)
Related: [-]
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Wed 10/11 10:49 AM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Kiara Burt re6 Order. (dob)
Related: [-]
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Wed 10/11 10:50 AM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Star Barrett Lakes, LLC re6 Order. (dob)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 10, 2023
5 5 2 pgs order Order Tue 10/10 4:33 PM
ORDER vacating the Courts3 Order and this Amended Oder is hereby substituted. Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 10/10/2023. (dob)
Related: [-]
4 4 respoth Objections to Report and Recommendation Tue 10/10 3:06 PM
OBJECTIONS to2 Report and Recommendation filed by Kiara Burt. (dob)
Related: [-]
3 3 2 pgs order Order on Report and Recommendation Order on Application for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Tue 10/10 11:59 AM
VACATED BY ORDER 5 ORDER approving and adopting2 Report and Recommendations; denying1 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. It is further ORDERED that Plaintiff shall be given fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order to pay the required filing fee in this case. Failure to pay the filing fee within that period of time will result in this Court entering an order dismissing this case without prejudice for want of prosecution. Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 10/10/2023. (dob) Modified on 10/10/2023 (dob)
Related: [-]
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Tue 10/10 12:00 PM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Kiara Burt re3 Order on Report and Recommendation,, Order on Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (dob)
Related: [-]
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Tue 10/10 12:01 PM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Star Barrett Lakes, LLC re3 Order on Report and Recommendation,, Order on Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (dob)
Related: [-]
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Tue 10/10 4:35 PM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Kiara Burt re5 Order. (dob)
Related: [-]
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Tue 10/10 4:35 PM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Star Barrett Lakes, LLC re5 Order. (dob)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 03, 2023
utility Submission to District Judge Tue 10/03 12:13 PM
Submission of2 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Kiara Burt to District Judge Mark H. Cohen. (lme)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 19, 2023
2 2 motion Report and Recommendation Tue 09/19 4:25 PM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION recommending1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Kiara Burt be denied and that Defendant be ordered to pay the filing fee within fourteen (14) days from the date the District Judge rules on this recommendation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda T. Walker on 9/19/2023. (dob)
Related: [-]
1 1 motion Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Tue 09/19 3:00 PM
APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Kiara Burt.(dob)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Removal,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Submission to Magistrate Judge Tue 09/19 3:02 PM
Submission of1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (with request for an emergency stay of eviction), to Magistrate Judge Linda T. Walker. (dob)
Related: [-]
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Tue 09/19 4:25 PM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Kiara Burt, Star Barrett Lakes, LLC re2 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Kiara Burt. (dob)
Related: [-]