Indiana Northern District Court
Judge:Damon R Leichty
Referred: Michael G Gotsch, Sr
Case #: 3:23-cv-00858
Nature of Suit864 Social Security - SSID Title XVI
Cause42:205 Denial Social Security Benefits
Case Filed:Sep 19, 2023
Terminated:Nov 16, 2023

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Wednesday, February 28, 2024
15 15 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Attorney Fees Wed 02/28 10:45 AM
ORDER GRANTING13 Motion for Award of Attorney Fees pursuant to Equal Access to Justice Act, 28 U.S.C. section 2412(d) and ORDERING the Commissioner to pay $398.25 in attorney fees and costs under the EAJA. The award belongs to Ms. Clayton and not her attorney and may be offset to satisfy any preexisting debt that Ms. Clayton owes to the United States as outlined. DIRECTING the Commissioner to make the award here payable to Matthew Richter, and any payment by mail should be sent to 2850 N. Meridian Street, Indianapolis, IN 46208. Signed by Judge Damon R Leichty on 2/28/2024. (mrm)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 26, 2024
14 14 respm Response to Motion Mon 02/26 9:33 AM
RESPONSE to Motion re13 First MOTION for Attorney Fees pursuant to Equal Access to Justice Act, 28 U.S.C. section 2412(d) filed by Commissioner of Social Security. (Jeffrey, Keeya)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 15, 2024
13 13 motion Attorney Fees Thu 02/15 5:46 PM
First MOTION for Attorney Fees pursuant to Equal Access to Justice Act, 28 U.S.C. section 2412(d) by Plaintiff Amber R. Clayton.(Richter, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A- Attorney Statement,
Att: 2 Exhibit B-Time Log,
Att: 3 Exhibit C-PPI,
Att: 4 Exhibit D- CPI,
Att: 5 Exhibit E- Controller Affidavit,
Att: 6 Exhibit F- Attorney Bio,
Att: 7 Exhibit G- EAJA Assignment
Friday, November 17, 2023
12 12 misc Clerks Judgment Fri 11/17 2:39 PM
CLERK'S ENTRY OF JUDGMENT. (nhc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 16, 2023
11 11 1 pgs order Order Remanding Case to US Agency Fri 11/17 2:34 PM
ORDER: The court GRANTS the Acting Commissioner's motion for reversal and remand9 , REVERSES the decision under sentence four of 42 U.S.C. § 405(g), and REMANDS the decision for further administrative proceedings. Signed by Judge Damon R Leichty on 11/16/2023. (nhc)
Related: [-]
10 10 misc Mag Consent Forms Sent (SSA - DJ Presider) - form will be generated Thu 11/16 8:14 AM
MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS IN A SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL CASE sent to all parties. Magistrate Consent forms due by 11/30/2023. (slm)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 15, 2023
9 9 motion Remand Wed 11/15 9:15 AM
MOTION to Remand by Defendant Commissioner of Social Security. (Jeffrey, Keeya)
Related: [-]
8 8 ss Social Security Administrative Record Wed 11/15 9:06 AM
SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD by Commissioner of Social Security. (Jeffrey, Keeya)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 11/15 9:00 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Keeya M Jeffrey on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Jeffrey, Keeya)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 02, 2023
6 6 notice Notice of Commencement of SSA Action Mon 10/02 10:09 AM
Notice of Commencement of Social Security Appeal action (1 Complaint) sent to the Commissioner of Social Security. Commissioner of Social Security Answer or Motion due 12/1/2023. Pursuant to General Order #2022-20, the briefing schedule is as follows: The plaintiff's opening brief must be filed within 42 days after the answer is filed or 42 days after entry of an order disposing of the last remaining motion under Rule 4(c) of the Supplemental Rules, whichever is later. The Commissioner's response brief must be filed 42 days after service of the opening brief. Any reply brief must be filed 14 days after service of the response brief. (ash)
Related: [-]
5 5 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Mon 10/02 10:08 AM
ORDER: The Court GRANTS2 the in forma pauperis motion2 ; WAIVES the filing fee; and DIRECTS the Clerk to docket a notice of commencement of social security appeal action. Signed by Judge Damon R Leichty on 10/2/2023. (ash)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 20, 2023
utility Add and Terminate Judges Wed 09/20 7:41 AM
Judge Damon R Leichty and Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr added. ***NEW CASE, IFP MOTION PENDING*** (jld)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 19, 2023
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 09/19 9:05 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas T Lavella on behalf of Amber R. Clayton (Lavella, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 09/19 8:59 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew F Richter on behalf of Amber R. Clayton (Richter, Matthew)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Tue 09/19 8:55 PM
First MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Amber R. Clayton. (Richter, Matthew)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 09/19 8:52 PM
COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Amber R. Clayton.(Richter, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet