California Northern District Court
Judge:Charles R Breyer
Case #: 3:23-cv-04677
Nature of Suit465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions
Cause05:551 Administrative Procedure Act
Case Filed:Sep 12, 2023
Terminated:Dec 06, 2023
Last checked: Sunday Mar 10, 2024 4:12 AM PDT
Defendant
U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services
Represented By
Lauren Fascett
Us Dept. Of Justice
contact info
Defendant
U.S. Department of Homeland Security
Represented By
Lauren Fascett
Us Dept. Of Justice
contact info
Plaintiff
Yuliya Kirhizava
Represented By
Zachary Miller Nightingale
Van Der Hout, Brigagliano & Nightingale, LLP
contact info
Zachary Nightingale
Van Der Hout, Brigagliano & Nightingale, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Tuesday, December 05, 2023
16 16 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Tue 12/05 3:58 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Yuliya Kirhizava (Nightingale, Zachary)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 27, 2023
15 15 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Fri 10/27 11:53 AM
ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer: Granting 14 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. (ls, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 26, 2023
14 14 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Thu 10/26 11:56 AM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint, filed by U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security. (Fascett, Lauren)
Related: [-]
13 13 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 10/26 11:50 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Lauren Fascett for Defendants (Fascett, Lauren)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 20, 2023
12 12 service Certificate/Proof of Service Wed 09/20 9:50 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Yuliya Kirhizava re7 Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge,1 Complaint,10 Case Assigned/Reassigned,6 Summons Issued as to USA,5 Immigration Mandamus Case Procedural Order,3 Civil Cover Sheet (Nightingale, Zachary)
Related: [-]
11 11 service Summons Returned Executed as to USA Wed 09/20 9:27 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Yuliya Kirhizava. U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services served on 9/19/2023, answer due 11/20/2023; U.S. Department of Homeland Security served on 9/19/2023, answer due 11/20/2023. (Nightingale, Zachary)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 19, 2023
10 10 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 09/19 8:51 AM
Case REASSIGNED to Judge Charles R. Breyer for all further proceedings. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins no longer assigned to case. (bw, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording
9 9 utility ~Util - Notice Assigning/ Reassigning Case (CRJ) Tue 09/19 8:40 AM
This case will be randomly reassigned to a District Judge outside the San Jose Division pursuant to the Caseload Rebalancing Pilot Program approved by the Court effective March 1, 2018. For information, visit our web page at[LINK:https://cand.uscourts.gov/notices/northern-district-extends-caseload-rebalancing-pilot-program/] . (bw, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 18, 2023
8 8 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (lmh, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
7 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Yuliya Kirhizava.. (Nightingale, Zachary)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 14, 2023
6 6 Summons Issued as to U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (kmg, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
5 5 Immigration Mandamus Case Procedural Order. (kmg, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 12, 2023
4 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/26/2023. (as, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
3 3 Civil Cover Sheet by Yuliya Kirhizava . (Nightingale, Zachary)
Related: [-]
2 2 Proposed Summons. (Nightingale, Zachary)
Related: [-]
1 1 PETITION FOR REVIEW UNDER THE ADMINISTRATIVE PROCEDURE ACT - COMPLAINT against U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-18635821.). Filed by Yuliya Kirhizava. (Nightingale, Zachary) Modified on 9/14/2023 (kmg, COURT STAFF). Modified on 9/14/2023 (kmg, COURT STAFF).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet
[LINK:Electronic filing error] . Civil Cover Sheet Nature of suit should be under immigration. Refile corrected civil cover sheet. No judge assignment will be made until the document is e-filed. Submit your document using Civil Events > Other Filings > Other Documents > Civil Cover SheetThis filing will not be processed by the clerks office. Re:1 Complaint, filed by Yuliya Kirhizava (as, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]