California Northern District Court
Judge:Donna M Ryu
Case #: 4:23-cv-04789
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1442 Petition for Removal
Case Filed:Sep 18, 2023
Terminated:Oct 10, 2023
Case in other court:Sonoma County Superior Court, 23CV00035
Last checked: Saturday Mar 16, 2024 2:50 AM PDT
Defendant
Ronald Combs
Represented By
Sapna S. Mehta
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info
Plaintiff
Kesoihlen Katherine Laura Henriksen
34 Grand View Ave
Camp Meeker, CA 95419


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Tuesday, October 10, 2023
10 10 misc Stipulation without Proposed Order Tue 10/10 12:13 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice filed by Ronald Combs. (Mehta, Sapna)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 03, 2023
9 9 oth_evt Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination Tue 10/03 12:07 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendant has filed a Motion to Dismiss and a hearing has been scheduled for 12/14/2023 01:00 PM. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. section 636, the magistrate judge cannot decide this motion unless all parties consent to proceed before Judge Donna M. Ryu. Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at:[LINK:http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms] . Consent/Declination due by 10/10/2023. (ig, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 25, 2023
8 8 oth_evt Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination Mon 09/25 6:42 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF Re: Consent or Declination: Defendant has filed a Motion to Dismiss and a hearing has been scheduled for 12/14/2023 01:00 PM. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. section 636, the magistrate judge cannot decide this motion unless all parties consent to proceed before Judge Donna M. Ryu. Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at:[LINK:http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms] . Consent/Declination due by 10/2/2023. (ig, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
7 7 motion Dismiss Mon 09/25 5:01 PM
MOTION to Dismiss filed by Ronald Combs. Motion Hearing set for 12/14/2023 01:00 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Responses due by 10/12/2023. Replies due by 10/19/2023.(Mehta, Sapna)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Certificate/Proof of Service
6 6 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Mon 09/25 4:54 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Ronald Combs.. (Mehta, Sapna)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 19, 2023
5 5 order Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines Tue 09/19 10:31 AM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 12/13/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/20/2023 01:30 PM. (mcl, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Certificate/Proof of Service Tue 09/19 9:54 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ronald Combs re 3 Case Assigned by Intake, and initiating documents. (Mehta, Sapna) Modified on 9/19/2023 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
Related: [-]
3 3 utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Tue 09/19 8:44 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 10/3/2023. (as, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 18, 2023
2 2 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ronald Combs re1 Notice of Removal (Mehta, Sapna)
Related: [-]
1 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Sonoma County Superior Court. Their case number is 23CV00035. (). Filed byRonald Combs.(Mehta, Sapna)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet