Canonico v. State of Nevada et al
Nevada District Court | |
Judge: | Cristina D Silva |
Referred: | Maximiliano D Couvillier, III |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-01460 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State) |
Case Filed: | Sep 18, 2023 |
Terminated: | Jun 04, 2024 |
Last checked: Saturday Mar 16, 2024 3:14 AM PDT |
Defendant
The Attorney General of the State of Nevada
|
|
Defendant
Brian Williams
|
|
Plaintiff
Steven Canonico
1056270 High Desert State Prison PO Box 650
Indian Springs, NV 89070 |
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Judge Joe Hardy
Terminated: 12/15/2023
|
|
Defendant
State of Nevada
Terminated: 12/15/2023
|
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Tuesday, October 08, 2024 | ||
19 | 19
![]() ORDER granting18 Motion for Copies. The Clerk of Court is directed to send the following copies to petitioner: Amended Petition (ECF No.8 ), Docket Sheet, This Court's form 28 U.S.C. § 2254 habeas corpus petition. (ATTACHED HERETO FOR DISTRIBUTION TO PLAINTIFF VIA LAW LIBRARY). Signed by Judge Cristina D. Silva on 10/8/2024.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DLS) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Wednesday, June 26, 2024 | ||
18 | 18
![]() MOTION for Copies by Plaintiff Steven Canonico. Responses due by 7/10/2024. (CAH) |
|
Tuesday, June 04, 2024 | ||
17 | 17
![]() JUDGMENT in favor of Defendants, The Attorney General of the State of Nevada, Brian Williams, and against Plaintiff, Steven Canonico. Signed by Clerk of Court Debra K. Kempi on 6/4/2024. ( For Distribution by law library. )(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ALZ) |
|
16 | 16
![]() ORDER DISMISSING CASE. It is therefore ordered that the8 petition is dismissed without prejudice as set forth in this order. It is further ordered that a certificate of appealability is denied. The Clerk of Court is kindly instructed to enter judgment accordingly and close this case. Signed by Judge Cristina D. Silva on 6/4/2024. ( For Distribution by law library. )(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ALZ) |
|
Monday, May 06, 2024 | ||
15 | 15
![]() RESPONSE to14 Order to Show Cause by Plaintiff Steven Canonico. (CAH) |
|
Tuesday, April 30, 2024 | ||
14 | 14
![]() ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE granting11 Motion to Strike. It is further ordered that the Clerk of Court is directed to electronically serve the petition ECF No.8 on respondents and add Aaron D. Ford, Nevada Attorney General, as counsel for respondents. Pending further orders, respondents are not required to formally appear in this case or respond to the petition. It is further ordered that the Clerk of Court provide respondents an electronic copy of all items previously filed in this case by regenerating the Notice of Electronic Filing to the office of the AG only. It is further ordered that Canonico has until May 30, 2024 to show cause why his petition should not be dismissed without prejudice as unexhausted and premature. Failure to respond within the time allowed or show good cause for an extension will result in dismissal withoutprejudice and without further prior notice.It is further ordered that all assertions of fact made by Canonico in response to this show cause order must be detailed, must be specific as to time and place, and must be supported by competent evidence. Canonico should attach copies of all materials upon which he bases his argument that his petition should not be dismissed as unexhausted and premature. It is further ordered that petitioners motion for complete summary update12 is denied as moot. Signed by Judge Cristina D. Silva on 4/30/2024. ( For Distribution by law library. )(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CAH) |
|
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
![]() LETTER from Steven Canonico re12 Motion. (CAH) |
|
Monday, March 25, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
![]() MOTION for Complete Summary Update by Plaintiff Steven Canonico. Responses due by 4/8/2024. (CT) |
|
Tuesday, January 23, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
![]() ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that, plaintiff shall file a notice by March 22, 2024, indicating whether he: (1) wishes to pursue his § 1983 civil rights complaint 1-1 and strike his habeas petition8 in this case; or (2) strike his § 1983 civil rights complaint 1-1 and pursue his habeas petition in this case. If plaintiff decides to pursue the civil rights case, then he shall also file both a financial certificate on this Courts approved form and an inmate account statement for the past six months. It is FURTHER ORDERED that, if plaintiff fails to file a fully complete application to proceed in forma pauperis by the deadline, the Court will recommend dismissing this case without prejudice. It is FURTHER ORDERED that, if plaintiff fails to comply with this order and timely inform the Court whether he is pursuing his § 1983 civil rights complaint or habeas petition in this case, the Court will dismiss the entire case without prejudice because plaintiff cannot pursue both actions simultaneously in the same case. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court will send plaintiff courtesy copies of (1) its previous order6 ; (2) this Courts approved application to proceed in forma pauperis for prisoners; and (3) the docket sheet. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maximiliano D. Couvillier, III on 1/23/2024.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CAH) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Monday, January 08, 2024 | ||
notice
MDC - Clerks Notice Reassign Judge
Mon 01/08 3:00 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE that due to the retirement of Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach, this case is reassigned to Magistrate Judge Maximiliano D. Couvillier, III for all further proceedings. All further documents must bear the correct case number 2:23-cv-01460-CDS-MDC . (no image attached) (LG) |
||
Thursday, December 14, 2023 | ||
8 | 8
![]() AMENDED PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Steven Canonico. Adds and removes parties. (CAH) |
|
Monday, November 13, 2023 | ||
7 | 7
![]() Certified Copy of the Trust Fund Account by Steven Canonico re6 Order. (CAH) |
|
Wednesday, November 01, 2023 | ||
6 | 6
![]() ORDER granting ECF No.5 Motion to Extend Time. Plaintiff has until Friday, December 1, 2023 , to either (1) submit a certified copy of the trust fund account or (2) pay the full fee for filing a civil action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 11/1/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DLS) |
|
Monday, October 23, 2023 | ||
5 | 5
![]() MOTION to Extend Time (First Request) re4 Order on Motion/Application to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Steven Canonico. Responses due by 11/6/2023. (CT) (amend) |
|
Thursday, September 21, 2023 | ||
4 | 4
![]() ORDER - I ORDER that plaintiff Canonico's application to proceed in forma pauperis (ECF No.1 ) is DENIED without prejudice. I FURTHER ORDER that by Monday, October 23, 2023 , plaintiff must either (1) submit a certified copy of the trust fund account or (2) plaintiff must pay the full fee for filing a civil action. (Payment of filing fees due 10/23/2023.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 9/21/2023.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CJS) |
|
Monday, September 18, 2023 | ||
3 | 3
![]() ADVISORY LETTER to litigant. (KF) |
|
2 | 2
![]() CLERK'S NOTICE. Electronic filing of prisoner filings in civil rights cases at High Desert State Prison is now mandatory under General Order 2012-01. (KF) |
|
1 | 1
![]() MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Steven Canonico.(KF) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |