Nevada District Court
Judge:Miranda M Du
Referred: Elayna J Youchah
Case #: 2:23-cv-01462
Nature of Suit530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General
Cause28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Case Filed:Sep 18, 2023
Terminated:Apr 03, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 20, 2023 9:46 PM PDT
Petitioner
Derrick Cranford
High Desert State Prison PO Box 650
Indian Springs, NV 89070
Represented By
Law Library - High Desert State Prison
contact info
Respondent
The Attorney General of the State of Nevada
Respondent
Warden Williams


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Thursday, April 04, 2024
9 9 order Judgment Thu 04/04 11:00 AM
JUDGMENT in favor of The Attorney General of the State of Nevada, Warden Williams against Derrick Cranford. Signed by Clerk of Court Debra K. Kempi on 4/4/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CT)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 03, 2024
8 8 3 pgs order Order on Motion for Appointment of Counsel Order Dismissing Case Thu 04/04 10:51 AM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE without Prejudice. ORDER denying4 Motion for Appointment of Counsel as MOOT. It is further ordered that a certificate of appealability is denied as jurists of reason would not find the Courts dismissal of the petition to be debatable or wrong. The Clerk of Court is directed to enter final judgment accordingly and close this case. See order for further details. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 4/3/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CT)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 14, 2023
7 7 3 pgs order Order Thu 12/14 11:40 AM
ORDER - It is therefore ordered that Petitioner must file within 45 days of the date of this order a "Response to Order to Show Cause," in writing, showing cause why this action should not be dismissed without prejudice based on his failure to exhaust his claims in Nevada courts. Show Cause Response due by 1/28/2024 . Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 12/14/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DLS)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 21, 2023
6 6 misc Receipt Payment Wed 11/22 9:43 AM
RECEIPT of Payment: $ 5, receipt number 200006657 (CAH)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 03, 2023
5 5 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Appointment of Counsel Wed 10/04 9:39 AM
ORDER - It is therefore ordered that the initial screening of the Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (ECF No.1 -1) under the Rules Governing Section 2254 Cases as well as consideration of Petitioner's Motion to Appoint Public Federal Attorney (ECF No.4 ) is deferred to until such time as he has fully complied with this order. The Clerk of Court is instructed to send Petitioner a blank form IFP application for incarcerated litigants, along with instructions, and a copy of this order. (ATTACHED HERETO FOR DISTRIBUTION TO P VIA HDSP LAW LIBRARY) . It is further ordered that, within 45 days of the date of this order (11/17/2023) , Petitioner must file an IFP application or pay the $5 filing fee. If Petitioner decides to pay the filing fee from his inmate account, he must arrange to have a copy of this order attached to the check for the filing fee. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 10/3/2023.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DLS)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2nd Copy of Order,
Att: 2 Inmate IFP form and Instructions
Monday, September 25, 2023
4 4 motion Motion Appointment of Counsel Mon 09/25 2:45 PM
MOTION to Appoint Public Federal Attorney , by Petitioner Derrick Cranford. (DLS)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 20, 2023
3 3 notice Notice Other Wed 09/20 10:48 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE. Electronic filing of prisoner filings in civil rights cases at High Desert State Prison is now mandatory under General Order 2012-01. (KF)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 18, 2023
2 2 notice Advisory Letter Habeas only - FORM Wed 09/20 10:46 AM
NOTICE from USDC advising case against Warden Williams and The Attorney General of the State of Nevada, et al., has been received and assigned case number 2:23-cv-01462-MMD-EJY . (KF)
Related: [-]
1 1 misc Receipt Initiating Documents Wed 09/20 10:45 AM
RECEIPT of Initiating Documents by Court on behalf of Petitioner. No Application to Proceed IFP or Filing Fee received. (KF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Petition for a Writ of Habeas Corpus