Indiana Northern District Court
Judge:Damon R Leichty
Referred: Scott J Frankel
Case #: 3:23-cv-00860
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause15:2301 Magnuson-Moss Warranty Act
Case Filed:Sep 20, 2023
Terminated:Jan 07, 2025
Last checked: Monday Mar 18, 2024 4:24 AM EDT
Defendant
Grand Design RV, LLC
Represented By
Hans HJ Pijls
Dinsmore & Shohl Llp - Aa/mi
contact info
Plaintiff
John Semerau
Represented By
Richard C Dalton
Richard C Dalton LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Tuesday, January 07, 2025
20 20 order Order Dismissing Case ~Util - Terminate Motions Terminate Civil Case Tue 01/07 12:53 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice pursuant to19 Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss. Parties to bear their own costs.18 Motion to Enforce Settlement is MOOT. Text-only order by Judge Damon R Leichty on 1/7/25. (dnj)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 06, 2025
19 19 motion Stipulation to Dismiss Mon 01/06 8:46 AM
Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss by Defendant Grand Design RV, LLC. (Pijls, Hans)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 02, 2025
18 18 motion Miscellaneous Relief Thu 01/02 4:14 PM
MOTION Motion to Enforce Settlement by Defendant Grand Design RV, LLC.(Pijls, Hans)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4
Thursday, December 19, 2024
17 17 order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Thu 12/19 4:57 PM
ORDER: The deadline for the parties to submit dismissal documents is enlarged to 1/6/2025. Text entry order by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 12/19/2024. (ers)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 06, 2024
16 16 order Order 1 - Terminate Hearings ~Util - Set Deadlines Wed 11/06 10:01 AM
ORDER: Upon being advised by counsel that parties have reached a comprehensive settlement agreement, the Court VACATES the Zoom Settlement Conference for November 7, 2024; Parties shall file dismissal documents no later than 12/20/24. Text entry order by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 11/6/2024. (ers)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 23, 2024
utility Set/Reset Hearings Wed 10/23 12:04 PM
Set/Reset Hearings: Settlement Conference set for 11/7/2024 10:00 AM in US District Court - South Bend before Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch Sr. (ers)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 13, 2024
15 15 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 08/13 10:11 PM
Pursuant to General Order 2024-22 and the retirement of Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr., this case is now reassigned to Magistrate Judge Scott J Frankel. (ksc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 23, 2024
14 14 minutes Scheduling Conference Thu 05/23 3:43 PM
SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held on 5/23/2024 before Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr. Pla appeared by atty Dalton. Dft appeared by atty Pils. Confidential Settlement Report due by 10/28/2024. Settlement Conference set for 11/7/2024 10:00 AM in US District Court - South Bend before Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch Sr. (slm)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 03, 2024
13 13 notice Notice of Hearing/Deadlines Fri 05/03 8:05 AM
NOTICE of Hearings: Telephonic Scheduling Conference to select a date to conduct a judicial settlement conference set for 5/23/2024 11:00 AM in US District Court - South Bend before Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch Sr. To connect to the conference, parties should dial 833-568-8864, enter meeting ID number 160 4237 7854#, push # to skip entry of a participant ID and enter passcode 356255# at least five minutes before the conference start time.(slm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 26, 2024
12 12 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 03/26 2:32 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Grand Design RV, LLC. (Pijls, Hans)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 22, 2024
11 11 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Mon 03/25 5:11 PM
ORDER: Grand Design is ORDERED to file a fully compliant corporate disclosure statement on or before 4/5/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 3/22/24. (nhc)
Related: [-]
10 10 order 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Scheduling Order Mon 03/25 4:19 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: The Court ADOPTS in part by reference, Pre-Discovery Disclosures to be exchanged by 5/24/2024. The last date for the parties to amend the pleadings without leave of court is 6/10/2024. The serving of reports from retained experts under Rule 26(a)(2) are due from plaintiff(s) by 12/13/2024 and from defendant(s) by 1/17/2025. The last date for the completion of ALL DISCOVERY is 6/6/2025. The deadline to file any discovery-related non- dispositive motion is 5/9/2025. The deadline to file any dispositive motions is 7/7/2025. The parties are authorized to mediate until 6/20/2025. The Court VACATES the Preliminary Pretrial Conference scheduled for April 4, 2024, at 10:30 a.m. EDT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 3/22/2024. (rmf)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 20, 2024
9 9 misc Report of Rule 26f Planning Meeting Wed 03/20 4:06 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Pijls, Hans)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 04, 2024
8 8 misc Mag Consent Forms Sent - Standard with pptc - form will be generated Mon 03/04 1:28 PM
MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties.. (slm)
Related: [-]
7 7 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Mon 03/04 1:28 PM
ORDER, Joint Proposed Discovery due by 3/20/2024. Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 4/4/2024 10:30 AM in US District Court - South Bend before Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch Sr.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 3/4/24. (slm)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 15, 2024
5 5 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 02/15 11:33 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Grand Design RV, LLC. (Pijls, Hans)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 13, 2024
4 4 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 02/13 4:43 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint by Grand Design RV, LLC.(Pijls, Hans)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 02, 2023
3 3 order Order Mon 10/02 5:12 PM
ORDER: The court proceeds under federal question jurisdiction through the Magnuson-Moss Warranty Act because the complaint pleads diversity insufficiently. Text-only order by Judge Damon R Leichty on 10/2/23. (dk)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 21, 2023
2 2 service Summons Issued Thu 09/21 9:12 AM
Summons Issued as to Grand Design RV, LLC. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (jdb)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Thu 09/21 9:03 AM
***NEW CASE*** Judge Damon R Leichty and Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr added. (jdb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 20, 2023
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 09/20 9:28 AM
COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Grand Design RV, LLC( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AINNDC-5358928.), filed by John Semerau.(Dalton, Richard)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Proposed Summons