California Northern District Court
Judge:Virginia K Demarchi
Case #: 5:23-cv-04820
Nature of Suit465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions
Cause08:1329 Writ of Mandamus to Adjudicate Visa Petition
Case Filed:Sep 20, 2023
Terminated:Oct 24, 2023
Last checked: Monday Mar 18, 2024 1:15 AM PDT
Defendant
Antony Blinken
Defendant
Jim DeHart
Defendant
Marybeth Turner
Plaintiff
Weijie Ju
Represented By
Joshua L. Goldstein
Goldstein Immigration Lawyers
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Tuesday, October 24, 2023
8 8 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Tue 10/24 8:10 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Weijie Ju (Goldstein, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 03, 2023
7 7 service Summons Returned Executed as to USA Tue 10/03 10:12 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Weijie Ju. Antony Blinken served on 10/2/2023, answer due 12/1/2023; Jim DeHart served on 10/2/2023, answer due 12/1/2023; Marybeth Turner served on 10/2/2023, answer due 12/1/2023. (Goldstein, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 25, 2023
6 6 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Mon 09/25 10:09 AM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Weijie Ju.. (Goldstein, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 21, 2023
5 5 service Summons Issued as to USA Thu 09/21 3:32 PM
Summons Issued as to Antony Blinken, Jim DeHart, Marybeth Turner, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (slh, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
4 4 order Immigration Mandamus Case Procedural Order Thu 09/21 3:27 PM
Immigration Mandamus Case Procedural Order. (slh, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 20, 2023
3 3 utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Wed 09/20 9:12 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 10/4/2023. (ark, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Proposed Summons Wed 09/20 8:33 AM
Proposed Summons. (Goldstein, Joshua)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Petition for Writ of Mandamus Wed 09/20 8:31 AM
PETITION for Writ of Mandamus (Filing fee $402 receipt number ACANDC-18660641). Filed byWeijie Ju.(Goldstein, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet