California Northern District Court
Judge:Peter H Kang
Case #: 3:23-mc-80236
Nature of Suit871 Federal Tax Suits - IRS-Third Party 26 USC 7609
Cause26:7609 IRS: Petition to Quash IRS Summons
Case Filed:Sep 20, 2023

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Monday, October 02, 2023
6 6 notice Notice (Other) Mon 10/02 9:33 AM
NOTICE by Larry T. James OF SERVING PETITION AND ORDERS REQUIRED BY THE COURT (Hufnagel, Robert)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Mon 10/02 9:29 AM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Larry T. James.. (Hufnagel, Robert)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 26, 2023
4 4 oth_evt Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination Tue 09/26 4:55 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs/Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at:[LINK:http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms] . (Party/parties were also notified via telephone or email.) Consent/Declination due by 10/10/2023. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jaf, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
3 3 3 pgs order Order Tue 09/26 3:43 PM
ORDER SETTING DEADLINES RE SERVICE AND CONSENT . Signed by Judge Peter H. Kang on 09/26/23. (phklc2, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 20, 2023
2 2 utility ~Util - Miscellaneous Case Assigned by Intake Wed 09/20 12:49 PM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Peter H Kang. (as, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Petition (Miscellaneous Case Opening) Wed 09/20 12:00 PM
PETITION TO QUASH THIRD PARTY SUMMONS ISSUED TO U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION BY THE INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE; DECLARATIONS OF LARRY T. JAMES AND PHILIP J. JEHLE against INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE., UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ( Filing fee $ 49, receipt number ACANDC-18662093.). Filed by LARRY T. JAMES.(Hufnagel, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Case Coversheet