Nevada District Court
Judge:Cristina D Silva
Referred: Nancy J Koppe
Case #: 2:23-cv-01465
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Sep 18, 2023
Terminated:May 10, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Mar 16, 2024 3:14 AM PDT
Defendant
State of Nevada
Plaintiff
Melvin David Smith Jr.
1974300 Clark County Detention Center 330 South Casino Center
Las Vegas, NV 89101


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Wednesday, May 22, 2024
9 9 misc Mail Returned Wed 05/22 4:11 PM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable re8 Order on Report and Recommendation addressed to Melvin David Smith Jr. (CAH)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 10, 2024
8 8 2 pgs order Order on Report and Recommendation ~Util - Terminate Case Fri 05/10 1:35 PM
ORDER adopting7 Report and Recommendation in full. This case is dismissed without prejudice. The Clerk of Court is kindly directed to close this case. Signed by Judge Cristina D. Silva on 5/10/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CAH)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 24, 2024
7 7 motion Report and Recommendation Wed 04/24 3:23 PM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. Accordingly, in light of the circumstances outlined above, the undersigned RECOMMENDS that this case be DISMISSED without prejudice. Objections to R&R due by 5/8/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 4/24/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CAH)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 01, 2024
6 6 misc Mail Returned Tue 04/02 11:32 AM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable re5 Order, addressed to Melvin David Smith Jr. (CAH)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 25, 2024
5 5 1 pgs order Order Mon 03/25 3:34 PM
ORDER. Accordingly, Plaintiff is hereby ORDERED to file his updated address with the Court no later than April 22, 2024. FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH THIS ORDER MAY RESULT IN DISMISSAL OF THIS CASE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 3/25/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CAH)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 21, 2024
4 4 misc Mail Returned Fri 03/22 8:07 AM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable re3 Order, addressed to Melvin David Smith Jr. Note: Unable to forward. (MAM)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 12, 2024
3 3 1 pgs order Order Tue 03/12 4:09 PM
ORDER. IT IS ORDERED Plaintiff must either make the necessary arrangements to pay the filing fee, accompanied by a copy of this order, or file a complete application to proceed in forma pauperis, including an inmate account statement for the past six months and a properly executed financial certificate. The Clerk of the Court is instructed to send Plaintiff the approved form application to proceed in forma pauperis by a prisoner, as well as the document entitled information and instructions for filing an in forma pauperis application. Plaintiff must comply with this order no later than May 7, 2024. Failure to comply will result in a recommendation to the District Judge that this case be dismissed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 3/12/2024.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CAH)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 IFP Packet mailed to Plaintiff
Thursday, September 21, 2023
2 2 notice Advisory Letter Pro Se non-habeas Thu 09/21 10:37 AM
ADVISORY LETTER to litigant. (CAH)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 18, 2023
1 1 misc Receipt Initiating Documents Wed 09/20 9:49 AM
RECEIPT of Initiating Documents by Court on behalf of Plaintiff. No Application to Proceed IFP or Filing Fee received. (CAH)
Related: [-]