Member Case
Lead case is: 1:23-bk-43364

New York Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Nancy Hershey Lord
Case #: 1:23-bk-43369
Case Filed:Sep 20, 2023

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$1,000,001 to $10 million
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Single Asset Real Estate
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
146 Diamond LLC
146 Diamond Street
Brooklyn, NY 11222
Represented By
Vincent M Lentini
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee
Eastern District of NY (Brooklyn) Alexander Hamilton Custom House One Bowling Green Room 510
New York, NY 10004


Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Tuesday, August 20, 2024
38 38 misc Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report UST Form 11-MOR Tue 08/20 9:08 AM
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for Case Number 23-43369 for the Month Ending: 07/31/2024 Filed by Vincent M Lentini on behalf of 146 Diamond LLC (Lentini, Vincent)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 bank acct
Wednesday, July 24, 2024
37 37 misc Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report UST Form 11-MOR Wed 07/24 12:33 PM
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for the Month Ending: 04/30/2024 Filed by Vincent M Lentini on behalf of 146 Diamond LLC (Lentini, Vincent)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 statement
Tuesday, July 16, 2024
36 36 misc Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report UST Form 11-MOR Tue 07/16 12:16 PM
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for the Month Ending: 06/30/2024 Filed by Vincent M Lentini on behalf of 146 Diamond LLC (Lentini, Vincent)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 statement
35 35 misc Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report UST Form 11-MOR Tue 07/16 12:14 PM
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for Case Number 05/30/2024 for the Month Ending: 05/30/2024 Filed by Vincent M Lentini on behalf of 146 Diamond LLC (Lentini, Vincent)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 statement
Friday, May 24, 2024
34 34 misc Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report UST Form 11-MOR Fri 05/24 9:51 AM
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for Case Number 23-43369 for the Month Ending: 04/30/2024 Filed by Vincent M Lentini on behalf of 146 Diamond LLC (Lentini, Vincent)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 bank statement
Tuesday, April 23, 2024
33 33 misc Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report UST Form 11-MOR Tue 04/23 9:52 AM
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for Case Number 23-43369 for the Month Ending: 03/31/2024 Filed by Vincent M Lentini on behalf of 146 Diamond LLC (Lentini, Vincent)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 bank statement
32 32 misc Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report UST Form 11-MOR Tue 04/23 9:51 AM
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for Case Number 23-43369 for the Month Ending: 02/29/2024 Filed by Vincent M Lentini on behalf of 146 Diamond LLC (Lentini, Vincent)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 bank statement
Monday, March 04, 2024
31 31 misc Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report UST Form 11-MOR Mon 03/04 1:59 PM
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for Case Number 23-43369 for the Month Ending: 1/31/2024 Filed by Vincent M Lentini on behalf of 146 Diamond LLC (Lentini, Vincent)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 statement
30 30 misc Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report UST Form 11-MOR Mon 03/04 1:48 PM
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for Case Number 23-43369 for the Month Ending: 12/31/2023 Filed by Vincent M Lentini on behalf of 146 Diamond LLC (Lentini, Vincent)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 stat
Wednesday, January 24, 2024
29 29 notice Notice of Change of Debtor's Address Wed 01/24 12:53 PM
Notice of Change of Debtor's Address of Bernard Sobus from 146 Diamond Street Brooklyn NY 11222 to 273 Russsell Street Brooklyn NY 112222 Filed by Vincent M Lentini on behalf of 146 Diamond LLC (Lentini, Vincent)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 08, 2023
28 28 court BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice of Consolidation and Amend Caption Thu 11/09 12:12 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice of Consolidation and Amend Caption Notice Date 11/08/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Sunday, November 05, 2023
27 27 order Joint Administration Mon 11/06 11:06 AM
Order Granting Motion For Joint Administration on Lead Case: 23-43364 NHL 330 Calyer LLC with Member Cases: 23-43365 NHL Simple Elegant Realty LLC; 23-43367 NHL 313 Eckford LLC; 23-43369 NHL 146 Diamond LLC Related [+] Signed on 11/5/2023. (jag)
Related: [-] 16
court Entry Mon 11/06 11:07 AM
An Order has been entered in this case under Rule 1015(b) of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure directing the procedural consolidation and the joint administration of the Chapter 11 cases of 330 Calyer LLC, Simple Elegant Realty LLC, 313 Eckford LLC, and 146 Diamond LLC for administrative purposes only. All further pleadings and other papers shall be filed in, and all further docket entries shall be made in, the docket of 330 Calyer LLC, Case No. 23-43364 nhl and such docket should be consulted for all matters affecting this Chapter 11 case. (jag)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 31, 2023
26 26 misc Affidavit Tue 10/31 5:20 PM
Affidavit Re: Filed by Vincent M Lentini on behalf of 146 Diamond LLC Related [+] (Lentini, Vincent)
Related: [-] 22 Application to Employ filed by Debtor 146 Diamond LLC
Thursday, October 26, 2023
25 25 misc Statement Thu 10/26 11:50 AM
Statement Filed by Vincent M Lentini on behalf of 146 Diamond LLC Related [+] (Lentini, Vincent)
Related: [-] 22 Application to Employ filed by Debtor 146 Diamond LLC
Wednesday, October 25, 2023
24 24 misc Affidavit Wed 10/25 7:40 PM
Affidavit Re: Filed by Vincent M Lentini on behalf of 146 Diamond LLC Related [+] (Lentini, Vincent)
Related: [-] 22 Application to Employ filed by Debtor 146 Diamond LLC
23 23 misc Pre-Petition Statement Pursuant to E.D.N.Y LBR 2017-1 Wed 10/25 7:27 PM
Pre-Petition Statement Pursuant to E.D.N.Y LBR 2017-1 Filed by Vincent M Lentini on behalf of 146 Diamond LLC (Lentini, Vincent)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 24, 2023
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Held (Document BK & AP) Wed 11/01 10:18 AM
Hearing Held; Appearances: Vincent M. Lentini (Counsel to Debtors), Jeremy S. Sussman (Office of the US Trustee), Christopher D. Palmieri (Counsel to Humboldt Industrial, LLC); No Objection; Motion Granted; Submit Order. Related [+] (AngelaHoward)
Related: [-] 16 Motion for Joint Administration filed by 146 Diamond LLC
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Held (Case Owned BK) Wed 11/01 10:19 AM
Initial Case Management Hearing Held; Appearances: Vincent M. Lentini (Counsel to Debtors), Jeremy S. Sussman (Office of the US Trustee), Christopher D. Palmieri (Counsel to Humboldt Industrial, LLC); Marked Off. Related [+] (AngelaHoward)
Related: [-] 6 Order Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference
Saturday, October 14, 2023
22 22 motion Employ (Application) Sat 10/14 9:31 PM
Application to Employ Vincent M. Lentini as attorney . Objections to be filed on 11/6/2023. Filed by Vincent M Lentini on behalf of 146 Diamond LLC. Order to be presented for signature on 11/13/2023. (Lentini, Vincent)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 application
Att: 2 affrimation
Att: 3 order
Sunday, October 08, 2023
21 21 court BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice to Creditors Mon 10/09 12:09 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice to Creditors Notice Date 10/08/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 06, 2023
20 20 court BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice of Reset of Section 341 Meeting of Creditors Sat 10/07 12:09 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice of Reset of Section 341 Meeting of Creditors Notice Date 10/06/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
19 19 court Blank Creditor Notice (Notice to ALL Creditors) Fri 10/06 4:13 PM
Notice of Rescheduled Hearing by the Court from 11:00 a.m. on 10/24/2023 to 4:00 p.m. on 10/24/2023 Re: Related [+] (agh)
Related: [-] 6 Order Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Adjourned Without Hearing (Case Owned BK) Fri 10/06 4:12 PM
Initial Case Management Conference Rescheduled by the Court to 10/24/2023 at 04:00 PM at Courtroom 3577 (Judge Lord), Brooklyn, NY Related [+] (AngelaHoward)
Related: [-] 6 Order Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference
Thursday, October 05, 2023
18 18 notice Amended Notice of Motion/Presentment (use to correct date, time or location of a presentment / heari Thu 10/05 6:36 PM
Amended Notice of Motion/Presentment Filed by Vincent M Lentini on behalf of 146 Diamond LLC Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 10/24/2023 at 04:00 PM (check with court for location). (Lentini, Vincent)
Related: [-] 16 Motion for Joint Administration filed by Debtor 146 Diamond LLC
17 17 misc Affidavit/Certificate of Service Thu 10/05 6:13 PM
Affidavit/Certificate of Service Filed by Vincent M Lentini on behalf of 146 Diamond LLC Related [+] (Lentini, Vincent)
Related: [-] 16 Motion for Joint Administration filed by Debtor 146 Diamond LLC
16 16 motion Joint Administration Thu 10/05 5:01 PM
Motion for Joint Administration of Case 23-43364 with Case(s) 23-43365 43367, 43369 Filed by Vincent M Lentini on behalf of 146 Diamond LLC. Hearing scheduled for 10/24/2023 at 11:00 AM (check with court for location). (Lentini, Vincent)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 app
Att: 2 order
Wednesday, October 04, 2023
15 15 misc Statement of Financial Affairs for Non-Individuals (Form 207) Wed 10/04 6:57 PM
Statement of Financial Affairs for Non-Individuals (Form 207) Filed by Vincent M Lentini on behalf of 146 Diamond LLC (Lentini, Vincent)
Related: [-]
14 14 misc Statement of Financial Affairs for Non-Individuals (Form 207) Wed 10/04 6:43 PM
Statement of Financial Affairs for Non-Individuals (Form 207) Filed by Vincent M Lentini on behalf of 146 Diamond LLC Related [+] (Lentini, Vincent)
Related: [-] 2 Deficient Filing Chapter 11
13 13 trustee Notice of Rescheduled Telephonic 341 Meeting with Instructions Wed 10/04 2:01 PM
Notice of Rescheduled Telephonic 341 Meeting with Instructions. Meeting scheduled for October 23, 2023, at 12:45 p.m. Filed by Office of the United States Trustee Related [+]. (Khodorovsky, Nazar)
Related: [-] 4 Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11
Monday, October 02, 2023
12 12 misc Amended Schedule(s), Statement(s) and Affidavit Pursuant to E.D.N.Y. LBR 1009-1(a) (No Fee) Mon 10/02 2:27 PM
Amended Schedule(s), Statement(s) and Affidavit Pursuant to E.D.N.Y. LBR 1009-1(a) Schedule A/B, Schedule D, Schedule E/F, Schedule G, : lr1073 Filed by Vincent M Lentini on behalf of 146 Diamond LLC (Lentini, Vincent)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 schedules
Att: 2 schedules
Att: 3 schedules declaration
utility Fee Due (Create Outstanding Fee) Mon 10/02 10:34 AM
Fee Due Schedule(s), Statement(s) and Affidavit Pursuant to E.D.N.Y. LBR 1007-1(b) (Fee Due) $ 32 Related [+] (rom)
Related: [-] 10 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors Form 104 or Form 204 filed by Debtor 146 Diamond LLC
crditcrd Automatic docket of credit card/debit card Mon 10/02 2:23 PM
Receipt of Schedule(s), Statement(s) and Affidavit Pursuant to E.D.N.Y. LBR 1007-1(b) (Fee Due)(1 23-43369 nhl) [misc,schsfa] ( 32.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A22010463. Fee amount 32.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#10
Sunday, October 01, 2023
11 11 misc Affidavit Sun 10/01 3:02 PM
Affidavit Re: local rule 1007-4 Filed by Vincent M Lentini on behalf of 146 Diamond LLC (Lentini, Vincent) Modified on 10/2/2023 (rom)
Related: [-]
10 10 misc 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors Form 104 or Form 204 Sun 10/01 3:01 PM
Chapter 11 or Chapter 9 Cases Non-Individual: List of Creditors Who Have 20 Largest Unsecured Claims Against You and Are Not Insiders Filed by Vincent M Lentini on behalf of 146 Diamond LLC Related [+] (Lentini, Vincent)
Related: [-] 2 Deficient Filing Chapter 11
Sunday, September 24, 2023
9 9 court BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice/Order Mon 09/25 12:09 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice/Order Notice Date 09/24/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Saturday, September 23, 2023
8 8 court BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice of Deficient Filing Sun 09/24 12:09 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice of Deficient Filing Notice Date 09/23/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
7 7 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors Sun 09/24 12:09 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors Notice Date 09/23/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 22, 2023
6 6 order Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference (Ch 11) All Judges Fri 09/22 4:35 PM
Order Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference . Signed on 9/22/2023 Status hearing to be held on 10/24/2023 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 3577 (Judge Lord), Brooklyn, NY. (rom)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 21, 2023
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Thu 09/21 4:11 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Frank C Dell'Amore on behalf of Greenpoint Mixed Use LLC (Dell'Amore, Frank)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit of Service
4 4 court Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 Thu 09/21 4:05 PM
Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 10/23/2023 at 12:45 PM at Teleconference - Brooklyn. (las)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Verification of List of Creditors Thu 09/21 11:01 AM
Verification of List of Creditors Filed by Vincent M Lentini on behalf of 146 Diamond LLC (Lentini, Vincent)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 matrix
court Case Related to a Chapter 11 Thu 09/21 8:19 AM
The above case is related to Case Number(s) 22-40809 nhl, Zen Restoration Inc (nwh)
Related: [-]
utility Judge Reassignment Utility Thu 09/21 8:20 AM
Judge Jil Mazer-Marino removed from the case due to Related Case, Judge Reassigned. Judge Nancy Hershey Lord added to the case. (nwh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 20, 2023
2 2 court Deficient Filing Chapter 11 Thu 09/21 9:12 AM
Deficient Filing Chapter 11 Mailing Matrix / List of Creditors Pursuant to E.D.N.Y. LBR 1007-3 due by 9/20/2023.Affidavit Pursuant to E.D.N.Y. LBR 1007-4 due 9/20/2023. 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors due 9/20/2023. Corporate Ownership Statement Pursuant to FBR 1007(a)(1) due 9/20/2023. Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant to FBR 1073-3 due 9/20/2023. Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor. 11 U.S.C. § 329 and Fed. R. Bankr. P. 2016(b) (Official Form 2030) due 10/4/2023. Summary of Assets and Liabilities for Non-Individuals Official Form 206Sum due by 10/4/2023. Schedule A/B due 10/4/2023. Schedule D due 10/4/2023. Schedule E/F due 10/4/2023. Schedule G due 10/4/2023. Schedule H due 10/4/2023. Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non Individual Debtors Official Form 202 due 10/4/2023. Statement of Financial Affairs Non-Ind Form 207 due 10/4/2023. Incomplete Filings due by 10/4/2023. (rom)
Related: [-]
1 1 5 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Wed 09/20 1:46 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals. Fee Amount $ 1738. Filed by Vincent M Lentini on behalf of 146 Diamond LLC Chapter 11 Plan due by 01/18/2024. Disclosure Statement due by 01/18/2024. (Lentini, Vincent)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs list of equity holders
Att: 2 resolution
Att: 3 local rule statement
crditcrd Automatic docket of credit card/debit card Wed 09/20 1:47 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK:1 23-43369 ) [misc,volp11a] (1738.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A21976863. Fee amount 1738.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1