Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Judge:Wendy Beetlestone
Referred: Richard A Lloret
Case #: 2:23-cv-03659
Nature of Suit362 Torts - Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice
Cause28:1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Case Filed:Sep 20, 2023
Terminated:Nov 20, 2023
Case in other court:Court of Common Pleas of Philadelphia County, 230802158
Last checked: Monday Mar 18, 2024 9:57 AM EDT
Defendant
CVS HEALTH CORPORATION
1 CVS DRIVE
WOONSOCKET, RI 02895
Represented By
Raymond Edward Escobar
Post & Schell
contact info
ALBERT BRYAN TOMLINSON
Post & Schell PC
contact info
AMALIA V. ROMANOWICZ
Post & Schell, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
CVS PHARMACY, INC.
1 CVS DRIVE
WOONSOCKET, RI 02895
Represented By
Raymond Edward Escobar
Post & Schell
contact info
ALBERT BRYAN TOMLINSON
Post & Schell PC
contact info
AMALIA V. ROMANOWICZ
Post & Schell, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
ROSLYN HAWKINS
221 N. CEDAR LANE
UPPER DARBY, PA 19082
Represented By
THEODORE CHARLES LEVY
Fine & Staud LLC
contact info

GPO Nov 20 2023
MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 11/20/2023. 11/20/2023 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. EMAILED TO CCP PHILADELPHIA.(sg)
GPO Nov 20 2023
ORDERED that:1. The matter is REMANDED to the Philadelphia Court of Common Pleas;2. The settlement conference scheduled for December 15 is CANCELED; and,3. The Clerk of Court is directed to TERMINATE the matter.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 11/20/2023. 11/20/2023 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. EMAILED TO CCP PHILADELPHIA.(sg)

Docket last updated: 74 minutes ago
Monday, November 20, 2023
18 18 1 pgs order Memorandum and/or Opinion Order Mon 11/20 3:29 PM
ORDERED that:1. The matter is REMANDED to the Philadelphia Court of Common Pleas;2. The settlement conference scheduled for December 15 is CANCELED; and,3. The Clerk of Court is directed to TERMINATE the matter.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 11/20/2023. 11/20/2023 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. EMAILED TO CCP PHILADELPHIA.(sg)
Related: [-]
17 17 8 pgs order Memorandum and/or Opinion Mon 11/20 3:27 PM
MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 11/20/2023. 11/20/2023 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. EMAILED TO CCP PHILADELPHIA.(sg)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 09, 2023
16 16 misc Letter Thu 11/09 2:45 PM
Letter dated November 9, 2023 by ROSLYN HAWKINS. (LEVY, THEODORE)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 19, 2023
15 15 notice Notice of Hearing Thu 10/19 2:31 PM
NOTICE: A settlement conference via the internet will be held on December 15, 2023 at 2:00 p.m., before the Honorable Richard A. Lloret, United States Magistrate Judge. Please email all participants names and emails to sheila_mccurry@paed.uscourts.gov by November 29, 2023. The ZOOM log-on information will be emailed prior to the conference. A status telephone call will be held on November 29, 2023 at 10:30 a.m. Counsel will call chambers call-in number which was provided via e-mail.Please complete the attached summary and e-mail it to Chambers at sheila_mccurry@paed.uscourts.gov on or before November 29, 2023. If it is NOT emailed by then Judge Lloret may CANCEL the settlement conference.(smcc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 18, 2023
14 14 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Wed 10/18 7:48 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re11 MOTION to Remand to State Court with Memorandum of Law and Opposition Exhibits A, B, and C filed by CVS HEALTH CORPORATION, CVS PHARMACY, INC.. (TOMLINSON, ALBERT)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 06, 2023
13 13 order Scheduling Order Fri 10/06 7:57 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: This case is referred to Magistrate Judge Richard Lloret for a settlement conference. On or before October 11, 2023, counsel for the parties shall contact United States Magistrate Judge Richard Lloret to schedule a settlement conference. DISCOVERY DUE BY 1/2/2024. MOTIONS DUE BY 2/13/2024. MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT DUE BY 2/13/2024. SIGNED BY HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 10/5/2023. 10/6/2023 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 05, 2023
12 12 minutes Pretrial Conference - Interim 1 - Terminate Hearings Fri 10/06 7:51 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE Pretrial Conference held on 10/4/2023. (sg)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 04, 2023
11 11 motion Remand to State Court Wed 10/04 3:59 PM
MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by ROSLYN HAWKINS.Order, Motion, Brief, Certificate of Service.(LEVY, THEODORE)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit B,
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit C,
Att: 5 Exhibit Exhibit D,
Att: 6 Exhibit Exhibit E
Thursday, September 28, 2023
10 10 misc Report Of Thu 09/28 6:48 AM
Report Of RULE 269F) MEETING AND PROPOSED DISCOVERY PLAN (JOINT SUBMISSION) by CVS HEALTH CORPORATION, CVS PHARMACY, INC.. (TOMLINSON, ALBERT)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 25, 2023
9 9 notice Notice of Hearing Mon 09/25 2:09 PM
NOTICE of Hearing: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 10/4/2023 at 12:00 PM IN Video Conference BEFORE HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE.(nm)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Appendix,
Att: 2 Appendix
Friday, September 22, 2023
8 8 misc State Court Record - Attachment Fri 09/22 2:56 PM
State Court record received from Court of Common Pleas of Philadelphia County. (CCP - Philadelphia County cv, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 21, 2023
7 7 discov Disclosure of Citizenship Thu 09/21 3:05 PM
Disclosure of Citizenship in Diversity Cases by CVS HEALTH CORPORATION, CVS PHARMACY, INC. . (TOMLINSON, ALBERT)
Related: [-]
6 6 discov Disclosure Statement Form 7.1 Thu 09/21 3:01 PM
Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by CVS HEALTH CORPORATION.(TOMLINSON, ALBERT)
Related: [-]
5 5 discov Disclosure Statement Form 7.1 Thu 09/21 2:58 PM
Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including CVS Health Corporation with Certificate of Service by CVS HEALTH CORPORATION, CVS PHARMACY, INC..(TOMLINSON, ALBERT)
Related: [-]
4 4 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 09/21 2:55 PM
ANSWER to Complaint together with Affirmative Defenses by CVS HEALTH CORPORATION, CVS PHARMACY, INC..(TOMLINSON, ALBERT)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 09/21 2:53 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Raymond Edward Escobar on behalf of CVS HEALTH CORPORATION, CVS PHARMACY, INC. with Certificate of Service(Escobar, Raymond)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 09/21 2:49 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by AMALIA V. ROMANOWICZ on behalf of CVS HEALTH CORPORATION, CVS PHARMACY, INC. with Jury Demand and Certificate of Service(ROMANOWICZ, AMALIA)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 20, 2023
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal (Attorney) Wed 09/20 3:32 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by CVS PHARMACY, INC., CVS HEALTH CORPORATION (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-16958112), filed by CVS PHARMACY, INC., CVS HEALTH CORPORATION.(TOMLINSON, ALBERT)
Related: [-]