Texas Southern District Court
Judge:Keith P Ellison
Case #: 4:23-cv-03549
Nature of Suit880 Civil Rights - Defend Trade Secrets Act of 2016 (DTSA)
Cause18:1836(b) Civil Action to Protect Trade Secrets
Case Filed:Sep 20, 2023
Terminated:Mar 06, 2024
Last checked: Monday Mar 18, 2024 9:01 AM CDT
Defendant
Phillip Sandoval
Represented By
Karen Diane McDaniel
Taft Stettinius & Hollister LLP
contact info
Thomas G. Pasternak
Taft Stettinius & Hollister LLP
contact info
Arthur Gollwitzer, III
Jackson Walker LLP
contact info
William Bruce Stanfill
Akerman LLP
contact info
Defendant
Commercial Truck and Trailer Parts, Inc.
824 Dividend Rd
Midlothian, TX 76065
Represented By
Karen Diane McDaniel
Taft Stettinius & Hollister LLP
contact info
Arthur Gollwitzer, III
Jackson Walker LLP
contact info
Defendant
M&R Manufacturing and Supply Inc.
824 Dividend Rd
Midlothian, TX 76065
Represented By
Karen Diane McDaniel
Taft Stettinius & Hollister LLP
contact info
Arthur Gollwitzer, III
Jackson Walker LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Hinton Transportation Investment, Inc.
Represented By
Jacob Lee Carlton
Miller Johnson
contact info
D. Andrew Portinga
Miller Johnson
contact info
Plaintiff
IAPS QSUB, Inc.
Represented By
Jacob Lee Carlton
Miller Johnson
contact info
D. Andrew Portinga
Miller Johnson
contact info


Docket last updated: 09/20/2023 5:50 PM CDT
Wednesday, September 20, 2023
1 1 10 pgs COMPLAINT against Phillip Sandoval (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXSDC-30540789) filed by Hinton Transportation Investment, Inc., IAPS QSUB, Inc..(Portinga, D.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet
2 2 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Phillip Sandoval, filed.(Portinga, D.)
Related: [-]
3 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Jacob L. Carlton on behalf of Hinton Transportation Investment, Inc., IAPS QSUB, Inc., filed. (Carlton, Jacob)
Related: [-]