Indiana Northern District Court
Judge:Jon E Deguilio
Referred: John E Martin
Case #: 2:23-cv-00314
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Case Filed:Sep 20, 2023
Terminated:Nov 21, 2023
Case in other court:Indiana Southern, 1:23-cv-00606
Last checked: Monday Mar 18, 2024 4:25 AM EDT
Defendant
American Water
Represented By
Emery K Harlan
Mwh Law Group Llp - Ind/in
contact info
Chandlor Glenn Collins
Mwh Law Group
contact info
Plaintiff
Jennifer Gomez-Schultz
Represented By
Thakena D Hogue
The Magi Group
contact info


Docket last updated: 9 hours ago
Tuesday, November 21, 2023
47 47 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Tue 11/21 2:42 PM
ORDER: Considering the joint nature of the stipulation, and pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), this matter is hereby DISMISSED, with prejudice. The Clerk is DIRECTED to CLOSE this case. Signed by Judge Jon E DeGuilio on 11/21/2023. (jdb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 16, 2023
46 46 motion Dismiss Thu 11/16 9:24 AM
Joint MOTION to Dismiss Claims by Plaintiff Jennifer Gomez-Schultz.(Hogue, Thakena)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Supplement Proposed order granting Joint Motion to Dismiss with prejudice
Thursday, November 09, 2023
45 45 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Thu 11/09 12:20 PM
ORDER: The Court hereby GRANTS the motion to withdraw implied within the letter44 and ORDERS that the appearance of Attorney Chandlor Glenn Collins on behalf of Defendant is hereby WITHDRAWN. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 11/09/2023. (jdb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 08, 2023
44 44 motion Withdraw as Attorney Wed 11/08 11:47 AM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney - Attorney Chandlor Collins by Defendant American Water. (Harlan, Emery)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 07, 2023
43 43 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Wed 11/08 11:32 AM
ORDER: The Court ORDERS that Attorney Chandlor Collins shall have through11/28/2023, within which to either: (1) register for the Courts CM/ECF system and (A) file an application to appear pro hac vice, (B) move for permanent admission to practice law before this Court, or (C) file proof of their admission to practice law before this Court; or (2) file a written motion to withdraw as counsel of record for Defendant in this matter. The Court CAUTIONS Attorney Collins that failure to comply with the admission and filing requirements of this Court could result in monetary or disciplinary sanctions. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 11/7/2023. (Copy mailed to Atty Collins as directed in Order)(mrm)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 06, 2023
42 42 order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Mon 11/06 10:55 AM
ORDER re41 Notice filed by Jennifer Gomez-Schultz. The Teleph Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference on 11/9/2023 is CONTINUED to 1/11/2024 10:00 AM Central before Magistrate Judge John E Martin to allow parties to exhaust settlement. Parties are to either file their proposed joint discovery plan, or stipulation for dismissal by 1/5/2024. Parties are instructed to call 833-568-8864; enter Meeting ID 161 0956 8055; Push # to skip Participant ID; enter Passcode 815985 when prompted. Text entry order. By Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 11/6/2023. (smb)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 03, 2023
41 41 notice Notice - Other Fri 11/03 10:16 PM
NOTICE by Jennifer Gomez-Schultz Status of case and request delay of 26(f) discovery plan (Hogue, Thakena)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 02, 2023
40 40 misc Mag Consent Forms Sent - Standard with pptc - form will be generated Mon 10/02 2:22 PM
MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties.. (smb)
Related: [-]
39 39 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Mon 10/02 2:22 PM
ORDER/SET HEARING: Telephonic Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 11/9/2023 10:30 AM Central before Magistrate Judge John E Martin. Proposed joint report in accordance with FRCP 26(f) due 11/3/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 10/2/2023. (smb)
Related: [-]
38 38 order Order Mon 10/02 2:12 PM
ORDER: Each party and each attorney in this case shall take reasonable steps to preserve electronically stored information (ESI) that is relevant to any claim or defense in this case, whether or not the information is admissible at trial. This requirement relates back to the point in time when the party or attorney reasonably anticipated litigation about these matters. Text entry order. By Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 10/2/2023. (smb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 26, 2023
37 37 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Tue 09/26 4:21 PM
ANSWER to30 Amended Complaint by American Water.(Harlan, Emery)
Related: [-]
36 36 notice Notice of Change of Address/Contact Information Tue 09/26 11:19 AM
NOTICE of Change of Address/Contact Information for Thakena Hogue, Attorney for Plaintiff (Hogue, Thakena)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 20, 2023
35 35 transfer Case Transferred In - District Transfer Wed 09/20 11:58 AM
Case transferred in from District of Indiana Southern; Case Number 1:23-cv-00606. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 19, 2023
34 34 Transfer Letter to Clerk of the Northern District of Indiana. Case transferred electronically to the Northern District of Indiana on 9/19/2023. (CW) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 9/20/2023.]
Related: [-]
33 33 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S UNOPPOSED MOTION TO TRANSFER - Defendant, American Water d/b/a Indiana-American Water Company Inc., moves to transfer this case to the Northern District of Indiana, Hammond Division. Plaintiff consents. Accordingly, Defendant's motion (Filing No.21 ) is GRANTED. The Clerk is DIRECTED to transfer this case to the Northern District of Indiana, Hammond Division. Signed by District Judge Richard L Young on 9/19/2023. (CW) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 9/20/2023.]
Related: [-]
Monday, September 18, 2023
32 32 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER - SEE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Crystal S. Wildeman on 9/18/2023.(JRB) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 9/20/2023.]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 12, 2023
31 31 Joint MOTION for Protective Order , filed by Defendant AMERICAN WATER d/b/a INDIANA-AMERICAN WATER COMPANY INC.. (Harlan, Emery) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 9/20/2023.]
Related: [-]
30 30 AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR EMPLOYMENT DISCRIMINATION against All Defendants, filed by All Plaintiffs.(Hogue, Thakena) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 9/20/2023.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Notice of Right to Sue
Friday, September 08, 2023
29 29 ORDER - GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT; The Court, having reviewed Plaintiff's Motion, and Defendant's Response thereto Dkt.26 , and being otherwise duly advised in the premises hereby GRANTS said motion. Plaintiff shall file her Amended Complaint as a separate entry in this case within five (5) days from the date of this order and that the caption of this case be hereinafter corrected to reflect the Defendant's proper name as: "Indiana- American Water Company, Inc." Signed by Magistrate Judge Crystal S. Wildeman on 9/8/2023. (CKM) Modified on 9/8/2023 (CKM). [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 9/20/2023.]
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 07, 2023
28 28 RESPONSE to Motion re26 First MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint , filed by Defendant AMERICAN WATER d/b/a INDIANA-AMERICAN WATER COMPANY INC.. (Harlan, Emery) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 9/20/2023.]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 05, 2023
27 27 NOTICE of Consent to Transfer , filed by Plaintiff JENNIFER GOMEZ-SCHULTZ (Hogue, Thakena) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 9/20/2023.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Defendant Declaration
26 26 First MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint , filed by Plaintiff JENNIFER GOMEZ-SCHULTZ.(Hogue, Thakena) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 9/20/2023.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Amended Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit Right to Sue,
Att: 3 Exhibit Complaint,
Att: 4 Exhibit Corporate disclosure,
Att: 5 Exhibit Case Mgmt Plan,
Att: 6 Exhibit Defendant Declaration,
Att: 7 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order
25 25 Notice of Reassignment of Case to Magistrate Judge Crystal S. Wildeman. Magistrate Judge Kellie M. Barr is no longer assigned to this case. Please include the new case number (1:23-cv-00606-RLY-CSW), which includes the initials of the newly assigned judge, on all future filings in this matter. (Albertson, Steven) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 9/20/2023.]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 15, 2023
24 24 ENTRY AND ORDER FROM TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE - The Parties, by counsel, appeared for a telephonic status conference on August 14, 2023, with Magistrate Judge Kellie M. Barr. Plaintiff's counsel made an unopposed oral motion to extend the deadline to respond to the Defendant's Motion to Transfer Venue [dkt. 21], which the Court GRANTED. The Plaintiff shall have until September 7, 2023, to respond to the Motion to Transfer Venue. This matter is set for a telephonic status conference on October 19, 2023, at 9:30 a.m. (Eastern), with Magistrate Judge Kellie M. Barr. The Court will contact counsel through the Court's electronic filing system with the call-in information to be used to participate in the conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kellie M. Barr. (AKW) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 9/20/2023.]
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 03, 2023
22 22 DECLARATION of Shannon Ferguson re21 Motion to Transfer Case by AMERICAN WATER d/b/a INDIANA-AMERICAN WATER COMPANY INC.. (Harlan, Emery) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 9/20/2023.]
Related: [-]
21 21 MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District , filed by Defendant AMERICAN WATER d/b/a INDIANA-AMERICAN WATER COMPANY INC.. (Harlan, Emery) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 9/20/2023.]
Related: [-]
Monday, July 31, 2023
20 20 STATUS REPORT Joint Rule 26(f) Conference Report by All Defendants. (Harlan, Emery) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 9/20/2023.]
Related: [-]
19 19 EXHIBIT and Preliminary Witness List by All Defendants. (Harlan, Emery) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 9/20/2023.]
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 20, 2023
18 18 Witness List Preliminary , filed by Plaintiff JENNIFER GOMEZ-SCHULTZ, Exhibit List Preliminary , filed by Plaintiff JENNIFER GOMEZ-SCHULTZ. (Hogue, Thakena) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 9/20/2023.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 05, 2023
17 17 ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY DISPUTES - SEE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kellie M. Barr on 7/5/2023.(JRB) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 9/20/2023.]
Related: [-]
16 16 ORDER: CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN APPROVED AS AMENDED - Dispositive Motions due by 5/10/2024. Discovery due by 3/8/2024. SEE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kellie M. Barr on 77/5/2023.(JRB) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 9/20/2023.]
Related: [-]
15 15 ENTRY AND ORDER FROM INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE - The Parties, by counsel, appeared for an Initial Pretrial Conference on June 29, 2023, with Magistrate Judge Kellie M. Barr. The Case Management Plan submitted in this case is APPROVED as amended, and will be entered as a separate order. This matter is set for a Telephonic Status Conference on August 14, 2023, at 2:00 p.m. (Eastern), with Magistrate Judge Kellie M. Barr. The Court will contact counsel through the Court's electronic filing system with the call-in information to be used to participate in the conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kellie M. Barr. (AKW) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 9/20/2023.]
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 29, 2023
14 14 Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by AMERICAN WATER d/b/a INDIANA-AMERICAN WATER COMPANY INC.. (Harlan, Emery) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 9/20/2023.]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 27, 2023
13 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Chandlor Glenn Collins on behalf of Defendant AMERICAN WATER d/b/a INDIANA-AMERICAN WATER COMPANY INC.. (Collins, Chandlor) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 9/20/2023.]
Related: [-]
Friday, June 23, 2023
12 12 CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN TENDERED, filed by Defendant AMERICAN WATER d/b/a INDIANA-AMERICAN WATER COMPANY INC. . (Harlan, Emery) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 9/20/2023.]
Related: [-]
Monday, June 19, 2023
11 11 ANSWER to1 Complaint , filed by All Defendants.(Harlan, Emery) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 9/20/2023.]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 16, 2023
10 10 INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SCHEDULING ORDER - An Initial Pretrial Conference by Zoom is set for 6/29/2023 at 2:00 PM (Eastern Time) before Magistrate Judge Kellie M. Barr. The Court will contact counsel by separate email with information to be used to participate in the conference. Read this entire order carefully; it sets out the Court's expectations for the conference. (See Order.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Kellie M. Barr on 5/16/2023. (JSR) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 9/20/2023.]
Related: [-]
Monday, May 15, 2023
9 9 NOTICE of Extension of Time to June 19, 2023 For the Filing of Defendant's Responsive Pleading , filed by Defendant AMERICAN WATER d/b/a INDIANA-AMERICAN WATER COMPANY INC.. (Harlan, Emery) Modified on 6/7/2023 (AKW). [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 9/20/2023.]
Related: [-]
8 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Emery K. Harlan on behalf of Defendant AMERICAN WATER d/b/a INDIANA-AMERICAN WATER COMPANY INC.. (Harlan, Emery) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 9/20/2023.]
Related: [-]
Monday, May 08, 2023
7 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by All Plaintiffs(Hogue, Thakena) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 9/20/2023.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Receipt Proof of service receipt
Monday, April 10, 2023
6 6 Notice to File Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement. (RAGS) (JRB) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 9/20/2023.]
Related: [-]
5 5 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (JRB) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 9/20/2023.]
Related: [-]
4 4 Summons Issued as to AMERICAN WATER d/b/a INDIANA-AMERICAN WATER COMPANY INC.. (JRB) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 9/20/2023.]
Related: [-]
Friday, April 07, 2023
3 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Thakena Deriess Hogue on behalf of Plaintiff JENNIFER GOMEZ-SCHULTZ. (Hogue, Thakena) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 9/20/2023.]
Related: [-]
2 2 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information. Consistent with Local Rule 5-3, Thakena Deriess Hogue hereby notifies the Clerk of the court of changed contact information. (Hogue, Thakena) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 9/20/2023.]
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Filing fee $402, receipt number AINSDC-7581803)(Hogue, Thakena) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 9/20/2023.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Notice of Right to Sue,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet Plaintiff's Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 3 Proposed Summons Plaintiff's Proposed Summons