Indiana Northern District Court
Judge:Holly A Brady
Referred: Susan L Collins
Case #: 1:23-cv-00401
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1446 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury
Case Filed:Sep 20, 2023
Terminated:Feb 13, 2024
Last checked: Monday Mar 18, 2024 4:25 AM EDT
Defendant
United States of America
Represented By
Madison Lo Dolce - AUSA
Us District Court - Ham/in
contact info
Plaintiff
James Lee Phillips
605 West Main St.
Redkey, IN 47373
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Att: Tabor
Terminated: 10/17/2023
Represented By
Madison Lo Dolce - AUSA
Us District Court - Ham/in
contact info


Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Monday, December 16, 2024
16 16 misc Receipt Tue 12/17 1:48 PM
RECEIPT of Various Claim Forms from James Lee Phillips.(sej)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Friday, December 06, 2024
15 15 misc Receipt Fri 12/06 3:40 PM
RECEIPT of medical forms from James Lee Phillips. (sej)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 20, 2024
14 14 service Proof of Service Wed 02/21 10:08 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed as to12 Order Dismissing Case,13 Clerks Judgment. (sej)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 15, 2024
13 13 misc Clerks Judgment Thu 02/15 11:36 AM
CLERK'S ENTRY OF JUDGMENT. (Copy mailed Certified # 7021 2720 0002 3685 6917 to pro se party) (sej)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 13, 2024
12 12 4 pgs order Opinion and Order Order Dismissing Case Thu 02/15 11:34 AM
OPINION AND ORDER: Defendants Motion to Dismiss4 is GRANTED as outlined in order. Signed by Chief Judge Holly A Brady on 2/13/2024. (Copy mailed certified # 7021 2720 0002 3685 6917 to pro se party)(sej)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 12, 2023
11 11 respm Reply to Response to Motion Tue 12/12 5:15 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM United States of America's Reply in Support of its Motion to Dismiss filed by United States of America. (Lo Dolce - AUSA, Madison)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 07, 2023
10 10 respm Response to Motion Thu 12/07 3:51 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by James Lee Phillips.(sej)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
9 9 order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Thu 12/07 11:30 AM
ORDER for Magistrate Judge Susan Collins: The Court will set a Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference, if necessary, after the ruling on Defendant's pending4 Motion to Dismiss. Text entry order. (copy mailed to pro se Plaintiff)(mr)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 15, 2023
8 8 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Wed 11/15 2:50 PM
ORDER: The court DIRECTS the clerk to send Plaintiff a current docket sheet, along with copies of both the Governments Motion to Dismiss4 and the Governments Memorandum in Support5 ; and GRANTS Plaintiff an additional twenty-one (21) days to respond to the Governments Motion4 . Signed by Chief Judge Holly A Brady on 11/15/2023. (Copy of order, docket sheet, and DE (4 and5 ) mailed to pro se party)(sej)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 13, 2023
7 7 misc Letter Tue 11/14 10:37 AM
Letter from James L. Phillips regarding case. (sej)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Envelope
Tuesday, October 17, 2023
6 6 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Motions ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties Thu 10/19 12:22 PM
ORDER re3 Notice of Substitution. The United States of America is automatically substituted for Defendant Seidl. The Clerk is DIRECTED to amend the case caption to reflect the substitution. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins on 10/17/2023. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(ash)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 26, 2023
5 5 5 pgs respm Memorandum in Support Tue 09/26 6:13 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support of4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Att: Tabor.(Lo Dolce - AUSA, Madison)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B
4 4 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Tue 09/26 6:07 PM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Att: Tabor. (Lo Dolce - AUSA, Madison)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 22, 2023
3 3 motion Substitute Party Fri 09/22 1:10 PM
MOTION to Substitute Party by Defendant Att: Tabor.(Lo Dolce - AUSA, Madison)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Certification
Thursday, September 21, 2023
utility Add and Terminate Judges Thu 09/21 2:09 PM
Chief Judge Holly A Brady and Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins added. NEW CASE. (nal)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 20, 2023
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Wed 09/20 4:56 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Jay Superior Court, Cause No. 38D01-2309-SC-000040, filed by Tabor Seidl.(Lo Dolce - AUSA, Madison)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1,
Att: 3 Exhibit 2
Friday, September 01, 2023
2 2 cmp State Court Complaint Thu 09/21 2:14 PM
STATE COURT COMPLAINT against Att: Tabor filed in Jay Superior Court by James Lee Phillips. (nal)
Related: [-]