Louisiana Eastern District Court
Judge:Brandon S Long
Referred: Janis Van Meerveld
Case #: 2:23-cv-05415
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Case Filed:Sep 20, 2023
Terminated:Dec 20, 2024
Case in other court:24th JDC For The Parish Of Jefferson, 844087
Last checked: Monday Mar 18, 2024 3:28 AM CDT
Defendant
USAA Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By
Roy L. Schroeder
Schafer & Schafer
contact info
Defendant
Storm Damage Solutions LLC
749 Eagle Point Drive
Saint Augustine, FL 32092
Interested Party
Hurricane Ida Program Administrator
Represented By
Francis Joseph Lobrano
Carver, Darden, Koretzky, Tessier, Finn, Blossman & Areaux
contact info
Plaintiff
Jennifer Catalano
Represented By
James R. Dugan, II
Dugan Law Firm PLC
contact info
Douglas Robert Plymale
Plymale Law Firm
contact info
David Scott Scalia
Dugan Law Firm
contact info
Mekel R. Smith
The Dugan Law Firm
contact info


Docket last updated: 39 minutes ago
Wednesday, January 15, 2025
46 46 21 pgs order Order Wed 01/15 10:54 AM
HURRICANE IDA CLAIMS: ORDER Regarding Settlement of Former MMA Cases. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 12/19/2024.(lag)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 23, 2024
45 45 misc Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk Mon 12/23 10:37 AM
Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re44 Stipulation of Dismissal: Document contains incorrect Section Judge. All future pleadings must reflect Section O, District Judge Brandon S. Long. (meb)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 20, 2024
44 44 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Fri 12/20 12:20 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by Jennifer Catalano (Smith, Mekel)
Related: [-]
43 43 1 pgs order Order Fri 12/20 11:09 AM
HURRICANE IDA CLAIMS: ORDERED that defendant/insurers, through counsel, immediately determine whether any of their settled Hurricane Ida cases remain on the docket of this Court and immediately file a Notice of Settlement in said case so that it can be dismissed by the District Judge. This process shall be completed in no more than 21 days of this Order. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 12/18/2024.(lag)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 03, 2024
42 42 motion Dismiss Case Thu 10/03 10:55 AM
EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Case with prejudice by USAA Casualty Insurance Company, Jennifer Catalano.(Schroeder, Roy) Modified text/filers on 10/3/2024 (meb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, August 20, 2024
41 41 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss/Failure to State a Claim Order on Motion for Leave to File Wed 08/21 11:53 AM
ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that USAA's17 motion to dismiss is GRANTED. Plaintiff's claims pursuant to LA. STAT. ANN. § 22:1961, et seq.; LA. STAT. ANN. § 51:1401, et seq.; and LA. CIV. CODE ANN. ARTS. 1997 and 1998 are dismissed with prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's24 motion for leave to amend is DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge Brandon S. Long on 08/20/2024. (js)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 21, 2024
40 40 2 pgs order Order Fri 06/21 9:02 AM
HURRICANE IDA CLAIMS - ORDER re Motions to Compel and Payment of Mediation Fees. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 06/17/2024.(lag)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 24, 2024
39 39 misc Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk Wed 04/24 9:14 AM
Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re36 MOTION to Vacate28 Order on Motion for Entry of Default. Filing attorney selected incorrect submission date. Correct date is 5/15/2024. Clerk took corrective action. (js)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 23, 2024
38 38 respm Response/Memorandum in Opposition to Motion Tue 04/23 3:51 PM
RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Jennifer Catalano re34 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . (Smith, Mekel)
Related: [-]
37 37 respm Response/Memorandum in Opposition to Motion Tue 04/23 2:38 PM
RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Storm Damage Solutions LLC re32 MOTION to Strike30 Answer to Amended Complaint . (Bivalacqua, Salvador)
Related: [-]
36 36 motion Vacate Tue 04/23 2:33 PM
MOTION to Vacate28 Order on Motion for Entry of Default by Storm Damage Solutions LLC. Motion(s) will be submitted on 5/1/2024.(Bivalacqua, Salvador)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support,
Att: 2 Notice of Submission
Wednesday, April 17, 2024
35 35 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Expedite Wed 04/17 1:41 PM
ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the33 motion of Defendant Storm Damage Solutions, LLC to expedite the Court's consideration of its pending motion to dismiss is DENIED. The submission dates for the motion to dismiss by Defendant Storm Damage Solutions, LLC and the motion to strike Defendant Storm Damage Solutions, LLC's answer by Plaintiff Jennifer Catalano remain May 1, 2024. Signed by Judge Brandon S. Long on 04/17/2024. (js)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 08, 2024
34 34 motion Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction Mon 04/08 4:31 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Storm Damage Solutions LLC. Motion(s) will be submitted on 5/1/2024.(Bivalacqua, Salvador)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support,
Att: 2 Notice of Submission
33 33 motion Expedite Mon 04/08 4:25 PM
EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Expedite Consideration of Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1) by Storm Damage Solutions LLC.(Bivalacqua, Salvador)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, April 03, 2024
32 32 motion Strike Wed 04/03 2:12 PM
MOTION to Strike30 Answer to Amended Complaint by Jennifer Catalano. Motion(s) will be submitted on 5/1/2024.(Smith, Mekel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support,
Att: 2 Proposed Order,
Att: 3 Notice of Submission
Wednesday, March 27, 2024
31 31 misc Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk Wed 03/27 1:21 PM
Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re30 Answer to Amended Complaint. Document contains incorrect Section Judge. All future pleadings must reflect Section O, Judge Brandon S. Long. (js)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 26, 2024
30 30 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Tue 03/26 4:18 PM
ANSWER to15 Amended Complaint by Storm Damage Solutions LLC.Attorney Salvador I Bivalacqua added to party Storm Damage Solutions LLC(pty:dft).(Bivalacqua, Salvador)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 18, 2024
29 29 motion Default Judgment Mon 03/18 11:53 AM
MOTION for Default Judgment as to Storm Damage Solutions LLD D/B/A Smart Tarp by Jennifer Catalano. Motion(s) will be submitted on 3/18/2024.(Smith, Mekel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support,
Att: 2 Proposed Order,
Att: 3 Exhibit Dec of Mekel Smith,
Att: 4 Exhibit Proof of Delivery,
Att: 5 Exhibit Tarp Invoice,
Att: 6 Exhibit Gurtler Inv & Report,
Att: 7 Exhibit Bulava Inv & Report,
Att: 8 Exhibit DML Shed Invoice,
Att: 9 Exhibit Side Pocket,
Att: 10 Exhibit DML Shed Invoice 2,
Att: 11 Exhibit DML Shed Invoice 3,
Att: 12 Exhibit McDonald Invoice,
Att: 13 Exhibit Painting Receipts
Friday, March 01, 2024
28 28 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Entry of Default Fri 03/01 5:06 PM
ORDER granting27 Motion for Entry of Default as to Storm Damage Solutions LLC. Signed by Clerk on 03/01/2024. (js)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 21, 2024
27 27 motion Entry of Default Wed 02/21 4:33 PM
EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Entry of Default as to Storm Damage Solutions, LLC DBA Smart Tarp by Jennifer Catalano.(Smith, Mekel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Clerk's Order,
Att: 2 Exhibit Declaration
Monday, February 19, 2024
26 26 respm Reply to Response to Motion Mon 02/19 4:13 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion filed by Jennifer Catalano re24 Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint for Partial Dismissal of Claims Plaintiff's Reply to Defendant, USAA's, Response to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint for Partial Dismissal of Claims .(Smith, Mekel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Declaration Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit 1,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit 2,
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit 3,
Att: 5 Exhibit Exhibit 4,
Att: 6 Exhibit Exhibit 5,
Att: 7 Exhibit Exhibit 6
Wednesday, February 14, 2024
25 25 respm Response to Motion Wed 02/14 11:03 PM
RESPONSE to Motion filed by USAA Casualty Insurance Company re24 Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint for Partial Dismissal of Claims . (Schroeder, Roy)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 05, 2024
24 24 motion Amend/Correct Mon 02/05 4:05 PM
MOTION to Amend/Correct For Leave to Amend Complaint for Partial Dismissal of Claims by Jennifer Catalano. Motion(s) will be submitted on 2/21/2024.(Dugan, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support,
Att: 2 Proposed Order,
Att: 3 Notice of Submission
Saturday, January 27, 2024
23 23 motion Dismiss Sat 01/27 3:24 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Partial Dismissal of Claims by Jennifer Catalano. Motion(s) will be submitted on 2/21/2024.(Smith, Mekel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Notice of Submission
Thursday, January 25, 2024
22 22 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 01/25 1:06 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed; Storm Damage Solutions LLC served on 1/25/2024, answer due 2/15/2024. (Plymale, Douglas)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 11, 2024
21 21 minutes ~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Order ~Util - Terminate Motions Thu 01/11 10:40 AM
ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the unopposed motion of Plaintiff Jennifer Catalano to extend the deadline to respond to Defendant USAA Casualty Insurance Company's Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) motion to dismiss is GRANTED. The submission date on the motion to dismiss is continued to February 7, 2024, and Plaintiff's response to the motion to dismiss is due on January 30, 2024. In accordance with Local Civil Rule 7.2, no oral argument or hearing will be conducted on the February 7, 2024 submission date unless the Court enters a separate order specifically setting the motion to dismiss for oral argument or hearing. Signed by Judge Brandon S. Long on 01/11/2024.(js)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 28, 2023
20 20 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Thu 12/28 3:36 PM
EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to17 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Jennifer Catalano. Motion(s) referred to Janis van Meerveld.(Smith, Mekel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Motion for Extension of Time
19 19 28 pgs order Order Transferring Case Thu 12/28 9:56 AM
ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. Case transferred to Judge Brandon S. Long. Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 12/27/2023.(lag)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 18, 2023
18 18 30+ pgs order Order Mon 12/18 4:08 PM
HURRICANE IDA CLAIMS Fourth Amendment to CMO No. 1. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 12/12/2023.(lag)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 11, 2023
17 17 motion Dismiss/Failure to State a Claim/FRCP12(b)(6) Mon 12/11 8:02 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by USAA Casualty Insurance Company. Motion(s) will be submitted on 1/10/2024.(Schroeder, Roy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Submission,
Att: 2 Memorandum in Support
Monday, November 27, 2023
16 16 service Summons Issued Mon 11/27 2:29 PM
Summons Issued as to Storm Damage Solutions LLC. (mp)
Related: [-]
15 15 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 11/27 2:26 PM
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against USAA Casualty Insurance Company, Storm Damage Solutions LLC filed by Jennifer Catalano.(mp)
Related: [-]
14 14 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to File Mon 11/27 2:24 PM
ORDER granting12 Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on November 27, 2023. (mp)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 24, 2023
13 13 misc Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk Fri 11/24 10:25 AM
Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re12 MOTION for Leave to File . Filing attorney incorrectly changed 'N' to 'Y' at the question 'Is this motion to be decided by the Magistrate Judge Y/N?'. This motion will be decided by the District Judge. Clerk took corrective action. (cs)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 22, 2023
12 12 motion Leave to File Document Wed 11/22 2:24 PM
EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File by Jennifer Catalano. Motion(s) referred to Janis van Meerveld.(Dugan, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support,
Att: 2 Proposed Pleading,
Att: 3 Exhibit Amended Complaint
Friday, November 17, 2023
11 11 answer Answer to Complaint - Notice of Removal Fri 11/17 7:07 PM
ANSWER to1 Notice of Removal,, with Jury Demand by USAA Casualty Insurance Company.(Schroeder, Roy)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 16, 2023
10 10 cmp Amended Complaint Thu 11/16 2:15 PM
DEFICIENT: First AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against USAA Casualty Insurance Company, Storm Damage Solutions, LLC, d/b/a Smart-Tarp filed by Jennifer Catalano.(Dugan, James) Modified on 11/16/2023 (mp)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons
Thursday, October 12, 2023
9 9 misc ADI event Thu 10/12 4:59 PM
Amended Exhibit A to Hurricane Ida Case Management Order. (lag)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 10, 2023
8 8 misc ADI event Tue 10/10 2:37 PM
Amended Exhibit A to Hurricane Ida Case Management Order. (lag)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 04, 2023
7 7 notice Notice of Compliance Wed 10/04 12:53 PM
Notice of Compliance by USAA Casualty Insurance Company re1 Notice of Removal. (Schroeder, Roy) Modified link on 10/4/2023 (mp)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 03, 2023
6 6 30+ pgs order Order Tue 10/03 11:54 AM
HURRICANE IDA CLAIMS Third Amendment to CMO No. 1. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 09/14/2023.(lag)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 21, 2023
5 5 30+ pgs order Order Thu 09/21 9:06 AM
HURRICANE IDA CASES Second Amendment to CMO No. 1. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 9/12/2023.(mp)
Related: [-]
4 4 30+ pgs order Order Thu 09/21 8:47 AM
HURRICANE IDA CLAIMS AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1 with Addendum. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 10/25/2022.(mp)
Related: [-]
3 3 1 pgs order Order Thu 09/21 8:46 AM
DIRECTIVE of the Clerk regarding compliance with 28:1447(b) re1 Notice of Removal.(mp)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Initial Case Assignment Thu 09/21 7:59 AM
Initial Case Assignment to Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown and Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. (cc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 20, 2023
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Wed 09/20 5:41 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL with jury demand from 24th JDC For The Parish Of Jefferson, case number 844087 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-10165666) filed by USAA Casualty Insurance Company.Attorney Roy L. Schroeder added to party USAA Casualty Insurance Company(pty:dft).(Schroeder, Roy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit A - State Court Petition,
Att: 3 Exhibit B - State Cour Summons And Service Return,
Att: 4 Exhibit C - Dec Page,
Att: 5 Exhibit D - Plaintiff Demand And Estimate,
Att: 6 Exhibit E - Notice Of Filing