California Northern District Court
Judge:Haywood S Gilliam, Jr
Case #: 3:23-cv-04827
Nature of Suit220 Real Property - Foreclosure
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question
Case Filed:Sep 20, 2023
Case in other court:San Mateo Superior Court, 23CIV03917
Last checked: Monday Mar 18, 2024 1:16 AM PDT
Defendant
Athas Capital Group, Inc.
Represented By
Timothy Matthew Ryan
The Ryan Firm
contact info
Andrew Jonathan Mase
The Ryan Firm
contact info
William M. Brockschmidt
The Ryan Firm, Apc
contact info
Matthew Henry Aguirre
The Ryan Firm
contact info
Defendant
California TD Specialists
Represented By
Timothy Matthew Ryan
The Ryan Firm
contact info
Andrew Jonathan Mase
The Ryan Firm
contact info
William M. Brockschmidt
The Ryan Firm, Apc
contact info
Matthew Henry Aguirre
The Ryan Firm
contact info
Defendant
FCI Lender Services, Inc.
Represented By
Timothy Matthew Ryan
The Ryan Firm
contact info
Andrew Jonathan Mase
The Ryan Firm
contact info
William M. Brockschmidt
The Ryan Firm, Apc
contact info
Matthew Henry Aguirre
The Ryan Firm
contact info
Defendant
Alim Kassam
Represented By
Timothy Matthew Ryan
The Ryan Firm
contact info
Andrew Jonathan Mase
The Ryan Firm
contact info
William M. Brockschmidt
The Ryan Firm, Apc
contact info
Matthew Henry Aguirre
The Ryan Firm
contact info
Defendant
Rama Capital Partners, LLC
Represented By
Timothy Matthew Ryan
The Ryan Firm
contact info
Andrew Jonathan Mase
The Ryan Firm
contact info
William M. Brockschmidt
The Ryan Firm, Apc
contact info
Matthew Henry Aguirre
The Ryan Firm
contact info
Defendant
The Rama Fund, LLC
Represented By
Timothy Matthew Ryan
The Ryan Firm
contact info
Andrew Jonathan Mase
The Ryan Firm
contact info
William M. Brockschmidt
The Ryan Firm, Apc
contact info
Matthew Henry Aguirre
The Ryan Firm
contact info
Defendant
Alex Urmersbach
Represented By
Timothy Matthew Ryan
The Ryan Firm
contact info
Andrew Jonathan Mase
The Ryan Firm
contact info
William M. Brockschmidt
The Ryan Firm, Apc
contact info
Matthew Henry Aguirre
The Ryan Firm
contact info
Defendant
Peter Bao
Defendant
Jeffrey M. Griffith
Represented By
Timothy Matthew Ryan
The Ryan Firm
contact info
Andrew Jonathan Mase
The Ryan Firm
contact info
William M. Brockschmidt
The Ryan Firm, Apc
contact info
Matthew Henry Aguirre
The Ryan Firm
contact info
Defendant
President and CEO Michael W. Griffith
8180 East Kaiser Blvd.
Anaheim Hills, CA 92808
Represented By
Timothy Matthew Ryan
The Ryan Firm
contact info
Andrew Jonathan Mase
The Ryan Firm
contact info
William M. Brockschmidt
The Ryan Firm, Apc
contact info
Matthew Henry Aguirre
The Ryan Firm
contact info
Defendant
Timothy D. Griffith
Represented By
Timothy Matthew Ryan
The Ryan Firm
contact info
Andrew Jonathan Mase
The Ryan Firm
contact info
William M. Brockschmidt
The Ryan Firm, Apc
contact info
Matthew Henry Aguirre
The Ryan Firm
contact info
Defendant
Wendy Medina
Represented By
Jason Allen Savlov
Adams Stirling, PLC
contact info
Defendant
Brian O'Shaughnessy
Represented By
Timothy Matthew Ryan
The Ryan Firm
contact info
Andrew Jonathan Mase
The Ryan Firm
contact info
William M. Brockschmidt
The Ryan Firm, Apc
contact info
Matthew Henry Aguirre
The Ryan Firm
contact info
Plaintiff
Tyrious Gates
2085 E. Bayshore Rd.,# 51501
East Palo Alto, CA 94303


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Wednesday, September 20, 2023
8 8 Certificate of Interested Entities by Athas Capital Group, Inc., California TD Specialists, FCI Lender Services, Inc., Jeffrey Griffith, Michael Griffith, Timothy Griffith, Alim Kassam, Brian OShaughnessy, Rama Capital Partners, LLC, The Rama Fund, LLC, Alex Urmersbach (Aguirre, Matthew)
Related: [-]
7 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Rama Fund, LLC identifying Other Affiliate AFK Holdings, LLC, Other Affiliate Cosaint Incorporated, Other Affiliate EMS Fund I, LLC for The Rama Fund, LLC. (Aguirre, Matthew)
Related: [-]
6 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Rama Capital Partners, LLC identifying Corporate Parent AFK Holdings, LLC, Corporate Parent Cosaint Incorporated, Corporate Parent EMS Fund 1, LLC for Rama Capital Partners, LLC. (Aguirre, Matthew)
Related: [-]
5 5 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 10/4/2023. (ark, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
4 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by FCI Lender Services, Inc. (Aguirre, Matthew)
Related: [-]
3 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by California TD Specialists (Aguirre, Matthew)
Related: [-]
2 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Athas Capital Group, Inc. (Aguirre, Matthew)
Related: [-]
1 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL [FEDERAL QUESTION & SUPPLEMENTAL JURISDICTION] from San Mateo Superior Court. Their case number is 23CIV03917. (Filing fee $402 receipt number ACANDC-18663431). Filed byThe Rama Fund, LLC, Michael Griffith, Brian OShaughnessy, Athas Capital Group, Inc., Timothy Griffith, Alim Kassam, FCI Lender Services, Inc., California TD Specialists, Alex Urmersbach, Jeffrey Griffith, Rama Capital Partners, LLC.(Aguirre, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet