California Northern District Court
Judge:Susan Illston
Case #: 3:23-cv-04830
Nature of Suit350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle
Cause28:2671 Federal Tort Claims Act
Case Filed:Sep 20, 2023
Terminated:May 30, 2024
Last checked: Monday Mar 18, 2024 1:17 AM PDT
Defendant
Jesus Simon Dungo
Defendant
United States of America
Represented By
Sapna S. Mehta
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info
Plaintiff
Adila Ribeiro Nascimento
Represented By
Narek Mnatsakanian
Dayan Houman PLC
contact info

GPO Apr 05 2024
PRETRIAL PREPARATION ORDER. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 4/5/2024. TRIAL ESTIMATE: 3 Days. (ec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2024)

Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Thursday, May 30, 2024
27 27 misc Stipulation without Proposed Order Thu 05/30 7:54 AM
STIPULATION STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO SETTLEMENT filed by United States of America. (Johns, Douglas)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 08, 2024
26 26 oth_evt Clerk's Notice ~Util - Teleconference Zoom Wed 05/08 11:20 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING TRIAL DEADLINES AND SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE: The Court having reviewed the Notice of Settlement filed at25 VACATES all pretrial deadlines including the Case Management Conference set in August. A Joint Status Report due by 9/20/2024. Status Conference set for 9/27/2024 at 03:00 PM - Videoconference Only before Judge Susan Illston. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/si] MANDATORY ZOOM REGISTRATION: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names and emails must be sent to the CRD at sicrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than 9/18/2024 at 2 pm. General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/] . Status Report due by 9/20/2024. Status Conference set for 9/27/2024 03:00 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only before Judge Susan Illston. (ec, COURT STAFF). (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
Related: [-]
25 25 notice Notice (Other) Wed 05/08 10:50 AM
NOTICE by United States of America NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT (Johns, Douglas)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 06, 2024
24 24 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 05/06 8:00 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas Earl Johns NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Johns, Douglas)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 17, 2024
23 23 adr ADR Clerk's Notice Appointing Mediator Wed 04/17 11:07 AM
ADR Clerk's Notice Appointing Ann Marie Reding as Mediator. (af, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 05, 2024
22 22 order Pretrial Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Fri 04/05 3:03 PM
PRETRIAL PREPARATION ORDER. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 4/5/2024. TRIAL ESTIMATE: 3 Days. (ec, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
21 21 minutes Case Management Conference - Initial ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Fri 04/05 2:57 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held via Zoom webinar before Judge Susan Illston: Initial Case Management Conference held on 4/5/2024. Joint Case Management Statement due by 8/9/2024. Further Case Management Conference set for 8/16/2024 at 03:00 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. Total Time in Court: 8 Minutes. Court Reporter: Zoom Recording. Plaintiff Attorney: Narek Mnatsakanian. Defendant Attorney: Sapna Mehta. (ec, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/5/2024)
Related: [-]
20 20 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Fri 04/05 10:05 AM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Adila Ribeiro Nascimento (Mnatsakanian, Narek)
Related: [-]
utility Case Referred to Mediation Fri 04/05 3:56 PM
CASE REFERRED to Mediation. (cmf, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 29, 2024
19 19 oth_evt Clerk's Notice ~Util - Teleconference Zoom Fri 03/29 1:23 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE ADVANCING HEARING TIME: Due to a change in the Court's availability, the Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/5/2024 IS ADVANCED TO 11:30 AM - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Public Hearing Zoom webinar. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/si] General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/] . Case Management Statement due by 3/29/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/5/2024 11:30 AM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. (ec, COURT STAFF). (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
Related: [-]
18 18 misc Joint Case Management Statement Fri 03/29 8:44 AM
JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by United States of America. (Mehta, Sapna)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 18, 2024
17 17 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 03/18 9:00 AM
ANSWER to Complaint by United States of America. (Mehta, Sapna)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 29, 2024
16 16 3 pgs order Order on Stipulation Thu 02/29 9:52 AM
Order by Judge Susan Illston granting in part and denying in part 14 Stipulation. Joint Case Management Statement due by 3/29/2024. Courtesy copy of Statement due by 4/1/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/5/2024 at 02:30 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. Counsel are to register for Zoom appearance by 3/27/2024.(ec, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
15 15 adr ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options Thu 02/29 9:19 AM
ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Mehta, Sapna)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 28, 2024
14 14 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Wed 02/28 3:47 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue Initial Case Management Conference filed by United States of America. (Mehta, Sapna)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 26, 2024
13 13 adr ADR Clerks Notice re: Non-Compliance after 5/1/2018 Mon 02/26 8:19 AM
ADR Clerks Notice re: Non-Compliance with Court Order. The parties have failed to file an ADR Certification as required by the Initial Case Management Scheduling Order. Counsel shall comply promptly with the requirements of ADR L.R. 3-5(b) and shall file the ADR Certification. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cmf, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 13, 2024
12 12 misc Stipulation without Proposed Order Tue 02/13 9:16 AM
STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint filed by United States of America. (Mehta, Sapna)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 15, 2023
11 11 2 pgs order Order on Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11 Fri 12/15 8:22 AM
Order by Judge Susan Illston granting 10 Administrative Motion Continuing Case Management Conference.Joint Case Management Statement due by 3/8/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/15/2024 at 02:30 PM - Videoconference Only. All Counsel who wish to appear on the record MUST REGISTER by emailing sicrd@cand.uscourts.gov by 2 p.m. on 3/6/2024.(ec, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 14, 2023
10 10 motion Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11 Thu 12/14 5:13 PM
ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER TO RESCHEDULE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by Adila Ribeiro Nascimento. Responses due by 12/18/2023. (Mnatsakanian, Narek)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 04, 2023
9 9 oth_evt Clerk's Notice ~Util - Teleconference Zoom Wed 10/04 9:38 AM
INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT GUIDELINE AND CLERK'S NOTICE ON REASSIGNMENT. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/si] General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/] . Case Management Statement due by 1/5/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/12/2024 02:30 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. (ec, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
8 8 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case ~Util - Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 10/04 9:04 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Susan Illston for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 10/04/2023.(ark, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording
Tuesday, October 03, 2023
7 7 oth_evt Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment - Text Only Tue 10/03 2:27 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (klh, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Tue 10/03 12:18 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Adila Ribeiro Nascimento.. (Mnatsakanian, Narek)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 21, 2023
5 5 service Summons Issued Thu 09/21 11:06 AM
Summons Issued as to Jesus Simon Dungo, United States of America. (slh, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
4 4 order Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines Thu 09/21 11:04 AM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 12/29/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/5/2024 at 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom D, 15th Floor. (slh, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
3 3 utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Thu 09/21 7:27 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 10/5/2023. (as, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 20, 2023
2 2 misc Proposed Summons Wed 09/20 4:21 PM
Proposed Summons. (Mnatsakanian, Narek)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 09/20 4:02 PM
COMPLAINT against Jesus Simon Dungo, United States of America ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-18663608.). Filed byAdila Ribeiro Nascimento.(Mnatsakanian, Narek)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet