California Northern District Court
Judge:Alex G Tse
Case #: 3:23-cv-04831
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause42:12101 Americans w/ Disabilities Act (ADA)
Case Filed:Sep 20, 2023
Terminated:Nov 27, 2023
Last checked: Monday Mar 18, 2024 1:17 AM PDT
Defendant
Chohan Ventures, Inc.
Represented By
Jason G. Gong
Law Office Of Jason G. Gong
contact info
Defendant
Canning Fan
Represented By
Jason G. Gong
Law Office Of Jason G. Gong
contact info
Defendant
Sophia Fan
Represented By
Jason G. Gong
Law Office Of Jason G. Gong
contact info
Defendant
Nancy Lin
Represented By
Jason G. Gong
Law Office Of Jason G. Gong
contact info
Plaintiff
Deloris Robbie Hurtado
Represented By
Cody Robert Cooper
Termechi Law
contact info
Peter Shahriari
Law Office Of Hakimi & Shahriari
contact info
Anoush Hakimi
The Law Office Of Hakimi & Shahriari
contact info
Lauren Rae Davis
The Spivak Law Firm
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Monday, November 27, 2023
11 11 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set/Clear Flags Terminate Civil Case Mon 11/27 4:15 PM
CONDITIONAL DISMISSAL ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse, ***Civil Case Terminated. (shy, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 22, 2023
10 10 adr Notice of Settlement of ADA Access Case - ADA Access Cases Only Wed 11/22 4:20 PM
Notice of Settlement of ADA Access Case by Cody Robert Cooper (Cooper, Cody)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 09, 2023
9 9 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Thu 11/09 10:23 AM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Deloris Robbie Hurtado (Cooper, Cody)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 08, 2023
8 8 1 pgs order Order on Stipulation Wed 11/08 9:26 AM
Order by Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse granting 7 stipulation to extend time to conduct joint site inspection. (agtlc2, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 06, 2023
7 7 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Mon 11/06 7:13 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Extend G.O. 56 Joint Inspection deadline filed by Chohan Ventures, Inc., Canning Fan, Sophia Fan, Nancy Lin.(Gong, Jason)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, October 16, 2023
6 6 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Mon 10/16 6:26 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Chohan Ventures, Inc., Canning Fan, Sophia Fan, Nancy Lin.. (Gong, Jason)
Related: [-]
5 5 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 10/16 6:23 PM
Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint for Injunctive Relief and Damages byChohan Ventures, Inc., Canning Fan, Sophia Fan, Nancy Lin. (Gong, Jason)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 21, 2023
4 4 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Thu 09/21 9:24 AM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Deloris Robbie Hurtado.. (Cooper, Cody)
Related: [-]
3 3 order Initial Case Management Scheduling Order - ADA Case Thu 09/21 8:45 AM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order for Cases Asserting Denial of Right of Access under Americans with Disabilities Act. (jml, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
utility Electronic Filing Error Thu 09/21 8:41 AM
[LINK:Electronic filing error] . NOTICE TO COUNSEL: LAUREN DAVIS. The docket shows a different address from what is appearing on the document (dkt. #: [1-1] Notice of Removal, filed by Chohan Ventures, Inc., Canning Fan, Nancy Lin, Sophia Fan). Please update your personal profile on ECF. (jml, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
utility Electronic Filing Error Thu 09/21 8:41 AM
[LINK:Electronic filing error] . NOTICE TO COUNSEL: ANOUSH HAKIMI. The docket shows a different address from what is appearing on the document (dkt. #: [1-1] Notice of Removal, filed by Chohan Ventures, Inc., Canning Fan, Nancy Lin, Sophia Fan). Please update your personal profile on ECF. (jml, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
utility Electronic Filing Error Thu 09/21 8:42 AM
[LINK:Electronic filing error] . NOTICE TO COUNSEL: PETER SHAHRIARI. The docket shows a different address from what is appearing on the document (dkt. #: [1-1] Notice of Removal, filed by Chohan Ventures, Inc., Canning Fan, Nancy Lin, Sophia Fan). Please update your personal profile on ECF. (jml, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 20, 2023
2 2 utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Wed 09/20 4:25 PM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 10/4/2023. (bar, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Wed 09/20 4:10 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Contra Costa County Superior Court. Their case number is C23-01122. (Filing fee $402 receipt number ACANDC-18663708). Filed bySophia Fan, Canning Fan, Nancy Lin, Chohan Ventures, Inc..(Gong, Jason)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet