California Northern District Court
Judge:James Donato
Case #: 3:23-cv-04832
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Case Filed:Sep 20, 2023
Last checked: Monday Mar 18, 2024 1:17 AM PDT
Defendant
Tesla Inc.
Represented By
Gayle Rosenstein Klein
Freshfields Bruckhaus Deringer Us LLP
contact info
Robert Barton
Freshfields Bruckhaus Deringer Us LLP
contact info
Joseph Duffy
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Darnell Williams
Represented By
Timothy Douglas Cohelan
Cohelan Khoury & Singer
contact info
Rosemary C Khoury
Cohelan Khoury And Singer
contact info
Patrick Nathaniel Keegan
Keegan & Baker, LLP
contact info
Isam Charles Khoury
Cohelan Khoury & Singer
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Monday, September 30, 2024
25 25 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Mon 09/30 3:58 PM
ORDER by Judge James Donato granting 21 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (lrc, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 30, 2024
24 24 5 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Motions Thu 05/30 1:03 PM
ORDER RE CONSOLIDATION, INTERIM LEAD COUNSEL, AND ARBITRATION. Signed by Judge James Donato on 5/30/2024. (jdlc3, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 15, 2024
23 23 notice Notice of Change of Address Fri 03/15 1:23 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address by Gayle Rosenstein Klein (Klein, Gayle)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 23, 2024
22 22 minutes Case Management Conference - Initial Motion Hearing ~Util - Terminate Motions Fri 02/23 9:42 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James Donato: Initial Case Management Conference and Hearing on Consolidation held on 2/22/2024. Total Time in Court: 9 minutes. Court Reporter: Kelly Shainline. (jdlc3, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/23/2024)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 20, 2024
21 21 motion Pro Hac Vice Tue 02/20 2:36 PM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 328, receipt number ACANDC-19140708.) filed by Tesla Inc..(Barton, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Thursday, February 15, 2024
20 20 misc Joint Case Management Statement Thu 02/15 4:05 PM
JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Tesla Inc., Darnell Williams (Klein, Gayle) Modified on 2/15/2024 (kmm2, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 30, 2024
19 19 adr ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options Tue 01/30 11:19 AM
ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Klein, Gayle)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 19, 2024
18 18 order Order ~Util - Terminate Motions 1 - Terminate Hearings ~Util - Set Hearings Fri 01/19 4:02 PM
ORDER. The initial case management conference and hearing on the parties' request to consolidate the Pai , Mata , and Williams actions are set for February 22, 2024. Signed by Judge James Donato on 1/19/2024. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc3, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 09, 2024
17 17 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Tue 01/09 7:02 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Reschedule Hearing filed by Tesla Inc..(Klein, Gayle)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Gayle R. Klein,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
16 16 order Order ~Util - Set Hearings 1 - Terminate Hearings Tue 01/09 11:58 AM
ORDER. The case management conference set for January 11, 2024, is continued to February 1, 2024, at 10:00 a.m. The Court will take up the question of whether to consolidate this case, Mata v. Tesla , and Pai v. Tesla , on the same day. Signed by Judge James Donato on 1/9/2024. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc3, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 19, 2023
15 15 misc Stipulation without Proposed Order Tue 12/19 9:06 AM
STIPULATION to Extend Deadline to Respond filed by Tesla Inc. and Darnell Williams. (Klein, Gayle) Modified on 12/19/2023 (anj, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 11, 2023
14 14 1 pgs order Order Relating Case Tue 12/12 8:00 AM
ORDER RELATING CASE. Signed by Judge James Donato on 12/11/2023. (lrc, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 30, 2023
13 13 adr ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options Thu 11/30 2:52 PM
ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Khoury, Rosemary)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 29, 2023
12 12 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Wed 11/29 2:09 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re1 Complaint, filed by Tesla Inc.. (Duffy, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 15, 2023
11 11 service Certificate/Proof of Service Wed 11/15 12:22 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE by Darnell Williams re10 Summons Issued,1 Complaint, (Khoury, Rosemary) Modified on 11/16/2023 (anj, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 06, 2023
10 10 service Summons Issued Fri 10/06 2:20 PM
Summons Issued as to Tesla Inc.. (jlm, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
9 9 order Case Management Scheduling Order Fri 10/06 12:51 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/11/2024 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor. Case Management Statement due by 1/4/2024. Signed by Judge James Donato on 10/6/2023. (lrc, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 05, 2023
8 8 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case ~Util - Case Assigned/Reassigned Thu 10/05 8:48 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge James Donato for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore no longer assigned to case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by The Clerk on 10/5/2023.(bar, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording
7 7 oth_evt Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment - Text Only Thu 10/05 7:54 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (wft, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 20, 2023
2 2 utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Wed 09/20 4:47 PM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 10/4/2023. (bar, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 09/20 4:43 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-18664086.). Filed byDarnell Williams.(Khoury, Rosemary)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet