California Northern District Court
Judge:Haywood S Gilliam, Jr
Case #: 4:23-cv-04827
Nature of Suit220 Real Property - Foreclosure
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question
Case Filed:Sep 20, 2023
Terminated:Dec 06, 2024
Case in other court:San Mateo Superior Court, 23CIV03917
Last checked: Monday Mar 18, 2024 1:17 AM PDT
Defendant
Athas Capital Group, Inc.
Represented By
William M. Brockschmidt
The Ryan Firm, Apc
contact info
Matthew Henry Aguirre
The Ryan Firm
contact info
Andrew Jonathan Mase
The Ryan Firm
contact info
Timothy Matthew Ryan
The Ryan Firm
contact info
Defendant
California TD Specialists
Represented By
William M. Brockschmidt
The Ryan Firm, Apc
contact info
Matthew Henry Aguirre
The Ryan Firm
contact info
Andrew Jonathan Mase
The Ryan Firm
contact info
Timothy Matthew Ryan
The Ryan Firm
contact info
Defendant
FCI Lender Services, Inc.
Represented By
William M. Brockschmidt
The Ryan Firm, Apc
contact info
Matthew Henry Aguirre
The Ryan Firm
contact info
Andrew Jonathan Mase
The Ryan Firm
contact info
Timothy Matthew Ryan
The Ryan Firm
contact info
Defendant
Alim Kassam
Represented By
William M. Brockschmidt
The Ryan Firm, Apc
contact info
Matthew Henry Aguirre
The Ryan Firm
contact info
Andrew Jonathan Mase
The Ryan Firm
contact info
Timothy Matthew Ryan
The Ryan Firm
contact info
Defendant
Rama Capital Partners, LLC
Represented By
William M. Brockschmidt
The Ryan Firm, Apc
contact info
Matthew Henry Aguirre
The Ryan Firm
contact info
Andrew Jonathan Mase
The Ryan Firm
contact info
Timothy Matthew Ryan
The Ryan Firm
contact info
Defendant
The Rama Fund, LLC
Represented By
William M. Brockschmidt
The Ryan Firm, Apc
contact info
Matthew Henry Aguirre
The Ryan Firm
contact info
Andrew Jonathan Mase
The Ryan Firm
contact info
Timothy Matthew Ryan
The Ryan Firm
contact info
Defendant
Alex Urmersbach
Represented By
William M. Brockschmidt
The Ryan Firm, Apc
contact info
Matthew Henry Aguirre
The Ryan Firm
contact info
Andrew Jonathan Mase
The Ryan Firm
contact info
Timothy Matthew Ryan
The Ryan Firm
contact info
Defendant
Peter Bao
Defendant
Jeffrey M. Griffith
Represented By
William M. Brockschmidt
The Ryan Firm, Apc
contact info
Matthew Henry Aguirre
The Ryan Firm
contact info
Andrew Jonathan Mase
The Ryan Firm
contact info
Timothy Matthew Ryan
The Ryan Firm
contact info
Defendant
President and CEO Michael W. Griffith
8180 East Kaiser Blvd.
Anaheim Hills, CA 92808
Represented By
William M. Brockschmidt
The Ryan Firm, Apc
contact info
Matthew Henry Aguirre
The Ryan Firm
contact info
Andrew Jonathan Mase
The Ryan Firm
contact info
Timothy Matthew Ryan
The Ryan Firm
contact info
Defendant
Timothy D. Griffith
Represented By
William M. Brockschmidt
The Ryan Firm, Apc
contact info
Matthew Henry Aguirre
The Ryan Firm
contact info
Andrew Jonathan Mase
The Ryan Firm
contact info
Timothy Matthew Ryan
The Ryan Firm
contact info
Defendant
Wendy Medina
Represented By
Jason Allen Savlov
Adams Stirling, PLC
contact info
Defendant
Brian O'Shaughnessy
Represented By
William M. Brockschmidt
The Ryan Firm, Apc
contact info
Matthew Henry Aguirre
The Ryan Firm
contact info
Andrew Jonathan Mase
The Ryan Firm
contact info
Timothy Matthew Ryan
The Ryan Firm
contact info
Plaintiff
Tyrious Gates
2085 E. Bayshore Rd.,# 51501
East Palo Alto, CA 94303

GPO Nov 28 2023
ORDER DIRECTING PARTIES TO MEET AND CONFER AND SUBMIT A FILING. Motions due by 12/11/2023. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 11/28/2023. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/28/2023)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
GPO Dec 12 2023
ORDER GRANTING 37 STIPULATION. **This Order Terminates Docket No. 11.** Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 12/12/2023. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2023)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
GPO Aug 26 2024
ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS (43, 47) MOTIONS TO DISMISS Status Report due by 9/4/2024. Show Cause Response due by 9/11/2024. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 8/26/2024. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2024)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
GPO Oct 15 2024
y First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DOCKET NO. 56. Show Cause Response due by 10/28/2024. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 10/15/2024. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2024)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served b
GPO Dec 06 2024
ORDER GRANTING (63, 64) DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO DISMISS. ***Civil Case TERMINATED.*** Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 12/6/2024. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2024)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
GPO Dec 06 2024
CLERK'S JUDGMENT. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2024)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)

Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, December 06, 2024
70 70 oth_evt Judgment - Clerk Fri 12/06 7:32 AM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT. (ndr, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
69 69 4 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Terminate Civil Case Fri 12/06 7:30 AM
ORDER GRANTING ( 63 , 64 ) DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO DISMISS. ***Civil Case TERMINATED.*** Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 12/6/2024. (ndr, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 05, 2024
68 68 oth_evt Clerk's Notice Thu 12/05 7:47 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE RE DOCKET NOS.63 AND64 . (ndr, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]