California Northern District Court
Judge:James Donato
Case #: 3:23-cv-04833
Nature of Suit310 Torts - Personal Injury - Airplane
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Case Filed:Sep 20, 2023
Terminated:Nov 26, 2024
Last checked: Monday Mar 18, 2024 1:18 AM PDT
Defendant
Scandinavian Airlines System
Represented By
Ivy Larsen Nowinski
Condon Forsyth
contact info
Scott David Cunningham
Condon & Forsyth LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Gundega Nigale
Represented By
David Russell Shane
Shane Law
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Scandinavian Airlines of North America, Inc.
Terminated: 10/11/2023


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Tuesday, November 26, 2024
52 52 1 pgs order Order Terminate Civil Case Tue 11/26 5:23 PM
ORDER Conditionally Dismissing Case. Signed by Judge James Donato on 11/26/2024. (jdlc1, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 25, 2024
51 51 notice Notice (Other) Mon 11/25 1:11 PM
NOTICE by Gundega Nigale of Settlement and [Proposed] Order Vacating All Deadlines (Shane, David)
Related: [-]