Georgia Northern District Court
Judge:William M Ray, II
Case #: 4:23-cv-00209
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Sep 20, 2023
Last checked: Monday Mar 18, 2024 4:26 AM EDT
Defendant
AW Distributing, Inc.
Represented By
Scott Eric Anderson
Freeman Mathis & Gary, LLP
contact info
Nicolas Bohorquez
Freeman Mathis & Gary, Llp -Atl
contact info
Philip Wade Savrin
Freeman Mathis & Gary, Llp -Atl
contact info
Defendant
AW Product Sales & Marketing, Inc.
Represented By
Scott Eric Anderson
Freeman Mathis & Gary, LLP
contact info
Nicolas Bohorquez
Freeman Mathis & Gary, Llp -Atl
contact info
Philip Wade Savrin
Freeman Mathis & Gary, Llp -Atl
contact info
Defendant
Falcon Safety Products, Inc.
Represented By
Scott Donald Kaiser
Shook, Hardy & Bacon L. L. P.
contact info
Joshua Luke Becker
Shook Hardy & Bacon LLP
contact info
Holly P. Smith
Shook Hardy & Bacon, Llp - Mo
contact info
Defendant
Norazza, Inc.
Represented By
John Shiver Snelling
Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith
contact info
Alan L. Rupe
Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith-Kansas City
contact info
A. Alexander DeMasi
Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith-Kansas City
contact info
Defendant
Wal-Mart Inc.
Represented By
Cristina Azcoitia
King & Spalding
contact info
Carmen R. Toledo
King & Spalding LLP
contact info
Michael D. Roth
King & Spalding Llp -La Ca
contact info
Rose J Jones
King & Spalding
contact info
Livia M. Kiser
King & Spalding
contact info
Defendant
Wal-Mart Stores East, L.L.C.
Represented By
Cristina Azcoitia
King & Spalding
contact info
Carmen R. Toledo
King & Spalding LLP
contact info
Michael D. Roth
King & Spalding Llp -La Ca
contact info
Rose J Jones
King & Spalding
contact info
Livia M. Kiser
King & Spalding
contact info
Defendant
Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P.
Represented By
Cristina Azcoitia
King & Spalding
contact info
Carmen R. Toledo
King & Spalding LLP
contact info
Michael D. Roth
King & Spalding Llp -La Ca
contact info
Rose J Jones
King & Spalding
contact info
Livia M. Kiser
King & Spalding
contact info
Plaintiff
Diane Whiten
Represented By
Derek Chad Nuce
Pasley, Nuce, Mallory & Davis, LLC
contact info
Ruth Anne French-Hodson
Sharp Law, LLP
contact info
Sarah T. Bradshaw
Sharp Law, LLP
contact info
Rex A. Sharp
Sharp Law, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/30/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
135 135 motion Leave to File Document Wed 04/30 5:58 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint with Brief In Support by Diane Whiten.(French, Ruth)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Redlined Am Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - 1st Onn Invoice,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 - Last Onn Invoice,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4 - MSDS
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
134 134 misc Transcript Tue 04/29 2:47 PM
TRANSCRIPT of Teleconference Proceedings held on January 14, 2025, before Judge William M. Ray, II. Court Reporter/Transcriber Geraldine Glover. A full directory of court reporters and their contact information can be found at www.gand.uscourts.gov/court-reporter-directory. Tape Number: 1. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/20/2025. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/30/2025. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/28/2025. (gxg)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Appendix notice of filing transcript