Indiana Northern District Court
Judge:Philip P Simon
Referred: Andrew P Rodovich
Case #: 2:23-cv-00311
Nature of Suit550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Case Filed:Sep 19, 2023
Terminated:Sep 27, 2023

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 9 hours ago
Monday, March 24, 2025
24 24 notice Notice of Change of Address Wed 03/26 2:22 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address for Terrance Brown from HAZELTON USP to Three Rivers Federal Correctional Institution (per envelope at DE 23) (mlc)
Related: [-]
23 23 misc Letter Wed 03/26 2:20 PM
Letter from Terrance Brown regarding remaining fees owed in civil case and appeal case (mlc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Letter from USCA,
Att: 2 Envelope
Thursday, June 13, 2024
22 22 notice Notice of Change of Address Thu 06/13 4:11 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address from Big Sandy USP to Hazelton USP per DE 6 in case 2:24-cv-119. Financial ledger and Appeal IFP order DE19 sent to Hazelton as directed in order. (nae)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 09, 2024
21 21 misc Receipt Fri 02/09 4:30 PM
RECEIPT of $27.13 initial payment for Appeal filing fee. Receipt No. #H2211. (cc: USCA) (jdb)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 26, 2024
20 20 misc Receipt Mon 01/29 10:45 AM
RECEIPT of Motion to Dismiss civil appeal case no. 23-3052 directed to USCA from Terrance Brown. (Attachment: #1 Envelope) (cc: USCA) (jdb)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 08, 2024
19 19 1 pgs order Order Directing Prisoner Payment Tue 01/09 10:34 AM
ORDER: The Court ORDERS Terrance Brown, IDOC # unknown, BOP #18431-027, to pay (and the agency having custody of him to automatically remit) 20% of the money he receives for each calendar month during which he receives $10.00 or more, until the $505.00 appeal fee is paid in full; DIRECTS the clerk to create a ledger for receipt of these funds; and DIRECTS the clerk to send a copy of this order to each facility where the plaintiff is housed until the filing fee is paid in full. Signed by Judge Philip P Simon on 1/8/2024. (Copy mailed to pro se party and Inmate Trust Fund Acct @ Big Sandy USP. cc: USCA)(mrm)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 28, 2023
17 17 appeal USCA Mandate Thu 12/28 12:04 PM
MANDATE of USCA - IT IS ORDERED that this appeal is DISMISSED for failure to pay the required docketing fee pursuant to Circuit Rule 3(b). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the appellant pay the appellate fee of $505.00 to the clerk of the District Court. The Clerk of the District Court shall collect the appellate fees from the prisoner's trust fund account using the mechanism of Section 1915(b). Newlin v. Helman, 123 F.3d 429 (7th Cir. 1997). (rmf)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 PLRA Final Order
Wednesday, December 27, 2023
18 18 misc Letter Tue 01/02 12:34 PM
Letter from Terrance Brown requesting status on appeal in civil case and forms requested. (shk)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Wednesday, October 25, 2023
16 16 appeal USCA Order Mon 10/30 3:59 PM
PLRA Fee Notice and Order. (rmf)
Related: [-]
15 15 appeal USCA Case Number Mon 10/30 3:58 PM
USCA Case Number 23-3052 for13 Notice of Appeal filed by Terrance Brown. (rmf)
Related: [-]
14 14 appeal Short Record Sent to USCA Wed 10/25 11:30 AM
Short Record Sent to US Court of Appeals re13 Notice of Appeal. No appeal fees paid. (sej)
Related: [-]
13 13 appeal Notice of Appeal - court user Wed 10/25 11:28 AM
NOTICE OF APPEAL as to8 Opinion and Order,9 Clerks Judgment by Terrance Brown.(sej)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Tuesday, October 24, 2023
12 12 1 pgs order Order Wed 10/25 11:23 AM
ORDER: Terrance Browns letter dated October 8, 202310 is CONSTRUED as a Notice of Appeal; and The Clerk is DIRECTED to separately docket the filing as a Notice of Appeal. Signed by Judge Philip P Simon on 10/24/2023. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(sej)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 23, 2023
11 11 misc Letter Mon 10/23 12:06 PM
Letter to Terrance Brown re10 Appeal forms requested. (nhc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 18, 2023
10 10 misc Letter Mon 10/23 10:59 AM
Letter from Terrance Brown requesting forms. (Attachment: #1 Envelope) Related [+]. (nhc)
Related: [-] ceived with no case number
Thursday, September 28, 2023
9 9 misc Clerks Judgment Thu 09/28 12:00 PM
CLERK'S ENTRY OF JUDGMENT. (Copy mailed to pro se party). (nal)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 27, 2023
8 8 8 pgs order Opinion and Order Order Dismissing Case Thu 09/28 11:51 AM
OPINION AND ORDER: This action is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915A. Signed by Judge Philip P Simon on 9/27/23. (Copy mailed to pro se party). (nal)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 25, 2023
7 7 service Proof of Service Mon 09/25 4:34 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Terrance Brown. (rmf)
Related: [-]
6 6 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Mon 09/25 2:29 PM
ORDER denying the2 and5 Motions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich on 9/25/23. (Copy mailed to pro se party). (nal)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 20, 2023
5 5 motion Miscellaneous Relief Wed 09/20 2:53 PM
MOTION for FRCP Rule 4 Service in Accordance to (c)(3), by Plaintiff Terrance Brown. (shk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 19, 2023
4 4 service Summons Issued as to USA Wed 09/20 2:47 PM
Summons Issued as to Andrew Chonowski, Thomas Mahoney, Caitlin Padula. NOTE: The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. (shk)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Summons Issued Wed 09/20 2:46 PM
Summons Issued as to Scott Krueger. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. Summons returned to Plaintiff. Filing fee paid (shk)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Appoint Counsel Wed 09/20 2:35 PM
MOTION to Appoint Counsel purusant U.S.C. 1951 (e)(1), by Plaintiff Terrance Brown. (shk)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Pro Se Complaint Wed 09/20 2:32 PM
PRO SE COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Andrew Chonowski, Scott Krueger, Thomas Mahoney, Caitlin Padula (Filing fee $ 402.00.) Receipt #1514, filed by Terrance Brown.(shk)
Related: [-]