Indiana Northern District Court
Judge:Jon E Deguilio
Referred: John E Martin
Case #: 3:23-cv-00859
Nature of Suit550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Case Filed:Sep 19, 2023
Terminated:Feb 23, 2024

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 9 hours ago
Tuesday, March 05, 2024
19 19 misc Mail Returned Thu 03/07 2:33 PM
Mail Returned from Javenta Chapman as Undeliverable (Inmate not in custody) -18 Clerks Judgment,17 Order Dismissing Case. (shk)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 26, 2024
18 18 misc Clerks Judgment Mon 02/26 1:18 PM
CLERK'S ENTRY OF JUDGMENT. (Copy mailed to pro se party). (nhc)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 23, 2024
17 17 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Mon 02/26 1:14 PM
ORDER: This case is DISMISSED pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(b). Signed by Judge Jon E DeGuilio on 2/23/24. (Copy mailed to pro se party). (nhc)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 16, 2024
16 16 misc Mail Returned Tue 02/20 12:53 PM
Mail Returned from Javenta Chapman as Undeliverable -15 Order to Show Cause. Envelope marked: Inmate not in custody - Return to sender - attempted not known - unable to forward. (mrm)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 31, 2024
15 15 1 pgs order Order to Show Cause Wed 01/31 4:27 PM
ORDER: The Court ORDERS Javenta Chapman to SHOW CAUSE by 2/21/2024, why this case should not be dismissed pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(b), and CAUTIONS him that if he does not respond by the deadline, this case may be dismissed without further notice. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 1/31/2024. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(ash)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 02, 2024
14 14 misc Filing Fee Received Tue 01/02 4:32 PM
Initial Filing fee: $ 3.01, receipt number 2026. (nhc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 14, 2023
13 13 2 pgs order Order Order Striking Document ~Util - Set Deadlines Thu 12/14 12:20 PM
ORDER: The Court STRIKES the confusing amended complaints6 and12 ; and GRANTS Javenta Chapman until 01/10/2024, to file a single amended complaint on a Pro Se 14 (INND Rev. 2/20) Prisoner Complaint form with this cause number and the word "Amended" written above the title "Prisoner Complaint" on page one. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 12/14/2023. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (jdb)
Related: [-]
utility Remark - RELATED CASE - private event Thu 12/14 12:09 PM
Related Case Remark - Per Chambers, this case is related to Case No. 3:23-cv-983 HAB-SLC. (kmt)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 13, 2023
11 11 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Wed 12/13 12:25 PM
ORDER DENYING AS MOOT10 Motion to Enlarge Time to File by Plaintiff Javenta Chapman. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 12/13/2023. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(mrm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 12, 2023
10 10 motion Extension of Time to File Document Wed 12/13 8:02 AM
MOTION to Enlarge Time by Plaintiff Javenta Chapman. (kmt)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 08, 2023
9 9 misc Letter Fri 12/08 3:05 PM
Letter from Javenta Chapman regarding case. (kmt)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 21, 2023
8 8 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Tue 11/21 5:00 PM
ORDER granting7 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; ORDERS the plaintiff, Javenta Chapman a/k/a Javentay Chapman, IDOC # 292979, BOP # 73301-509, Porter County Jail # 971568, to immediately pay (and the facility having custody to automatically remit) $18.00 to the clerk in payment of the initial partial filing fee; ORDERS the plaintiff to pay (and the facility having custody to automatically remit) to the clerk 20% of the money received for each calendar month during which $10.00 or more is received, until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full; DIRECTS the clerk to create a ledger for receipt of these funds; and DIRECTS the clerk to send a copy of this order to each facility where the plaintiff is housed until the filing fee has been paid in full. Signed by Judge Jon E DeGuilio on 11/21/2023. (Copy mailed to pro se party and Porter County Jail as directed in Order). (nhc)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 20, 2023
7 7 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Tue 11/21 12:19 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Prisoner Trust Account Ledger attached) by Plaintiff Javenta Chapman. (kmt)
Related: [-]
6 6 cmp Amended Complaint Tue 11/21 12:17 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Westville Correctional Facility, Robison, Porter, Navarro, Winters, Centurion Health Care LLC, filed by Javenta Chapman.(kmt)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Deadlines/Hearings Tue 11/21 12:20 PM
***Amended Pleadings and Deficiency Deadlines terminated. (kmt)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 16, 2023
5 5 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Fri 11/17 12:20 PM
ORDER: The Court CONSTRUES the filing3 as a Motion to Enlarge Time; GRANTS the motion3 ; ENLARGES to 12/6/2023, the deadline to resolve his filing fee status and file an amended complaint on a Pro Se 14 (INND Rev. 2/20) Prisoner Complaint form; and REMINDS Javenta Chapman that if he does not respond by the deadline, this case may be dismissed without further notice. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 11/16/2023. (Copy mailed to pro se party). (nhc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 08, 2023
12 12 cmp Amended Complaint Wed 12/13 4:18 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Navarro, Porter, Robison, Winters, filed by Javenta Chapman. (Filed from Order (DE 4) in case 3:23-cv-983)(sej)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Monday, November 06, 2023
4 4 notice Notice of Change of Address Tue 11/07 3:41 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address by Westville Correctional Facility from Westville Correctional Facility to Porter County Jail pursuant to DE3 (kmt)
Related: [-]
3 3 motion Extension of Time to File Document Tue 11/07 3:39 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time, titled as Order, by Plaintiff Javenta Chapman. (kmt)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 21, 2023
2 2 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Thu 09/21 2:54 PM
ORDER: The Court GRANTS Javenta Chapman until 10/30/2023, to file a complaint on a Pro Se 14 (INND Rev. 2/20) Prisoner Complaint form and resolve his filing fee status, and CAUTIONS him that if he does not respond by the deadline, this case may be dismissed without further notice. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 9/21/2023. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(mrm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 19, 2023
1 1 cmp Pro Se Complaint Wed 09/20 2:33 PM
PRO SE COMPLAINT against Westville Correctional Facility, Wexford Medical, filed by Javenta Chapman.(No filing fee or IFP received)(File stamped copy with case number sent to Chapman)(kmt)
Related: [-]