Indiana Northern District Court
Judge:Philip P Simon
Referred: Joshua P Kolar
Case #: 3:23-cv-00864
Nature of Suit380 Torts - Personal Property - Other Personal Property Damage
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Petition for Removal
Case Filed:Sep 20, 2023
Terminated:Nov 06, 2023
Last checked: Monday Mar 18, 2024 4:26 AM EDT
Defendant
University of Notre Dame Du Lac
Represented By
Paul Edgar Harold
Southbank Legal Llc - Sb/in
contact info
Edward W Hearn
Johnson & Bell Ltd - Cp/in
contact info
Catherine A Breitweiser-Hurst
Johnson & Bell Ltd - Cp/in
contact info
John A Conway
Southbank Legal Llc - Sb/in
contact info
Kimberly A Kennedy
Southbank Legal Llc - Sb/in
contact info
Plaintiff
Rocco Campanelli
Represented By
Jonathan P Mincieli
Meyers & Flowers
contact info
Tyler J Zipes
Hovde Dassow & Deets LLC
contact info
Thomas M Connelly PHV
Meyers & Flowers
contact info
Robert T Dassow
Hovde Dassow & Deets LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Monday, November 06, 2023
25 25 9 pgs order Opinion and Order Order Remanding Case to State Court Tue 11/07 9:58 AM
OPINION AND ORDER: Campanellis Motion for Remand to State Court9 is GRANTED, and this action is hereby REMANDED to St. Joseph Circuit Court pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1447. Signed by Judge Philip P Simon on 11/06/2023. (Certified copy of docket and order mailed to Clerk, St. Joseph Circuit Court)(sej)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 25, 2023
24 24 respm Reply to Response to Motion Wed 10/25 3:24 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re9 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Rocco Campanelli. (Dassow, Robert)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 18, 2023
23 23 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 10/18 5:10 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Kimberly A Kennedy on behalf of University of Notre Dame Du Lac (Kennedy, Kimberly)
Related: [-]
22 22 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 10/18 5:08 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by John A Conway on behalf of University of Notre Dame Du Lac (Conway, John)
Related: [-]
21 21 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 10/18 5:06 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Paul Edgar Harold on behalf of University of Notre Dame Du Lac (Harold, Paul)
Related: [-]
20 20 respm Response to Motion Wed 10/18 5:05 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re9 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by University of Notre Dame Du Lac.(Harold, Paul)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
Friday, October 13, 2023
19 19 respm Reply to Response to Motion Fri 10/13 3:24 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re15 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by University of Notre Dame Du Lac. (Hearn, Edward)
Related: [-]
18 18 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Fri 10/13 3:04 PM
ORDER: Finding good cause for15 Motion to Extend Deadline to File Responsive Pleading, the Court overrules the objection17 and GRANTS15 . The deadline for Defendant University of Notre Dame Du Luc to file a responsive pleading is EXTENDED to 11/14/2023. Approved by Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar on 10/13/2023. Text entry order. (tc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 11, 2023
17 17 respm Response to Motion Wed 10/11 9:07 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re15 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Rocco Campanelli.(Dassow, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A-Plaintiff's Motion to Remand
Tuesday, October 10, 2023
16 16 order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Tue 10/10 11:59 AM
ORDER: Upon consideration of15 Defendant's Motion To Extend Deadline To File Responsive Pleading, Plaintiff's response, if any, MUST BE FILED by 12:00 p.m. Central Time, Thursday, October 12, 2023. Pending the filing of a response to and ruling on Defendant's motion15 , Defendant's deadline to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint is STAYED. Approved by Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar on 10/10/2023. Text entry order. (tc)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 06, 2023
15 15 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Fri 10/06 5:00 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendant University of Notre Dame Du Lac.(Hearn, Edward)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B
14 14 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 10/06 2:43 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas M Connelly PHV on behalf of Rocco Campanelli (Connelly PHV, Thomas)
Related: [-]
13 13 misc Mag Consent Forms Sent - Standard - pptc already held or no pptc - form will be generated Fri 10/06 12:34 PM
MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties. Magistrate Consent forms due by 10/27/2023. (tc)
Related: [-]
12 12 3 pgs order Order on Attorney Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 10/06 11:52 AM
ORDER granting10 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Thomas M Connelly PHV for Rocco Campanelli. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar on 10/6/2023. (ace)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 05, 2023
11 11 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 10/05 3:55 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan P Mincieli on behalf of Rocco Campanelli (Mincieli, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 04, 2023
10 10 motion Attorney Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 10/04 3:20 PM
Application for Attorney Thomas Michael Connelly to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Rocco Campanelli. Pro Hac Vice fee of $ 96 has been received, receipt number AINNDC-5373509(Connelly, Thomas)
Related: [-]
9 9 motion Remand Wed 10/04 10:49 AM
MOTION to Remand to State Court by Plaintiff Rocco Campanelli.(Dassow, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A-Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit B-Email,
Att: 3 Exhibit C-Email,
Att: 4 Exhibit D-Removal,
Att: 5 Exhibit E-Email,
Att: 6 Exhibit F-Service,
Att: 7 Exhibit G-Service2
Tuesday, September 26, 2023
8 8 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case Wed 09/27 12:48 PM
ORDER OF RECUSAL: The presiding judge recuses from this case pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 455(a). Case reassigned to Judge Philip P Simon for all further proceedings. Chief Judge Holly A Brady no longer assigned to case Signed by Judge Damon R Leichty on 9/26/2023. (shk)
Related: [-]
7 7 order Order Tue 09/26 10:09 AM
MINUTE ORDER: Each party and each attorney in this case shall take reasonable steps to preserve electronically stored information (ESI) that is relevant to any claim or defense in this case, whether or not the information is admissible at trial. This requirement relates back to the point in time when the party or attorney reasonably anticipated litigation about these matters. Text entry order. By Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar on 9/26/2023. (tc)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 25, 2023
utility Add and Terminate Judges Mon 09/25 9:57 AM
Chief Judge Holly A Brady and Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar added. Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr and Judge Damon R Leichty no longer assigned to case. (DATA ENTRY ERROR AT CASE ASSIGNMENT) (lns)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 22, 2023
6 6 1 pgs order Order Mon 09/25 2:27 PM
ORDER: Pursuant to Local Rule 40-1(f)(2)(b), this action is reassigned to Chief Judge Holly A. Brady for all further proceedings. Signed by Chief Judge Holly A Brady on 9/22/2023. (rmf)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 21, 2023
utility Add and Terminate Judges Thu 09/21 9:33 AM
**NEW CASE** Judge Damon R Leichty and Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr added. (sej)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 20, 2023
5 5 cmp State Court Complaint Thu 09/21 9:36 AM
STATE COURT COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against University of Notre Dame Du Lac, filed by Rocco Campanelli in St. Joseph County Circuit Court, Cause Number 71C01-2309-CT-000487. (sej)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 09/20 7:25 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Catherine A Breitweiser-Hurst on behalf of UNIVERSITY OF NOTRE DAME DU LAC (Breitweiser-Hurst, Catherine)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 09/20 7:20 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by UNIVERSITY OF NOTRE DAME DU LAC. (Hearn, Edward)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 09/20 7:19 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Edward W Hearn on behalf of UNIVERSITY OF NOTRE DAME DU LAC (Hearn, Edward)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Wed 09/20 7:12 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AINNDC-5360083.) from St. Joseph Circuit Court, Cause No. 71C01-2309-CT-000487, filed by UNIVERSITY OF NOTRE DAME DU LAC.(Hearn, Edward)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Exhibit State Court Filings