Nevada District Court
Judge:Miranda M Du
Referred: Carla Baldwin
Case #: 3:23-cv-00459
Nature of Suit550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Case Filed:Sep 19, 2023
Terminated:Oct 10, 2023
Last checked: Thursday Sep 21, 2023 10:44 PM PDT
Defendant
Bossier City
Defendant
Department of Correction
Defendant
Marcus Gober
Defendant
Melaine Allen Gober
Defendant
Bossier Parish
Defendant
Caddo Parish
Defendant
Marcus Robertson
Defendant
Jessica Sledge
Defendant
Chasity Washington
Plaintiff
Keyante Monique James
0000209129 #15761 2985 Old Plain Dealing Road
Plain Dealing, LA 71064


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Tuesday, October 10, 2023
5 5 notice Notice Other Thu 10/12 10:25 AM
NOTICES by Keyante Monique James.(LG)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 other
3 3 2 pgs order Order Tue 10/10 3:19 PM
TRANSFER ORDER - It is ordered that the Clerk of the Court will transfer this case to the United States District Court for the Western District of Louisiana, Shreveport Division, and close the case in this District. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 10/10/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DLS)
Related: [-]
transfer Transmittal - Electronic Case Transfer Out to other District Tue 10/10 3:25 PM
TRANSMITTAL of case to the Western District of Louisiana. Case and docket sheet transferred electronically. (no image attached) (DLS)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 21, 2023
2 2 notice Advisory Letter Pro Se non-habeas Thu 09/21 9:48 AM
ADVISORY LETTER to litigant. (DLS)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 19, 2023
1 1 motion Motion/Application Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Thu 09/21 9:41 AM
MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Keyante Monique James. (DLS) (DLS). Modified on 9/21/2023 to add complaint to case (DLS)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (9/21/2023) Complaint