Case Filed:Sep 20, 2023

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Friday, January 05, 2024
31 31 4 pgs order Order on Motion for Reconsideration Fri 01/05 8:35 AM
MEMORANDUM ORDER indicating that30 Thomas Tull's Motion for Reconsideration is DENIED. See Order for further details. Signed by Judge W. Scott Hardy on 1/5/2024. (kas)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 04, 2024
30 30 motion Reconsideration Thu 01/04 4:03 PM
MOTION for Reconsideration re29 Order on Motion to Strike, by THOMAS TULL. (Funari, Brad)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, January 02, 2024
29 29 5 pgs order Order on Motion to Strike Tue 01/02 12:21 PM
MEMORANDUM ORDER indicating that26 Thomas Tull's Motion to Strike Bronze Buffalo Club Companies, LLC's Subpoena to Compel Witness's Appearance at Deposition is DENIED. Further, the subpoena personally served upon Mr. Tull on 12/8/2023 is MODIFIED as further set forth in the Court's Memorandum Order. See Memorandum Order for further details. Signed by Judge W. Scott Hardy on 1/2/2024. (kas)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 28, 2023
28 28 respoth Response in Opposition Thu 12/28 4:20 PM
RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION Motion to Strike, and Brief in Support of Motion to Compel Witness's Appearance at Deposition to26 Motion to Strike, filed by BRONZE BUFFALO CLUB COMPANIES, LLC. (Cundick, T.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Declaration of Nicole Stanec Dated December 28, 2023
Tuesday, December 19, 2023
27 27 misc QC - Document should have been filed as 2 separate documents Tue 12/19 6:23 PM
CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re26 Motion to Strike. ERROR: Document should have been filed as two separate documents. CORRECTION: Attorney advised in future that documents of that nature are to be filed as separate documents. Clerk of Court docketed BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF THIRD-PARTY THOMAS TULLS MOTION TO STRIKE BRONZE BUFFALO CLUB COMPANIES, LLCS SUBPOENA TO COMPEL WITNESSS APPEARANCE AT DEPOSITION. This message is for informational purposes only. (elt)
Related: [-]
26 26 motion Strike Tue 12/19 3:36 PM
MOTION to Strike Subpoena to Compel Witness's Appearance at Deposition by THOMAS TULL. (Funari, Brad)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Exhibit
respm Brief / Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion Wed 01/10 1:11 PM
w/26 BRIEF in Support re26 Motion to Strike filed by THOMAS TULL. (ept)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 13, 2023
25 25 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 12/13 3:00 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Jennings Tritschler on behalf of THOMAS TULL. (Tritschler, Robert)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 02, 2023
24 24 order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Order on Motion to Compel Thu 11/02 12:11 PM
ORDER indicating that Plaintiff's1 Motion to Compel Witness's Appearance at Deposition and8 Motion to Allow Alternative Service are denied without prejudice and Respondent's6 Motion to Quash is denied as moot as further set forth in the Oral Argument held on 11/2/2023. Signed by Judge W. Scott Hardy on 11/2/2023. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (kas)
Related: [-]
23 23 minutes Oral Argument Thu 11/02 12:11 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge W. Scott Hardy: Oral Argument held on 11/2/2023. (Court Reporter: N. Re) (kas)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 01, 2023
22 22 order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Wed 11/01 12:09 PM
ORDER granting20 Renewed Motion to Convert In-Person Argument to Virtual Argument. The Oral Argument scheduled for 11/2/2023 will be held via video conference. The Court will circulate conference login information. Signed by Judge W. Scott Hardy on 11/1/2023. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (kas)
Related: [-]
21 21 misc Status Report Wed 11/01 12:01 PM
STATUS REPORT (Joint) by BRONZE BUFFALO CLUB COMPANIES, LLC. (Cundick, T.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 31, 2023
20 20 motion Miscellaneous Relief (Use ONLY if no other relief applies) Tue 10/31 12:20 PM
MOTION to Convert Oral Argument to Virtual re 19 Order,,, Terminate Deadlines,,, Set Hearings,,, Terminate Motions,, by BRONZE BUFFALO CLUB COMPANIES, LLC. (Cundick, T.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, October 24, 2023
19 19 order Order 1 - Terminate Deadlines ~Util - Set Hearings ~Util - Terminate Motions Tue 10/24 3:46 PM
ORDER granting18 Joint Motion to Continue In-Person Argument. The Oral Argument previously set for 10/25/2023 is now set for 11/2/2023 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 3B before Judge W. Scott Hardy. The parties shall continue to confer on the merits of the pending motions and file a Status Report by Noon on 11/1/2023 informing the Court of any updates, including any resolution, in whole or part, pertaining to said motions. Signed by Judge W. Scott Hardy on 10/24/2023. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (kas)
Related: [-]
18 18 motion Continue Tue 10/24 3:03 PM
Joint MOTION to Continue by BRONZE BUFFALO CLUB COMPANIES, LLC. (Cundick, T.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, October 23, 2023
17 17 order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Mon 10/23 8:33 AM
ORDER indicating that16 Motion to Convert In-Person Hearing to Remote Hearing is denied without prejudice for failure to comply with Section II.C.1 of the Practices and Procedures of Judge W. Scott Hardy. Signed by Judge W. Scott Hardy on 10/23/2023. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (kas)
Related: [-]
16 16 motion Miscellaneous Relief (Use ONLY if no other relief applies) Mon 10/23 7:58 AM
MOTION re 15 Order,, Set Hearings,, Terminate Motions, to Convert In-Person Hearing to Virtual Hearing by BRONZE BUFFALO CLUB COMPANIES, LLC. (Cundick, T.)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 20, 2023
15 15 order Order ~Util - Set Hearings ~Util - Terminate Motions Fri 10/20 3:59 PM
ORDER granting13 Motion for Oral Argument. Oral Argument on1 Motion to Compel Witness's Appearance at Deposition and8 Motion to allow Alternative Service is set for 10/25/2023 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 3B before Judge W. Scott Hardy. Signed by Judge W. Scott Hardy on 10/20/2023. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (kas)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 19, 2023
14 14 motion Miscellaneous Relief (Use ONLY if no other relief applies) Thu 10/19 10:20 PM
MOTION Oral Argument re13 Brief in Opposition to Motion filed by THOMAS TULL,9 Response in Opposition, filed by BRONZE BUFFALO CLUB COMPANIES, LLC,6 Brief in Opposition to Motion filed by THOMAS TULL,8 MOTION Motion to Allow Alternative Service filed by BRONZE BUFFALO CLUB COMPANIES, LLC,1 MOTION to Compel Witness's Appearance at Deposition filed by BRONZE BUFFALO CLUB COMPANIES, LLC by THOMAS TULL. (Funari, Brad)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 18, 2023
13 13 respm Brief / Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion Wed 10/18 7:58 PM
BRIEF in Opposition re8 Motion to Allow Alternative Service filed by THOMAS TULL. (Funari, Brad) Modified text on 10/19/2023. (elt)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 16, 2023
12 12 order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 10/16 9:20 AM
ORDER granting11 Motion for T. Edward Cundick to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge W. Scott Hardy on 10/16/2023. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (kas)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 13, 2023
11 11 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice (for Attorney filers only, Credit Card required) Fri 10/13 4:22 PM
MOTION for attorney T. Edward Cundick to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # APAWDC-7928963) by BRONZE BUFFALO CLUB COMPANIES, LLC. (Cundick, T.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Affidavit of T. Edward Cundick in Support of Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission,
Att: 2 Exhibit (Proposed) Order of Court,
Att: 3 Certificate of Service
Wednesday, October 11, 2023
10 10 order Order Response/Briefing Schedule Wed 10/11 3:30 PM
ORDER Response/Briefing Schedule re8 Motion to Allow Alternative Service. Any Response to said motion is due by 10/18/2023. Signed by Judge W. Scott Hardy on 10/11/2023. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (kas)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 06, 2023
9 9 respoth Response in Opposition Fri 10/06 5:42 PM
RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION Movant's Response in Opposition to Motion to Quash, and Brief in Support of Motion to Compel Witness's Appearance at Deposition to6 Brief in Opposition to Motion,1 Motion to Compel,, filed by BRONZE BUFFALO CLUB COMPANIES, LLC. (Ward, William)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Certificate of Service
8 8 motion Miscellaneous Relief (Use ONLY if no other relief applies) Fri 10/06 5:20 PM
MOTION Motion to Allow Alternative Service by BRONZE BUFFALO CLUB COMPANIES, LLC. (Ward, William)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Proposed Order,
Att: 6 Certificate of Service
Monday, October 02, 2023
7 7 order Order Response/Briefing Schedule Mon 10/02 10:39 AM
ORDER Response/Briefing Schedule re:6 Third Party Thomas Tull's Response in Opposition to Movant's Motion to Compel Witness's Appearance at Deposition, or in the Alternative, Motion to Quash. Movant's Reply to the Response is due by 10/6/23. Signed by Judge W. Scott Hardy on 10/2/23. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (kw)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 29, 2023
6 6 respm Brief / Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion Fri 09/29 10:21 PM
BRIEF in Opposition re1 Motion to Compel, filed by THOMAS TULL. (Funari, Brad)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
Friday, September 22, 2023
5 5 respm Response to Motion Fri 09/22 3:51 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re3 MOTION to Continue Statement of No Opposition to Third Party Thomas tull's Motion to Continue filed by BRONZE BUFFALO CLUB COMPANIES, LLC. (Ward, William)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Certificate of Service
4 4 order Order on Motion to Continue Fri 09/22 3:32 PM
ORDER granting3 Third-Party Thomas Tull's Motion to Continue. The Response to Bronze Buffalo Club Companies, LLC's Motions to Compel Witness's Appearance at Deposition is now due by 9/29/2023. The argument scheduled for 9/25/2023 is cancelled. Counsel shall confer in good faith prior to filing a response and shall so certify. A conference/argument on said motion will be scheduled by further Order of Court. Signed by Judge W. Scott Hardy on 9/22/2023. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (kas)
Related: [-]
3 3 motion Continue Fri 09/22 12:08 PM
MOTION to Continue by THOMAS TULL. (Funari, Brad)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1,
Att: 3 Exhibit 2
Thursday, September 21, 2023
2 2 order Order Order Response/Briefing Schedule ~Util - Set Hearings Thu 09/21 3:54 PM
ORDER Response/Briefing Schedule re1 Motion to Compel Witness's Appearance at Deposition. Defendant's Response is due by 3:00 PM on 9/22/2023. Argument on said motion is set for 9/25/2023 at 9:30 AM before Judge W. Scott Hardy. Signed by Judge W. Scott Hardy on 9/21/2023. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (kas)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 20, 2023
1 1 motion Compel Thu 09/21 11:08 AM
MOTION to Compel Witness's Appearance at Deposition by BRONZE BUFFALO CLUB COMPANIES, LLC. Filing fee $49, receipt number APAWDC-7892647. (jkn)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Exhibit B,
Att: 4 Exhibit C,
Att: 5 Exhibit D