California Northern District Court
Judge:Joseph C Spero
Case #: 3:23-cv-04835
Nature of Suit465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions
Cause05:551 Administrative Procedure Act
Case Filed:Sep 21, 2023
Terminated:Jan 29, 2024
Last checked: Thursday Mar 21, 2024 4:32 AM PDT
Defendant
Department of Homeland Security
Represented By
Elizabeth D. Kurlan
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Ur M. Jaddou
Represented By
Elizabeth D. Kurlan
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Ted H. Kim
Represented By
Elizabeth D. Kurlan
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Danielle Lehman
Represented By
Elizabeth D. Kurlan
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Alejandro Mayorkas
Represented By
Elizabeth D. Kurlan
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services
Office of the Chief Counsel 20 Massachusetts Avenue NW, Room 4210
Washington, DC 20529
Represented By
Elizabeth D. Kurlan
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info
Plaintiff
Dalia Carolina Del Cid
Represented By
Sarah Kate Heilbrun
Haleynelson And Heilbrun LLP
contact info
Jonathan David Weissglass
Law Office Of Jonathan Weissglass
contact info
Plaintiff
Christhel Guissell Lopez
Represented By
Sarah Kate Heilbrun
Haleynelson And Heilbrun LLP
contact info
Jonathan David Weissglass
Law Office Of Jonathan Weissglass
contact info
Plaintiff
Ijeomi Nmezi
Represented By
Sarah Kate Heilbrun
Haleynelson And Heilbrun LLP
contact info
Jonathan David Weissglass
Law Office Of Jonathan Weissglass
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, January 26, 2024
13 13 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Fri 01/26 5:32 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Dalia Carolina Del Cid, Christhel Guissell Lopez, Ijeomi Nmezi (Heilbrun, Sarah Kate)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 04, 2023
12 12 2 pgs order Order on Stipulation Mon 12/04 8:04 AM
Order by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting 11 Stipulation To Extend Time Within Which Defendants Must File A Response. Dispositive Motion due by 12/20/2023. Responses due by 2/2/2024.(jlg, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 01, 2023
11 11 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Fri 12/01 1:48 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation to Extend Time Within Which Defendants Must File a Response and [Proposed] Order filed by Department of Homeland Security, Ur M. Jaddou, Ted H. Kim, Danielle Lehman, Alejandro Mayorkas, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services. (Kurlan, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
10 10 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Fri 12/01 1:43 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Department of Homeland Security, Ur M. Jaddou, Ted H. Kim, Danielle Lehman, Alejandro Mayorkas, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services.. (Kurlan, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 12/01 1:41 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth D. Kurlan (Kurlan, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 02, 2023
8 8 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Mon 10/02 1:23 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Dalia Carolina Del Cid, Christhel Guissell Lopez, Ijeomi Nmezi.. (Heilbrun, Sarah Kate)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Certificate/Proof of Service Mon 10/02 12:52 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Dalia Carolina Del Cid, Christhel Guissell Lopez, Ijeomi Nmezi (Heilbrun, Sarah Kate)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 22, 2023
6 6 order Immigration Mandamus Case Procedural Order Fri 09/22 12:04 PM
Immigration Mandamus Case Procedural Order. (wsn, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 09/22 11:23 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan David Weissglass (Weissglass, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Summons Issued as to USA Fri 09/22 9:27 AM
Summons Issued as to Department of Homeland Security, Ur M. Jaddou, Ted H. Kim, Danielle Lehman, Alejandro Mayorkas, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (wsn, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 21, 2023
3 3 utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Thu 09/21 9:22 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 10/5/2023. (sec, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Proposed Summons Thu 09/21 9:08 AM
Proposed Summons. (Heilbrun, Sarah Kate)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 09/21 9:03 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-18665215.). Filed byChristhel Guissell Lopez, Dalia Carolina Del Cid, Ijeomi Nmezi.(Heilbrun, Sarah Kate)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet