California Northern District Court
Judge:Vince Chhabria
Case #: 3:23-cv-04836
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause28:1442 Petition for Removal
Case Filed:Sep 21, 2023
Terminated:Dec 04, 2023
Last checked: Thursday Mar 21, 2024 4:33 AM PDT
Defendant
Ismail J. Ramsey
Represented By
Valerie Elizabeth Smith
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Ronald Smentana
Represented By
Jill Sazama
Alameda County Office Of The County Counsel
contact info
Defendant
Norman Wong
Represented By
Valerie Elizabeth Smith
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info
Plaintiff
Steven Robert Mason
20283 Santa Maria Avenue Unit 20889
Castro Valley, CA 94546

GPO Dec 04 2023
ORDER DISMISSING COMPLAINT by Judge Vince Chhabria. (vclc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2023)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)

Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, December 22, 2023
29 29 misc Mail Returned Tue 12/26 8:49 AM
Mail sent to Steven Robert Mason returned as undeliverable re 26 Clerk's Notice,. (far, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 04, 2023
28 28 order Judgment Mon 12/04 4:00 PM
JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 12/4/2023. (vclc3, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
27 27 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction Mon 12/04 3:57 PM
ORDER DISMISSING COMPLAINT by Judge Vince Chhabria. (vclc3, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
26 26 oth_evt Clerk's Notice Mon 12/04 1:08 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING 12/7/2023 MOTION HEARING. The Court will issue a written ruling based on the motion and responsive briefs. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (bxs, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 20, 2023
25 25 misc Mail Returned Tue 11/21 6:37 AM
Mail sent to Steven Robert Mason returned as undeliverable re9 Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination. (far, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 17, 2023
24 24 misc Mail Returned Mon 11/20 7:10 AM
Mail sent to Steven Robert Mason returned as undeliverable re14 Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment,. (far, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
23 23 misc Mail Returned Mon 11/20 7:09 AM
Mail sent to Steven Robert Mason returned as undeliverable re15 Order Reassigning Case,,, Case Assigned/Reassigned,,. (far, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
22 22 misc Mail Returned Mon 11/20 7:03 AM
Mail sent to Steven Robert Mason returned as undeliverable re 16 Clerk's Notice (far, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
21 21 misc Mail Returned Mon 11/20 7:01 AM
Mail sent to Steven Robert Mason returned as undeliverable re 19 Clerk's Notice,,, Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings,,. (far, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 19, 2023
20 20 notice Notice (Other) Thu 10/19 2:48 PM
NOTICE by Ismail J. Ramsey, Norman Wong re10 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Notice of Nonopposition to Federal Defendants Motion to Dismiss Dkt. 10(Smith, Valerie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate/Proof of Service
Tuesday, October 17, 2023
19 19 oth_evt Clerk's Notice ~Util - Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings Tue 10/17 3:38 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE RE18 . 6 First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) Hearing reset to 12/7/2023 at 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 04, 17th Floor before Judge Vince Chhabria. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (bxs, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
18 18 oth_sup Re-notice motion Tue 10/17 9:16 AM
Renotice motion hearing filed byIsmail J. Ramsey, Norman Wong.(Smith, Valerie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate/Proof of Service
Monday, October 16, 2023
17 17 notice Notice (Other) Mon 10/16 3:03 PM
NOTICE by Ronald Smentana re10 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support DEFENDANT SMETANAS AMENDED NOTICE OF MOTION TO DISMISS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT (Dckt. No. 10)(Sazama, Jill)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate/Proof of Service
Thursday, October 12, 2023
16 16 oth_evt Clerk's Notice ~Util - Teleconference Zoom Thu 10/12 12:58 PM
REASSIGNED CASE - NOTICE OF NEW HEARING DATE: You are notified that the Court has scheduled an Initial Case Management Conference before Judge Vince Chhabria upon reassignment. For a copy of Judge Chhabria's Standing Order and other information, please refer to the Court's website at www.cand.uscourts.gov. All pending motions will be taken off-calendar and must be re-noticed by the moving party for a new hearing according to Judge Chhabria's available dates, which are listed on his webpage under the section "Scheduling Notes." The new hearing date must be at least five weeks from the date the motion was filed and at least three weeks from the date the re-notice is filed. The due date for any opposition or reply papers not yet filed shall be calculated in accordance with Civil Local Rule 7-3. Case Management Statement due by 1/5/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/12/2024 at 10:00 AM by Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/vc] Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names and emails must be sent to the CRD at vccrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than Friday, January 5, 2024, by no later than 12:00PM. General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/] . (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (bxs, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
15 15 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case ~Util - Case Assigned/Reassigned Thu 10/12 12:47 PM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Vince Chhabria for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by on 10/12/2023.(ark, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording
14 14 oth_evt Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment Thu 10/12 10:10 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (klh, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 06, 2023
13 13 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Fri 10/06 4:11 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Ronald Smentana.. (Sazama, Jill)
Related: [-]
12 12 service Certificate/Proof of Service Fri 10/06 4:09 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ronald Smentana re11 Request for Judicial Notice,10 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Proof of Service (Sazama, Jill)
Related: [-]
11 11 oth_sup Request for Judicial Notice Fri 10/06 4:06 PM
Request for Judicial Notice re10 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Defendant Smetana's Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed byRonald Smentana. Related [+] (Sazama, Jill)
Related: [-] 10
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B
10 10 motion Dismiss Fri 10/06 4:00 PM
MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support filed by Ronald Smentana. Motion to Dismiss Hearing set for 11/17/2023 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom D, 15th Floor. Responses due by 10/20/2023. Replies due by 10/27/2023.(Sazama, Jill)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Defendant Smetana's Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint
Monday, October 02, 2023
9 9 oth_evt Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination Mon 10/02 11:16 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination. The Federal Defendants have filed a Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Accordingly, Plaintiff Steve Mason and Defendant Ronald Smentana shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: [LINK:http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms] . (Party/parties were also notified via telephone or email.) Consent/Declination due by 10/10/2023. (klh, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 28, 2023
8 8 service Certificate/Proof of Service Thu 09/28 12:53 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ismail J. Ramsey, Ronald Smentana, Norman Wong re6 First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) (Smith, Valerie)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Certificate/Proof of Service Thu 09/28 12:49 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ismail J. Ramsey, Ronald Smentana, Norman Wong re5 Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge (Smith, Valerie)
Related: [-]
6 6 motion Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction Thu 09/28 11:56 AM
First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) filed by Ismail J. Ramsey, Norman Wong. Motion Hearing set for 11/17/2023 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Responses due by 10/12/2023. Replies due by 10/19/2023. (Smith, Valerie)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 27, 2023
5 5 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Wed 09/27 11:22 AM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Ismail J. Ramsey, Norman Wong.. (Smith, Valerie)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 21, 2023
4 4 service Certificate/Proof of Service Thu 09/21 1:44 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ismail J. Ramsey, Norman Wong re1 Notice of Removal, 2 Case Assigned by Intake,,3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines, (Smith, Valerie)
Related: [-]
3 3 order Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines Thu 09/21 10:38 AM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 12/29/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/5/2024 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom D, 15th Floor. (far, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
2 2 utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Thu 09/21 10:24 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 10/5/2023. (mbc, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Thu 09/21 9:22 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Alameda County Superior Court, Unlimited Civil. Their case number is 23CV040543. (). Filed byNorman Wong, Ismail J. Ramsey.(Smith, Valerie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet