California Northern District Court
Judge:Noel Wise
Referred: Pslc Mgh
Case #: 5:23-cv-04839
Nature of Suit550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Case Filed:Sep 21, 2023
Re-opened:Aug 21, 2024
Defendant
Brandon Orlando
Defendant
Javier Rodriguez
Defendant
Jeremy Markel
Defendant
San Jose Police Department
Defendant
Valley Medical Center
Plaintiff
Eshawn Maurice Harrell

GPO Apr 08 2024
ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge James Donato on 4/8/2024. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2024)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
GPO Aug 21 2024
ORDER REOPENING CASE. Signed by Judge James Donato on 8/21/2024. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2024)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)

Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Monday, March 17, 2025
34 34 misc Case Management Statement Mon 03/17 11:54 AM
CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Jeremy Markel, Brandon Orlando. (Sympson, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
33 33 misc Statement Tue 03/11 2:34 PM
Statement re27 MOTION for Summary Judgment ,31 Reply to Opposition/Response, 30 Remark,28 Opposition/Response to Motion,29 Order,, Terminate Deadlines and Hearings, by Jeremy Markel, Brandon Orlando. (Sympson, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 24, 2025
32 32 oth_evt Clerks Notice ADI Mon 02/24 8:51 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. IT IS ORDERED that this case is reassigned to the Honorable Noël Wise in the San Jose Division for all further proceedings. 1. All future filings shall bear the initials NW immediately after the case number. 2. All case management conference dates are vacated and will be reset by the Court. 3. All hearing dates presently scheduled are VACATED . However, existing briefing schedules for motions remain unchanged. Motions must be RENOTICED for hearing before Judge Wise by the moving party for a date consistent with the Court?s law and motion calendar, but the renoticing of the hearing does not affect the prior briefing schedule. 4. Deadlines for ADR compliance and discovery cutoffs remain unchanged. 5. All pretrial conference and trial dates currently set for after May 27, 2025 , and all other deadlines associated with the case, will remain in place unless otherwise ordered. 6. All pretrial conference and trial dates scheduled on or before May 27, 2025 are vacated. Other pretrial deadlines ( eg. , motions in limine, pretrial statements, proposed joint trial exhibits, etc.) will remain in place. The Court will notify the parties when a status conference will be held to schedule a new pretrial conference and trial dates for affected cases. 7. Matters currently referred to a Magistrate Judge will remain before that Magistrate Judge absent further notice. 8. On or before March 17, 2025 , the parties shall file a Joint Case Management Statement (separate statements are appropriate if either party is proceeding without counsel). The statement should not exceed ten pages in length and should address all issues outlines in the [LINK:Standing Order for All Judges of the Northern District.] the approved form for such statements can be accessed [LINK:here] : a. The parties are not required to complete a section if inapplicable. As number 20, the statement shall provide the following information: (i) a list or description of each party; (ii) a summary of all claims, counter-claims, cross-claims, or third party claims and the date the complaint and cross-complaint(s) were filed; and (iii) a brief procedural history of the case (chart format welcomed) including, but not limited to, any ADR proceedings or settlement conferences that have been scheduled or concluded and any appellate proceedings that are pending or concluded. b. If the parties believe that an immediate case management conference is needed, the parties shall explain why and identify the urgent matters that require attention. If there is no immediate need, a case management conference will be scheduled or reset pursuant to Paragraph 2 of this Order as needed. 9. The Joint Case Management Statement will not constitute a motion to extend or modify dates. If emergency relief is needed to modify a deadline, and the deadline is not of the type that can be modified via stipulation of the parties without a court order, the requesting party or parties shall additionally file a motion or stipulation for such relief in compliance with Local Rule 6. IT IS SO ORDERED. Dated: 02/24/2025 FOR THE EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE Mark B. Busby, Clerk of Court (kab-adi, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 02/24 2:19 PM
This case is directly assigned to District Judge Noel Wise. Judge James Donato no longer assigned to the case. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) (kab-adi, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 02, 2023
7 7 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case Mon 10/02 12:58 PM
ORDER Directing Clerk to Reassign Case. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on October 2, 2023. (svklc2, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 25, 2023
6 6 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis PSP Mon 09/25 3:49 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Eshawn Maurice Harrell. (mcl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 22, 2023
utility Remark Fri 09/22 11:50 AM
Updated plaintiff's address from a residential address in San Jose to Maguire Correctional Facility.(ljf, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 21, 2023
5 5 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis PSP Thu 09/21 3:47 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Eshawn Maurice Harrell. (mcl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Request Thu 09/21 3:47 PM
REQUEST by Eshawn Maurice Harrell. (mcl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
3 3 oth_evt Notice of Assignment of Prisoner Case to Magistrate Judge Thu 09/21 11:10 AM
Notice of Assignment of Prisoner Case to Magistrate Judge. (mcl, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
2 2 oth_evt Clerk's Notice re: IFP Thu 09/21 11:08 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE re completion of In Forma Pauperis affidavit or payment of filing fee due within 28 days. IFP Form due by 10/30/2023. (mcl, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 09/21 11:03 AM
COMPLAINT against Javier Rodriguez, San Jose Police Department, Valley Medical Center. Filed byEshawn Maurice Harrell.(mcl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Letter,
Att: 2 Envelope