Nunn v. District of Nevada
Nevada District Court | |
Judge: | Miranda M Du |
Referred: | Carla Baldwin |
Case #: | 3:23-cv-00465 |
Nature of Suit | 550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Sep 20, 2023 |
Terminated: | Mar 11, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Wednesday, March 13, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
![]() Mail Returned as Undeliverable re ECF Nos.7 Order,8 Judgment, addressed to Tyrone Noel Nunn via ESP Law Library. Per email received from ESP Law Librarian, inmate is in hospital. (DLS) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Tuesday, March 12, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
![]() JUDGMENT entered pursuant to ECF No.7 Order. Signed by Clerk of Court Debra K. Kempi on 3/12/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DLS) |
|
Monday, March 11, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
![]() ORDER - IFP Application (ECF No.5 ) is denied . This action is dismissed without prejudice based on Tyrone Noel Nunns failure to file a signed complaint and either pay the filing fee or file a complete application to proceed in forma pauperis in compliance with this Court's October 10, 2023, and January 2, 2024, orders, and for failure to state a claim. The Clerk of Court is further directed to enter judgment accordingly and close this case. No other documents may be filed in this now-closed case. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 3/11/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DLS) |
|
Tuesday, January 02, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
![]() ORDER - It is ordered that the motion for appointment of counsel (ECF No.4 ) is denied without prejudice . It is further ordered that, on or before Friday, February 2, 2024 , Nunn will either pay the full $402 filing fee or file a completed financial certificate on this Court's approved form that is signed both by the inmate and the prison or jail official. It is further ordered that, on or before Friday, February 2, 2024 , Nunn will submit a complaint to this Court. Nunn is cautioned that this action will be subject to dismissal without prejudice if he fails to timely comply with this order as detailed herein. It is further ordered that the Clerk of the Court will send Plaintiff Tyrone Noel Nunn the approved form for filing a 42 U.S.C. § 1983 complaint and instructions for the same and the approved form application to proceed in forma pauperis for an inmate and instructions for the same. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin on 1/2/2024. (Both § 1983 and IFP forms with instructions ATTACHED hereto for distribution to P via ESP Law Library.) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CJS) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Tuesday, November 28, 2023 | ||
5 | 5
![]() MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, by Plaintiff Tyrone Noel Nunn. (GA) |
|
4 | 4
![]() MOTION for Appointment of Counsel by Plaintiff Tyrone Noel Nunn. (LG) |
|
Tuesday, October 10, 2023 | ||
3 | 3
![]() ORDER - It is ordered that on or before December 11, 2023 , Plaintiff will either pay the full $402 filing fee or file a fully complete application to proceed in forma pauperis with all three required documents. It is further ordered that, on or before December 11, 2023 , Plaintiff will submit a complaint to this Court. It is further ordered that the Clerk of the Court will send Plaintiff Tyrone Noel Nunn the approved form for filing a 42 U.S.C. § 1983 complaint and instructions for the same and the approved form application to proceed in forma pauperis for an inmate and instructions for the same. (ATTACHED HERETO FOR DISTRIBUTION TO P VIA ESP LAW LIBRARY) . Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin on 10/10/2023.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DLS) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Thursday, September 21, 2023 | ||
2 | 2
![]() ADVISORY LETTER to litigant. (GA) |
|
Wednesday, September 20, 2023 | ||
1 | 1
![]() RECEIPT of Initiating Documents by Court on behalf of Plaintiff. No Application to Proceed IFP or Filing Fee received. (GA) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |