Utah District Court
Judge:Tena Campbell
Case #: 2:23-cv-00654
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Case Filed:Sep 21, 2023
Terminated:Oct 05, 2023
Last checked: Thursday Mar 21, 2024 6:15 AM MDT
Defendant
Clark Sharp and Reynolds LLC
Plaintiff
OptConnect Management LLC
Represented By
Sanna-Rae Taylor
Taft Stettinius & Hollister LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 74 minutes ago
Thursday, October 05, 2023
10 10 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (Atty) Thu 10/05 11:50 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff OptConnect Management LLC (Taylor, Sanna-Rae)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case Thu 10/05 2:42 PM
Civil Case Terminated per10 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal - CASE CLOSED (alt)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 27, 2023
9 9 service Request Summons Wed 09/27 2:49 PM
Requested Summons as to Clark Sharp and Reynolds LLC. (Taylor, Sanna-Rae)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Request Summons Wed 09/27 2:48 PM
Requested Summons as to Clark Sharp and Reynolds LLC. (Taylor, Sanna-Rae)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Request Summons Wed 09/27 2:46 PM
Requested Summons as to Clark Sharp and Reynolds LLC. (Taylor, Sanna-Rae)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Request Summons Wed 09/27 2:43 PM
Requested Summons as to Clark Sharp and Reynolds LLC. (Taylor, Sanna-Rae)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Wed 09/27 8:56 AM
NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE AVAILABILITY TO PRESIDE OVER CASE- Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed. R. Civ. P. 73, and DUCivR 72-4, you are hereby notified that a magistrate judge for the District of Utah may conduct any or all proceedings in this case, including a jury or bench trial and entry of a final judgment. Exercise of this jurisdiction by the magistrate judge is permitted only if all parties voluntarily sign and return the form. To consent, return the Consent Form to the clerk's office within 21 days via email at consents@utd.uscourts.gov or mail at the address on the form. Please do not efile the Consent Form in the case. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiff OptConnect Management LLC. (Notice generated by Clerk's Office) Form due by 10/18/2023. (mh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 21, 2023
4 4 1 pgs order Order to Show Cause Thu 09/21 4:20 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE why this action should not be dismissed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Tena Campbell on 9/21/23 (alt)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Summons Issued Electronically Thu 09/21 2:05 PM
Summons Issued Electronically as to Clark, Sharp and Reynolds, LLC (d/b/a CoinSource). Instructions to Counsel: 1. Click on the document number. 2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF. 3. Print the issued summons for service. (kec)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Request Summons Thu 09/21 1:28 PM
Requested Summons as to Clark, Sharp and Reynolds, LLC (d/b/a CoinSource). (Taylor, Sanna-Rae)
Related: [-]
1 1 14 pgs cmp Complaint (Atty) Thu 09/21 1:11 PM
COMPLAINT against Clark, Sharp and Reynolds, LLC (d/b/a CoinSource) (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AUTDC-4817000) filed by OptConnect Management LLC. (Taylor, Sanna-Rae)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 Master Contract,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 Invoices,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 ERC Credit,
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Add and Terminate Judges Thu 09/21 1:58 PM
Judge Tena Campbell added. Case number will now read 2:23-cv-00654-TC. Please make changes to document captions accordingly. (kec)
Related: [-]