California Northern District Court
Judge:Vince Chhabria
Case #: 3:23-cv-04844
Nature of Suit850 Other Statutes - Securities/Commodities/Exchange
Cause15:78m(a) Securities Exchange Act
Case Filed:Sep 21, 2023
Terminated:Oct 25, 2023
Last checked: Thursday Mar 21, 2024 4:33 AM PDT
Defendant
Brett Adcock
Defendant
Archer Aviation, Inc.
Represented By
Michael D. Celio
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
contact info
Jessica Valenzuela
Gibson Dunn & Crutcher LLP
contact info
Jeffrey David Lombard
contact info
Josh A. Krevitt
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher
contact info
Defendant
Adam Goldstein
Represented By
Michael D. Celio
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
contact info
Jessica Valenzuela
Gibson Dunn & Crutcher LLP
contact info
Jeffrey David Lombard
contact info
Josh A. Krevitt
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher
contact info
Defendant
Ben Lu
Represented By
Michael D. Celio
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
contact info
Jessica Valenzuela
Gibson Dunn & Crutcher LLP
contact info
Jeffrey David Lombard
contact info
Josh A. Krevitt
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher
contact info
Defendant
Mark Mesler
Represented By
Michael D. Celio
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
contact info
Jessica Valenzuela
Gibson Dunn & Crutcher LLP
contact info
Jeffrey David Lombard
contact info
Josh A. Krevitt
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher
contact info
Plaintiff
Ken Cenderelli
Represented By
Jennifer Pafiti
Pomerantz LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Wednesday, October 25, 2023
14 14 4 pgs order Order on Stipulation Wed 10/25 1:33 PM
Order by Judge Vince Chhabria granting 13 Stipulation Regarding Voluntary Dismissal. (bxs, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 23, 2023
13 13 4 pgs motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Mon 10/23 2:31 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Voluntary Dismissal filed by Ken Cenderelli. (Pafiti, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 13, 2023
12 12 15 pgs motion Dismiss Fri 10/13 4:27 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Complaint for Violations of the Federal Securities Laws filed by Archer Aviation, Inc., Adam Goldstein, Ben Lu, Mark Mesler. Motion to Dismiss Hearing set for 11/30/2023 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 04, 17th Floor. Responses due by 10/27/2023. Replies due by 11/3/2023.(Celio, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Michael D. Celio,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
11 11 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 10/13 4:16 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey David Lombard for Defendants Archer Aviation Inc., Adam Goldstein, Ben Lu and Mark Mesler (Lombard, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 10/13 4:13 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Josh A. Krevitt for Defendants Archer Aviation Inc., Adam Goldstein, Ben Lu and Mark Mesler (Krevitt, Josh)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 10/13 4:07 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica Valenzuela for Defendants Archer Aviation Inc., Adam Goldstein, Ben Lu and Mark Mesler (Valenzuela, Jessica)
Related: [-]
8 8 3 pgs notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Fri 10/13 4:00 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Archer Aviation, Inc. and Certification of Interested Entities or Persons (Celio, Michael)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 10/13 3:55 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Michael D. Celio for Defendants Archer Aviation Inc., Adam Goldstein, Ben Lu and Mark Mesler (Celio, Michael)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 02, 2023
6 6 3 pgs notice Notice (Other) Mon 10/02 11:05 AM
NOTICE by Ken Cenderelli Notice of Publication of Notice of Pendency of Action(Pafiti, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 5 pgs Exhibit A - Notice of Pendency of Action
Thursday, September 21, 2023
5 5 2 pgs service Summons Issued Thu 09/21 3:02 PM
Summons Issued as to Brett Adcock, Archer Aviation, Inc., Adam Goldstein, Ben Lu, Mark Mesler. (cv, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
4 4 2 pgs order Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines Thu 09/21 2:58 PM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Case Management Statement due by 12/15/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/22/2023 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 04, 17th Floor.(cv, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording
3 3 utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Thu 09/21 2:33 PM
Case assigned to Judge Vince Chhabria. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 10/5/2023. (bw, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Proposed Summons Thu 09/21 1:17 PM
Proposed Summons. (Pafiti, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
1 1 38 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 09/21 1:15 PM
COMPLAINT against Brett Adcock, Archer Aviation, Inc., Adam Goldstein, Ben Lu, Mark Mesler ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-18666931.). Filed byKen Cenderelli.(Pafiti, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certification,
Att: 2 Schedule A,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet