Nevada District Court
Judge:Anne R Traum
Referred: Craig S Denney
Case #: 3:23-cv-00467
Nature of Suit550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Case Filed:Sep 21, 2023
Terminated:Jun 18, 2024

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Friday, June 28, 2024
9 9 misc Mail Returned Fri 06/28 12:15 PM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable re7 Order,8 Judgment addressed to Anthony Ray Price at Washoe County Detention Center. (DLS)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 20, 2024
8 8 order Judgment Thu 06/20 8:35 AM
JUDGMENT entered pursuant to ECF No.7 Order. Signed by Clerk of Court Debra K. Kempi on 6/20/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - GA)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 18, 2024
7 7 3 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Case Thu 06/20 8:27 AM
ORDER - It is therefore ordered that this action is dismissed without prejudice based on Plaintiff's failure to file an updated address in compliance with this Courts May 7, 2024, order. The Clerk of Court is directed to enter judgment accordingly and close this case. No other documents may be filed in this now-closed case. If Plaintiff wishes to pursue his claims, he must file a complaint in a new case and provide the Court with his current address. Signed by District Judge Anne R. Traum on 6/18/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - GA)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 14, 2024
6 6 misc Mail Returned Tue 05/14 10:54 AM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable re5 Order addressed to Anthony Ray Price. (DLS)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 07, 2024
5 5 1 pgs order Order Tue 05/07 10:59 AM
ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff will file his updated address with the Court on or before June 7, 2024 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Craig S. Denney on 5/7/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DLS)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 04, 2023
4 4 motion Motion/Application Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Thu 10/05 9:00 AM
MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Anthony Ray Price. (DLS)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 25, 2023
3 3 2 pgs order Order Mon 09/25 12:23 PM
ORDER - Plaintiff has until November 21, 2023 , to either pay the full $402 filing fee or file a fully complete application to proceed in forma pauperis with all three required documents. The Clerk of the Court is directed to send Plaintiff the approved form application to proceed in forma pauperis for an inmate and instructions for the same and retain the complaint (ECF No.1 -1) but not file it at this time. (Mailed 9/25/2023). Signed by Magistrate Judge Craig S. Denney on 9/25/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DLS)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 21, 2023
2 2 notice Advisory Letter Pro Se non-habeas Thu 09/21 2:48 PM
ADVISORY LETTER to litigant. (DLS)
Related: [-]
1 1 misc Receipt Initiating Documents Thu 09/21 2:44 PM
RECEIPT of Initiating Documents by Court on behalf of Plaintiff. No Application to Proceed IFP or Filing Fee received. (DLS)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Complaint