California Northern District Court
Judge:Lisa J Cisneros
Case #: 3:23-cv-04848
Nature of Suit465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions
Cause28:1361 Petition for Writ of Mandamus
Case Filed:Sep 21, 2023
Terminated:Feb 01, 2024
Last checked: Thursday Mar 21, 2024 4:33 AM PDT
Defendant
Ur M. Jaddou
Represented By
Elizabeth D. Kurlan
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Danielle E. Lehman
Represented By
Elizabeth D. Kurlan
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Alejandro N. Mayorkas
Represented By
Elizabeth D. Kurlan
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info
Plaintiff
Long Zhang
Represented By
Justin X. Wang
Baughman & Wang
contact info

GPO Dec 01 2023
Order by Magistrate Judge Lisa J. Cisneros granting 11 Stipulation to Stay Proceedings.(ljclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2023)

Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Thursday, February 01, 2024
13 13 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Thu 02/01 11:05 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Long Zhang (Wang, Justin)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 01, 2023
12 12 3 pgs order Order on Stipulation Fri 12/01 10:52 AM
Order by Magistrate Judge Lisa J. Cisneros granting 11 Stipulation to Stay Proceedings.(ljclc1, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
11 11 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Fri 12/01 9:24 AM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation to Stay Proceedings; [Proposed] Order filed by Ur M. Jaddou, Danielle E. Lehman, Alejandro N. Mayorkas. (Kurlan, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
10 10 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Fri 12/01 9:22 AM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Ur M. Jaddou, Danielle E. Lehman, Alejandro N. Mayorkas.. (Kurlan, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 12/01 9:21 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth D. Kurlan (Kurlan, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 02, 2023
8 8 service Summons Returned Executed as to USA Mon 10/02 3:24 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Long Zhang. Ur M. Jaddou served on 10/2/2023, answer due 12/1/2023; Danielle E. Lehman served on 10/2/2023, answer due 12/1/2023; Alejandro N. Mayorkas served on 10/2/2023, answer due 12/1/2023. (Wang, Justin)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 26, 2023
7 7 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Tue 09/26 11:31 AM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Long Zhang.. (Wang, Justin)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 22, 2023
6 6 service Summons Issued as to USA Fri 09/22 12:41 PM
Summons Issued as to Ur M. Jaddou, Danielle E. Lehman, Alejandro N. Mayorkas, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (hdj, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
5 5 order Immigration Mandamus Case Procedural Order Fri 09/22 12:25 PM
Immigration Mandamus Case Procedural Order (hdj, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 21, 2023
4 4 utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Thu 09/21 2:57 PM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Lisa J. Cisneros. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 10/5/2023. (ark, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Thu 09/21 2:44 PM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Long Zhang (Wang, Justin)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Proposed Summons Thu 09/21 2:41 PM
Proposed Summons. (Wang, Justin)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 09/21 2:39 PM
COMPLAINT against Ur M. Jaddou, Danielle E. Lehman, Alejandro N. Mayorkas ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-18667466.). Filed byLong Zhang.(Wang, Justin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet