California Northern District Court
Judge:Trina L Thompson
Case #: 3:23-cv-04849
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Case Filed:Sep 21, 2023
Last checked: Thursday Mar 21, 2024 4:33 AM PDT
Defendant
Bank of America, N.A.
Represented By
Joseph M Crittenden
Mcguirewoods LLP
contact info
Defendant
Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Defendant
Trans Union LLC
Represented By
Charlotte A. Long
Trans Union, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Mary Silver
Represented By
Adrian Bacon
Law Offices Of Todd M. Friedman, P.C.
contact info
Todd Michael Friedman
Law Offices Of Todd M. Friedman
contact info
Matthew R. Snyder
Law Offices Of Todd M. Friedman, P.C.
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Equifax Information Services LLC
Terminated: 02/29/2024
Represented By
Thomas P. Quinn, Jr.
Nokes & Quinn Apc
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Thursday, June 06, 2024
32 32 order Order Thu 06/06 5:19 PM
ORDER (ECF 31): The parties filed a stipulation on June 5, 2024 notifying the Court of the Parties' Voluntary Dismissal with prejudice under Rule 41(a) as to Defendant Bank of America, N.A. and Defendant Trans Union, LLC. Plaintiff's claims are now dismissed with prejudice as to all defendants. The Clerk of the Court is ordered to terminate the case. This Order resolves ECF No. 31. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trina L. Thompson on June 6, 2024. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tltlc1, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 05, 2024
31 31 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Wed 06/05 4:52 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice filed by Mary Silver.(Friedman, Todd)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, March 18, 2024
30 30 order Case Management Scheduling Order Mon 03/18 8:55 AM
CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Trina L. Thompson on 3/14/2024. (rfm, COURT USER)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 14, 2024
29 29 minutes Case Management Conference - Initial ~Util - Case Referred to Private ADR ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Fri 03/15 3:47 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Trina L Thompson: Initial Case Management Conference held on 3/14/2024. Case referred to Private ADR to be completed by 12/19/2024. Jury Selection set for 6/15/2026 - 6/22/2026 at 8:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 09, 19th Floor before Judge Trina L Thompson. Estimated Length: 5 days. Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/7/2026 at 3:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 09, 19th Floor. Joint Pretrial Statement with Objections due by 3/26/2026. Dispositive Motion Hearing set for 7/1/2025 at 2:00 PM before Judge Trina L Thompson. Dispositive Motion due by 1/31/2025. Close of Expert Discovery is 1/10/2025. Rebuttal Reports due by 12/6/2024. Opening Reports due by 11/29/2024. Close of Fact Discovery is 11/19/2024. Further Case Management Conference set for 8/15/2024 at 2:00 PM in San Francisco - Videoconference Only. Joint Case Management Statement due by 8/8/2024. Amended Pleadings due by 4/30/2024. Scheduling order to be issued. Total Time in Court: 6 minutes. Court Reporter: Not reported. Plaintiff Attorney: Matthew Snyder. Defendant Attorney: Joseph Crittenden. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (rfm, COURT USER) (Date Filed: 3/14/2024)
Related: [-]
utility Case Referred to Private ADR Fri 03/15 4:05 PM
CASE REFERRED to Private ADR. (cmf, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 08, 2024
28 28 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 03/08 6:19 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew R. Snyder (Snyder, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 07, 2024
27 27 misc Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting Thu 03/07 4:01 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting . (Friedman, Todd)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 29, 2024
26 26 1 pgs order Order on Stipulation Thu 02/29 8:11 AM
ORDER GRANTING 25 STIPULATION to dismiss defendant EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES LLC. only. Signed by Judge Trina L Thompson on 2/29/2024. (rfm, COURT USER)
Related: [-]
25 25 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Thu 02/29 12:08 AM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to dismiss defendant EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES LLC. only filed by Mary Silver.(Bacon, Adrian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, January 24, 2024
24 24 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Wed 01/24 9:49 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal with prejudice as to defendant EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS INC.;only by Mary Silver (Friedman, Todd)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 29, 2023
23 23 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Continue Fri 12/29 10:41 AM
ORDER GRANTING 22 JOINT MOTION TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Trina L Thompson on 12/29/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set 1/11/2024 is re-set for 3/14/2024 at 2:00 PM in San Francisco - Videoconference Only. Joint Case Management Statement due by 3/7/2024. (rfm, COURT USER)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 28, 2023
22 22 motion Continue Thu 12/28 3:14 PM
Joint MOTION to Continue Case Management Conference filed by Mary Silver.(Friedman, Todd)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, December 18, 2023
21 21 adr ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options Mon 12/18 5:26 PM
ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options intend to stipulate to ADR process (Friedman, Todd)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 18, 2023
20 20 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Wed 10/18 4:30 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal without prejudice as to defendant Trans Union LLC only by Mary Silver (Friedman, Todd)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 03, 2023
19 19 oth_evt Clerk's Notice Setting Zoom Hearing Tue 10/03 10:18 AM
CLERKS NOTICE - REASSIGNED CASE - NOTICE OF NEW HEARING DATE: You are notified that the Court has scheduled an Initial Case Management Conference before Judge Trina L. Thompson upon reassignment. For a copy of Judge Thompson's Standing Order and other information, please refer to the Court's website at www.cand.uscourts.gov. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/11/2024 at 2:00 PM in San Francisco - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. Joint Case Management Statement due by 1/4/2024. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/trina-l-thompson/] General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/] . (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (rfm, COURT USER)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 02, 2023
18 18 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Mon 10/02 8:12 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Mary Silver.. (Friedman, Todd)
Related: [-]
17 17 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case ~Util - Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 10/02 2:04 PM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Trina L Thompson for all further proceedings. Judge Susan Illston no longer assigned to case. Signed by Clerk on 10/02/2023. (mbc, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
16 16 1 pgs order Order of Recusal Mon 10/02 10:14 AM
ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 10/2/2023. (ec, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
15 15 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case ~Util - Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 10/02 9:38 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Susan Illston for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Clerk on 10/02/2023.(mbc, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording
14 14 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Mon 10/02 7:57 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Equifax Information Services LLC identifying Corporate Parent Equifax Inc. for Equifax Information Services LLC. (Quinn, Thomas)
Related: [-]
13 13 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 10/02 7:52 AM
ANSWER to Complaint byEquifax Information Services LLC. (Quinn, Thomas)
Related: [-]
12 12 oth_evt Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment - Text Only Mon 10/02 7:15 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (mkl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 29, 2023
11 11 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Fri 09/29 3:34 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Bank of America, N.A... (Crittenden, Joseph)
Related: [-]
10 10 2 pgs order Order on Stipulation Fri 09/29 11:18 AM
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim granting 9 Stipulation for Extension of Time for Defendant Trans Union LLC to Respond to Complaint. (mkl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 28, 2023
9 9 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Thu 09/28 9:16 AM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re1 Notice of Removal, filed by Trans Union LLC.(Long, Charlotte)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
8 8 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Thu 09/28 7:27 AM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Trans Union LLC identifying Corporate Parent TransUnion Intermediate Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent TransUnion, Other Affiliate T. Rowe Price Group, Inc. for Trans Union LLC. (Long, Charlotte)
Related: [-]
7 7 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Thu 09/28 7:24 AM
* ERRONEOUS ENTRY. SEE 9 * MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Notice of Removal, (Unopposed) filed by Trans Union LLC.(Long, Charlotte) Modified on 9/28/2023 (mcl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, September 27, 2023
6 6 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 09/27 4:38 PM
ANSWER to Complaint Related [+] byBank of America, N.A.. (Crittenden, Joseph)
Related: [-] moved from State Court
Tuesday, September 26, 2023
5 5 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Tue 09/26 9:42 AM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Bank of America, N.A. identifying Corporate Parent Bank of America Corporation, Other Affiliate NB Holdings Corporation, Other Affiliate BAC North America Holding Company, Other Affiliate Berkshire Hathaway Inc. for Bank of America, N.A. re4 Certificate of Interested Entities originally served on September 25, 2023 (Crittenden, Joseph) Modified on 9/26/2023 (mcl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
utility Electronic Filing Error Tue 09/26 9:06 AM
[LINK:Electronic filing error] . Filer did not add all interested parties when prompted. Re-file this document in its entirety and when prompted, do NOT bypass the screen, enter all affiliates or corporate parents.This filing will not be processed by the clerks office.Please re-file in its entirety. Re:4 Certificate of Interested Entities filed by Bank of America, N.A. (mcl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 25, 2023
4 4 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Mon 09/25 2:15 PM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Bank of America, N.A. and Disclosure 7.1 (Crittenden, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 22, 2023
3 3 order Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines Fri 09/22 8:41 AM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 1/1/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/8/2024 01:30 PM. (mcl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 21, 2023
2 2 utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Thu 09/21 3:16 PM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 10/5/2023. (as, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Thu 09/21 3:09 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL of Civil Action from Marin County Superior Court. Their case number is CV0000690. (Filing fee $402 receipt number ACANDC-18667585). Filed byBank of America, N.A..(Crittenden, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet