California Northern District Court
Judge:Jeffrey S White
Case #: 4:23-cv-04842
Nature of Suit320 Torts - Personal Injury - Assault, Libel, & Slander
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Libel,Assault,Slander
Case Filed:Sep 21, 2023
Terminated:Jan 19, 2024
Last checked: Thursday Mar 21, 2024 4:34 AM PDT
Defendant
Rebecca Hawley
Plaintiff
Jerome Risby
In ProSe CA 700 Rand Ave. Oakland
Oakland, CA 94610

GPO Dec 26 2023
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE, REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re: 1 Complaint filed by Jerome Risby. Objections due by 1/9/2024. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 12/26/2023. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/26/2023)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
GPO Jan 19 2024
ORDER REGARDING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION AND DISMISSING WITHOUT LEAVE TOAMEND re 2, 7, 9 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, 14 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 1/19/2024. (kkp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2024)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
GPO Mar 25 2025
Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases re 24-cv-6734. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on March 25, 2025. (jcslc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2025)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)

Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
19 19 1 pgs order Order Relating Case Tue 04/01 1:15 PM
ORDER RELATING CASE. Case 23-4842 JSW is related to 24-6734 JCS. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 04/01/2025. (nmh, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
18 18 order Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases Tue 03/25 5:37 PM
Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases re 24-cv-6734. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on March 25, 2025. (jcslc1, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 19, 2024
17 17 3 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Motions Fri 01/19 7:50 AM
ORDER REGARDING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION AND DISMISSING WITHOUT LEAVE TOAMEND re 2 , 7 , 9 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, 14 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 1/19/2024. (kkp, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 17, 2024
16 16 cmp Amended Complaint Wed 01/17 4:57 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT -Second Amended Complaint - jan 17-2023 against Rebecca Hawley. Filed by Jerome Risby.(Risby, Jerome)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Supplement Second Amended Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit Starting pg 39-40, Report, 23-11309 CAD.pdf
Wednesday, December 27, 2023
15 15 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case ~Util - Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 12/27 7:58 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Jeffrey S. White for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu no longer assigned to case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Clerk on 12/27/2023.(jml, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording
Tuesday, December 26, 2023
14 14 motion Report and Recommendations Order Reassigning Case Tue 12/26 6:39 PM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE, REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re: 1 Complaint filed by Jerome Risby. Objections due by 1/9/2024. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 12/26/2023. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 19, 2023
13 13 service Certificate/Proof of Service Tue 12/19 1:54 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jerome Risby re1 Complaint,5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines,4 Certificate of Interested Entities,3 Proposed Summons(Risby, Jerome)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate/Proof of Service POS - OCt 17, 2023
Monday, December 18, 2023
utility Electronic Filing Error Mon 12/18 10:56 AM
[LINK:Electronic filing error] . No title Page. Certificate of Service e-filed separately and not as an attachment, requires a title page. Please refer to Civil Local Rules 3-4 regarding first page requirement. This filing will not be processed by the clerks office. Please re-file in its entirety. Re: 12 Certificate of Service filed by Jerome Risby (anj, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 15, 2023
12 12 service Certificate/Proof of Service Fri 12/15 11:08 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jerome Risby POF - 10-11-23 - signed (Risby, Jerome)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 14, 2023
11 11 oth_evt 1 - Terminate Hearings Clerk's Notice Thu 12/14 9:38 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE: The initial Case Management Conference set for 12/20/2023 before Chief Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu is VACATED. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 13, 2023
utility Electronic Filing Error Wed 12/13 11:49 AM
[LINK:Electronic filing error] . Incorrect event used. [err101] Please re-file in its entirety using the following event: Civil Events > Other Filings > Other Documents > Civil Cover Sheet. Re: 10 Amended Complaint filed by Jerome Risby (anj, COURT STAFF) Modified on 12/13/2023 (anj, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 12, 2023
10 10 cmp Amended Complaint Tue 12/12 1:53 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT Jerome Risby, In ProPer against Rebecca Hawley. Filed by Jerome Risby. (Risby, Jerome)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 01, 2023
9 9 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Thu 11/02 2:23 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Jerome Risby. (anj, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 29, 2023
8 8 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Fri 09/29 3:38 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Jerome Risby.. (anj, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 25, 2023
6 6 1 pgs order Order Mon 09/25 10:43 AM
ORDER TO SUBMIT COMPLETE IN FORMA PAUPERIS APPLICATION re 2 . Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 9/25/2023. (ig, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
Saturday, September 23, 2023
7 7 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Mon 09/25 2:10 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Jerome Risby. (anj, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 21, 2023
5 5 order Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines Thu 09/21 2:57 PM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 12/13/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/20/2023 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (anj, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Thu 09/21 2:55 PM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Jerome Risby (anj, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Proposed Summons Thu 09/21 2:53 PM
Proposed Summons. (anj, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Thu 09/21 2:50 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Jerome Risby. (anj, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 09/21 2:49 PM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Rebecca Hawley. Filed by Jerome Risby. Consent/Declination due by 10/5/2023.(anj, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet