Nevada District Court
Judge:Richard F Boulware, II
Referred: Daniel J Albregts
Case #: 2:23-cv-01478
Nature of Suit820 Property Rights - Copyrights
Cause17:501 Copyright Infringement
Case Filed:Sep 21, 2023
Terminated:Oct 26, 2023
Last checked: Thursday Mar 21, 2024 5:29 AM PDT
Defendant
Vegas VIP, LLC
Plaintiff
Prepared Food Photos, Inc
Represented By
John P. Aldrich
Aldrich Law Firm, Ltd.
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Wednesday, November 01, 2023
8 8 misc AO 121 Copyright Report Wed 11/01 3:13 PM
AO 121 - REPORT on the determination of an action or appeal regarding a copyright. E-mailed to the Register of Copyrights, Copyright Office. (AMMi)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 26, 2023
7 7 notice Notice Voluntary Dismissal Thu 10/26 4:33 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff Prepared Food Photos, Inc. . (Aldrich, John)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 04, 2023
6 6 misc Certificate Interested Parties Wed 10/04 9:37 AM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Prepared Food Photos, Inc. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case. (Aldrich, John)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 02, 2023
misc QC Notice Mon 10/02 10:09 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE. To date, a Certificate of Interested Parties has not been filed, pursuant to LR 7.1-1, by Prepared Food Photos, Inc. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 10/9/2023. (no image attached) (CJS)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 25, 2023
order Standing Order Mon 09/25 9:00 AM
STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Richard F. Boulware, II. Judge Boulware's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink:[LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov] . (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 22, 2023
3 3 service Summons Issued Fri 09/22 11:25 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to Vegas VIP, LLC re1 Complaint. (AMMi)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc AO 121 Copyright Report Fri 09/22 11:22 AM
AO 121 - REPORT on the filing or determination of an action or appeal regarding a copyright. Mailed to the Register of Copyrights, Copyright Office. (AMMi)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Complaint
Thursday, September 21, 2023
1 1 8 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 09/21 3:17 PM
COMPLAINT against VEGAS VIP, LLC (Filing fee $402 receipt number ANVDC-7435166) by PREPARED FOOD PHOTOS, INC.. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 10/1/2023. Proof of service due by 12/20/2023. (Aldrich, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 4 Summons Summons
utility Assign Judges in Civil Case Fri 09/22 10:14 AM
Case randomly assigned to Judge Richard F. Boulware, II and Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts. (AMMi)
Related: [-]