Consolidated
Lead case: 3:16-md-02741

California Northern District Court
Judge:Vince Chhabria
Case #: 3:23-cv-04841
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Case Filed:Sep 21, 2023
Case in other court:Missouri Eastern, 4:23-cv-00992
Last checked: Thursday Mar 21, 2024 4:34 AM PDT
Defendant
Monsanto Company
Represented By
Jennise Walker-Stubbs
Shook Hardy & Bacon L.L.P.
contact info
Plaintiff
Michael Calloway
Represented By
Emily Jo Kirk
Mccune Wright Arevalo, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, October 06, 2023
14 14 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Fri 10/06 8:40 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Monsanto Company identifying Other Affiliate Bayer AG for Monsanto Company. [RE: Plaintiff Michael Calloway] (Walker-Stubbs, Jennise)
Related: [-]
13 13 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Fri 10/06 8:36 AM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Monsanto Company identifying Other Affiliate Bayer AG for Monsanto Company. [RE: Plaintiff Michael Calloway] (Walker-Stubbs, Jennise)
Related: [-]
12 12 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 10/06 8:35 AM
Defendant Monsanto Company ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand [RE: Plaintiff Michael Calloway] byMonsanto Company. (Walker-Stubbs, Jennise)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 21, 2023
11 11 transfer Case Transferred In - District Transfer Thu 09/21 3:39 PM
Case transferred in from District of Missouri Eastern; Case Number 4:23-cv-00992. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
Related: [-]
utility MDL Member Case Thu 09/21 3:42 PM
MEMBER CASE OPENED: Missouri Eastern, 4:23cv00992 Calloway v. Monsanto Company et al, Opened in California Northern District as 3:23-cv-04841-VC pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order 419 cc: JPMDL (exl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 19, 2023
10 10 ORDER OF MDL TRANSFER to: Northern District of California. Signed by Tiffaney D. Pete on 9/18/2023. Case transferred via CM-ECF. (JBH)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 18, 2023
9 9 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-419) regarding MDL 2741 by Clerk of the Panel. Signed by Tiffaney D. Pete on 9/18/23. (JWD)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 13, 2023
Notice from Clerk instructing Plaintiff Michael Calloway to submit Notice regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Click[LINK:here] for the instructions. Notice re: Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction due by 9/20/2023. (KJS)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 25, 2023
8 8 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Michael Calloway. No corporate parents or affiliates identified. (Kirk, Emily)
Related: [-]
7 7 NOTICE of Filing Deficiency re6 Disclosure Statement filed by Plaintiff Michael Calloway. In accordance with Eastern District of Missouri Local Rules and the Case Management/Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) Procedures Manual, a filing deficiency has been identified as follows: The attorney's signature on the signature block must match the name of the e-filer. Further, the attorney signing this document is not admitted to the Eastern District of Missouri Bar. This is an informational notice and no further action is needed at this time. All future filings must be in compliance with this rule. (CBL)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 24, 2023
6 6 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Michael Calloway. No corporate parents or affiliates identified. (Kirk, Emily)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 18, 2023
5 5 Electronic Notice re: Disclosure Statement to Plaintiff Michael Calloway. Pursuant to Local Rule 2.09, every nongovernmental corporate party or nongovernmental corporation that seeks to intervene in any case, and every party or intervenor in an action in which jurisdiction is based upon diversity, must file a Disclosure Statement immediately upon entering its appearance in the case. Please complete and file the certificate as soon as possible and add all individuals and entities into CM/ECF as required[LINK:(moed-0001.pdf)] . (CBL)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 10, 2023
4 4 Receipt: $ 402.00, receipt number 17034 Civil Filing Fee- Non-Prisoner on behalf of McCune Law Group (CCAM). (auto)
Related: [-]
3 3 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (auto)
Related: [-]
Case Opening Notification. Judge Assigned: Honorable Joseph S. Dueker. 1 Summons(es) issued and emailed to attorney Emily Kirk. All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click[LINK:here] for the instructions. Pursuant to Local Rule 2.09, every nongovernmental corporate party or nongovernmental corporation that seeks to intervene in any case, and every party or intervenor in an action in which jurisdiction is based upon diversity, must file a Disclosure Statement immediately upon entering its appearance in the case. Please complete and file the certificate as soon as possible.[LINK:(moed-0001.pdf)] . (JWD)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 09, 2023
2 2 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Michael Calloway Process Server: Civil Action Group (Kirk, Emily)
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT against defendant Monsanto Company in the amount of $402 receipt number STL-17034 Jury Demand,, filed by Michael Calloway.(Kirk, Emily) Modified on 8/10/2023 to add filinf fee receipt information (JWD).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 3 Original Filing Form