California Northern District Court
Judge:James Donato
Case #: 3:23-cv-04853
Nature of Suit370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Fraud
Case Filed:Sep 21, 2023
Terminated:May 17, 2024
Last checked: Thursday Mar 21, 2024 4:34 AM PDT
Defendant
Wm. Bolthouse Farms, Inc.
Represented By
Lauren S. Colton
Hogan Lovells Us LLP
contact info
Marc A. Marinaccio
Hogan Lovells Us LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
April Due
Represented By
L. Timothy Fisher
Bursor & Fisher, P.A.
contact info
Frederick J. Klorczyk, III
contact info
Neal J. Deckant
Bursor & Fisher, P.A.
contact info
Plaintiff
Jennifer Jackson
Represented By
L. Timothy Fisher
Bursor & Fisher, P.A.
contact info
Frederick J. Klorczyk, III
contact info
Neal J. Deckant
Bursor & Fisher, P.A.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, May 17, 2024
33 33 order Order Terminate Civil Case Fri 05/17 9:57 AM
ORDER. The named plaintiffs have dismissed their claims with prejudice. Dkt. No. 32. The claims of the putative class are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge James Donato on 5/17/2024. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc1, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 16, 2024
32 32 2 pgs notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Thu 05/16 4:42 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by April Due, Jennifer Jackson (Fisher, L.)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 15, 2024
31 31 order 1 - Terminate Hearings Order ~Util - Terminate Motions Mon 04/15 4:52 PM
ORDER. For Dkt. No. 30, plaintiffs may have until May 17, 2024, to file their response, and defendant may have until June 17, 2024, to file its reply. The hearing set for May 16, 2024, is vacated, and the Court will set a hearing if warranted. Signed by Judge James Donato on 4/15/2024. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc1, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 09, 2024
30 30 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Tue 04/09 2:21 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Extending Time to Respond to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss filed by April Due, Jennifer Jackson.(Fisher, L.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of L. Timothy Fisher
Friday, April 05, 2024
29 29 oth_sup Request for Judicial Notice Fri 04/05 1:54 PM
Request for Judicial Notice re28 First MOTION to Dismiss Defendant W.M. Bolthouse Farms, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Class Action Complaint Defendant W.M. Bolthouse Farms, Inc.'s Request for Judicial Notice In Support of Motion to Dismiss Class Action Complaint filed byWm. Bolthouse Farms, Inc.. Related [+] (Norris, Trenton)
Related: [-] 28
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit E,
Att: 6 Exhibit F,
Att: 7 Exhibit G
28 28 motion Dismiss Fri 04/05 1:43 PM
First MOTION to Dismiss Defendant W.M. Bolthouse Farms, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Class Action Complaint filed by Wm. Bolthouse Farms, Inc.. Motion to Dismiss Hearing set for 5/16/2024 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor. Responses due by 4/19/2024. Replies due by 4/26/2024. (Norris, Trenton)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 28, 2024
27 27 misc Statement Thu 03/28 11:37 AM
Statement Joint Statement Designating Mediator by April Due, Jennifer Jackson. (Fisher, L.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 21, 2024
26 26 minutes Case Management Conference - Initial Fri 03/22 9:35 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James Donato: Initial Case Management Conference held on 3/21/2024. Total Time in Court: 3 minutes. Court Reporter: Ana Dub. (jdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/21/2024)
Related: [-]
utility Case Referred to Private ADR Fri 03/22 1:50 PM
CASE REFERRED to Private ADR re26 . (cmf, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 18, 2024
25 25 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 03/18 12:57 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Neal J. Deckant (Deckant, Neal)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 14, 2024
24 24 misc Joint Case Management Statement Thu 03/14 11:08 AM
JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by April Due, Jennifer Jackson. (Fisher, L.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 29, 2024
23 23 adr ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options Thu 02/29 4:15 PM
ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Fisher, L.)
Related: [-]
22 22 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Thu 02/29 2:27 PM
Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Wm. Bolthouse Farms, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Generis Buyer Inc. for Wm. Bolthouse Farms, Inc.. (Colton, Lauren)
Related: [-]
21 21 adr ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options Thu 02/29 2:22 PM
ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Colton, Lauren)
Related: [-]
20 20 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Thu 02/29 8:43 AM
ORDER by Judge James Donato granting 18 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Lauren S. Colton. (lrc, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
19 19 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Thu 02/29 8:42 AM
ORDER by Judge James Donato granting 17 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Marc A. Marinaccio. (lrc, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 28, 2024
18 18 motion Pro Hac Vice Wed 02/28 9:13 AM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Lauren S. Colton ( Filing fee $ 328, receipt number ACANDC-19166894.) filed by Wm. Bolthouse Farms, Inc..(Colton, Lauren)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Good Standing - MD
17 17 motion Pro Hac Vice Wed 02/28 6:45 AM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Marc A. Marinaccio ( Filing fee $ 328, receipt number ACANDC-19166263.) filed by Wm. Bolthouse Farms, Inc..(Marinaccio, Marc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Good Standing - MD,
Att: 2 Certificate of Good Standing - CO
Tuesday, January 23, 2024
16 16 order Order ~Util - Terminate Motions ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Tue 01/23 4:48 PM
ORDER. For Dkt. No. 15, this is the parties' second request to reschedule the initial case management conference, which was originally set for December 21, 2023. The conference is continued to March 21, 2024, on the parties' representation that they are diligently conferring in good faith to "narrow the scope of disputed issues." Id . This will likely be the final continuance of the conference. Signed by Judge James Donato on 1/23/2024. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc1, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 19, 2024
15 15 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Fri 01/19 11:16 AM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Extend Deadline to Respond to Complaint, Reschedule Case Management Conference and Extend Deadline for Joint Case Management Statement filed by April Due, Jennifer Jackson.(Fisher, L.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of L. Timothy Fisher
Thursday, November 30, 2023
14 14 order 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings ~Util - Terminate Motions ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Order Thu 11/30 5:29 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING DEADLINES. Signed by Judge James Donato on 11/30/2023. (jdlc1, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 29, 2023
13 13 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Wed 11/29 11:31 AM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Extending Deadline to Respond to Complaint, Rescheduling Case Management Conference and Extending Deadline for Joint Case Management Statement filed by April Due, Jennifer Jackson.(Fisher, L.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of L. Timothy Fisher
Tuesday, November 07, 2023
12 12 notice Notice (Other) Tue 11/07 6:09 PM
NOTICE by April Due, Jennifer Jackson of Withdrawal of Attorney Frederick J. Klorczyk III (Fisher, L.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 18, 2023
11 11 service Waiver of Service Executed Wed 10/18 2:19 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Jennifer Jackson, April Due. Service waived by Wm. Bolthouse Farms, Inc. waiver sent on 10/6/2023, answer due 12/5/2023. (Fisher, L.)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 10/18 2:15 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by L. Timothy Fisher (Fisher, L.)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 25, 2023
9 9 order Case Management Scheduling Order Mon 09/25 6:56 AM
CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/21/2023 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor. Case Management Statement due by 12/14/2023. Signed by Judge James Donato on 9/25/2023. (lrc, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 22, 2023
8 8 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case ~Util - Case Assigned/Reassigned Fri 09/22 3:46 PM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge James Donato for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 9/22/2023.(ark, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording
7 7 oth_evt Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment - Text Only Fri 09/22 1:07 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (rmm2, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Summons Issued Fri 09/22 12:17 PM
Summons Issued as to Wm. Bolthouse Farms, Inc.. (cv, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
5 5 order Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines Fri 09/22 12:05 PM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 12/14/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/21/2023 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom E, 15th Floor. (cv, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Fri 09/22 11:52 AM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by April Due, Jennifer Jackson.. (Klorczyk, Frederick)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 21, 2023
3 3 utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Fri 09/22 8:22 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 10/5/2023. (bw, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Proposed Summons Thu 09/21 3:47 PM
Proposed Summons. (Klorczyk, Frederick)
Related: [-]
1 1 24 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 09/21 3:44 PM
COMPLAINT against Wm. Bolthouse Farms, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-18667983.). Filed byJennifer Jackson, April Due.(Klorczyk, Frederick)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet