California Northern District Court
Judge:Peter H Kang
Case #: 3:23-cv-04854
Nature of Suit465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions
Cause08:1329 Writ of Mandamus to Adjudicate Visa Petition
Case Filed:Sep 21, 2023
Last checked: Thursday Mar 21, 2024 4:35 AM PDT
Defendant
Robin Barrett
Director, USCIS San Francisco/San Jose 444 Washington Street
San Francisco, CA 94111
Represented By
Elizabeth D. Kurlan
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Ur Mendoza Jaddou
Represented By
Elizabeth D. Kurlan
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Alejandro Mayorkas
Represented By
Elizabeth D. Kurlan
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Garland Merrick
Represented By
Elizabeth D. Kurlan
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info
Plaintiff
Yitong Ren
Represented By
Alison Yew
Yew Immigration Law Group A P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Tuesday, April 09, 2024
16 16 misc Stipulation without Proposed Order Tue 04/09 6:00 PM
STIPULATION for dismissal filed by Yitong Ren. (Yew, Alison)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 29, 2024
15 15 misc Status Report Fri 03/29 5:01 PM
STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report by Robin Barrett, Ur Mendoza Jaddou, Alejandro Mayorkas, Garland Merrick. (Kurlan, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 13, 2023
14 14 2 pgs order Order on Stipulation Wed 12/13 11:15 AM
Order. Signed on 12/13/23 by Magistrate Judge Peter H Kang granting in part and modifying in part 13 Stipulation. Defendants response is due April 29, 2024. Plaintiffs motion for summary judgement due by May 29, 2024. (dispositive motion deadline) Joint Status Report on the adjudication of Plaintiffs visa application on or before March 29, 2024. (jaf, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 12, 2023
13 13 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Tue 12/12 2:30 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation to Proposed Schedule for Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's Complaint; [Proposed] Order filed by Robin Barrett, Ur Mendoza Jaddou, Alejandro Mayorkas, Garland Merrick. (Kurlan, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 07, 2023
12 12 3 pgs order Order on Stipulation Thu 12/07 9:36 AM
Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter H Kang on 12/06/2023 granting 11 Stipulation. (jaf, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 05, 2023
11 11 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Tue 12/05 4:24 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation to Extend Time Within Which Defendants Must File a Response and [Proposed] Order filed by Robin Barrett, Ur Mendoza Jaddou, Alejandro Mayorkas, Garland Merrick. (Kurlan, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
10 10 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Tue 12/05 4:20 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Robin Barrett, Ur Mendoza Jaddou, Alejandro Mayorkas, Garland Merrick.. (Kurlan, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 12/05 4:19 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth D. Kurlan (Kurlan, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 26, 2023
8 8 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 10/26 8:44 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Yitong Ren. All Defendants. (Yew, Alison)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 10, 2023
utility Electronic Filing Error Tue 10/10 3:29 PM
[LINK:Electronic filing error] . Incorrect event used. [err101]Please re-file in its entirety using correct event "Summons Returned Executed as to USA" Re:7 Certificate of Service filed by Yitong Ren (dhm, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 09, 2023
7 7 service Certificate/Proof of Service Mon 10/09 5:35 PM
***INCORRECT EVENT** CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Yitong Ren (Yew, Alison) Modified on 10/10/2023 (dhm, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 28, 2023
6 6 cmp Petition for Writ of Mandamus Thu 09/28 11:23 AM
PETITION for Writ of Mandamus ( (Filing fee $402 receipt number ACANDC-18668363)). Filed by YITONG REN.(Yew, Alison) Modified on 9/28/2023 (cv, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Exhibit,
Att: 4 Exhibit,
Att: 5 Exhibit,
Att: 6 Exhibit,
Att: 7 Exhibit,
Att: 8 Exhibit
utility Electronic Filing Error Thu 09/28 9:20 AM
The attachment is corrupted and cannot be open.[LINK:Electronic filing error] . PDF attached Petition is CORRUPTED. Please re-scan or re-convert the document to PDF and confirm that it can be read (opened)before sending it again. Do NOT resend the same PDF. [err201]Please re-file in its entirety. and confirm that it can be read (opened) Re:1 Petition for Writ of Mandamus filed by YITONG REN (cv, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 25, 2023
5 5 service Summons Issued as to USA Mon 09/25 10:00 AM
Summons Issued as to Robin Barrett, Ur Mendoza Jaddou, Alejandro Mayorkas, Garland Merrick, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (cv, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Saturday, September 23, 2023
4 4 misc Proposed Summons Sat 09/23 7:14 AM
Proposed Summons. (Yew, Alison)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 22, 2023
3 3 order Immigration Mandamus Case Procedural Order Fri 09/22 12:20 PM
Immigration Mandamus Case Procedural Order, (cv, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 21, 2023
2 2 utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Fri 09/22 8:27 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Peter H Kang. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 10/5/2023. (bw, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Petition for Writ of Mandamus Thu 09/21 4:42 PM
PETITION for Writ of Mandamus (Filing fee $402 receipt number ACANDC-18668363). Filed byYITONG REN.(Yew, Alison)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet