Nevada District Court
Judge:Gloria M Navarro
Referred: Nancy J Koppe
Case #: 2:23-cv-01480
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Case Filed:Sep 21, 2023
Last checked: Thursday Mar 21, 2024 5:29 AM PDT
Defendant
MGM Resorts International
Represented By
Todd L. Bice
Pisanelli Bice PLLC
contact info
Interested Party
David Terezo
Represented By
Ruthann Devereaux-Gonzalez
Leon Greenberg, PC
contact info
Interested Party
Michelle Righetti
Represented By
Niall P. McCarthy
Cotchett, Pitre & Mccarthy
contact info
Interested Party
John Smallman
Represented By
Don Springmeyer
Kemp Jones LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Tonya Owens
Represented By
Gary M. Klinger
Milberg Coleman Bryson Phillips Grossman PLLC
contact info
Nathan R. Ring
Reese Ring Velto PLLC
contact info
J. Gerard Stranch, IV
Stranch, Jennings & Garvey, Pplc
contact info
Jeffrey M. Ostrow
Kopelowitz Ostrow P.A.
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Friday, May 02, 2025
77 77 motion Unopposed Motion Fri 05/02 3:08 PM
UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT AND APPLICATION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES, COSTS, AND SERVICE AWARDS, AND MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Plaintiff Consolidated Plaintiffs. Responses due by 5/16/2025.(Ostrow, Jeff) (settlement)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Settlement Agreement,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Joint Declaration of Class Counsel,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Declaration of Settlement Adminstrator,
Att: 4 Exhibit D - Declaration of Brian T. Fitzpatrick,
Att: 5 Exhibit E - Proposed Final Approval Order
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
76 76 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages Wed 04/30 4:07 PM
ORDER granting75 Unopposed Motion to Exceed Page Limit for Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement and Application for Attorneys' Fees, Costs, and Service Awards. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 4/25/2025. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MAM)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 25, 2025
75 75 motion Motion Leave to File Document/Excess Pages Fri 04/25 1:05 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages re63 Order on Unopposed Motion, by Plaintiff Consolidated Plaintiffs. Responses due by 5/9/2025.(Ostrow, Jeff) (settlement)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A-Declaration,
Att: 2 Exhibit B-Proposed Order