Nevada District Court
Judge:Richard F Boulware, II
Referred: Daniel J Albregts
Case #: 2:23-cv-01481
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Case Filed:Sep 21, 2023
Terminated:Mar 22, 2024
Last checked: Thursday Mar 21, 2024 5:29 AM PDT
Defendant
MGM Resorts International
Represented By
Todd L. Bice
Pisanelli Bice PLLC
contact info
Interested Party
David Terezo
Represented By
Ruthann Devereaux-Gonzalez
Leon Greenberg, PC
contact info
Interested Party
Michelle Righetti
Represented By
Niall P. McCarthy
Cotchett, Pitre & Mccarthy
contact info
Interested Party
John Smallman
Represented By
Don Springmeyer
Kemp Jones LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Emily Kirwan
Represented By
Gary M. Klinger
Milberg Coleman Bryson Phillips Grossman PLLC
contact info
J. Gerard Stranch, IV
Stranch, Jennings & Garvey, Pplc
contact info
Nathan R. Ring
Reese Ring Velto PLLC
contact info
Jeffrey M. Ostrow
Kopelowitz Ostrow P.A.
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Tuesday, February 25, 2025
30 30 minord Pro Se Correspondence Minute Order Wed 02/26 10:51 AM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 2/25/2025. By Deputy Clerk: RJDG. Documents submitted by: Jared Ribardi. REQUEST FOR COPIES - The fee for the clerk to reproduce documents from an electronic format is $.10 per page. You must provide the document titles and include document numbers. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - RJDG)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Copy and Service Request Form
Tuesday, March 26, 2024
28 28 misc Withdrawal of Motion Tue 03/26 1:47 PM
WITHDRAWAL of26 Motion for Appointment of Counsel, by Interested Party Michelle Righetti. (McCarthy, Niall)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 19, 2024
27 27 motion Motion Consolidate Cases Tue 03/19 5:49 AM
MOTION to Consolidate Cases For Pretrial Proceedings and Integrated Memorandum Of Law by Plaintiff Emily Kirwan. Responses due by 4/2/2024. (Ring, Nathan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 13, 2024
26 26 motion Motion Appointment of Counsel Wed 03/13 3:06 PM
MOTION for Appointment of Counsel of Interim Lead Class Counsel by Interested Party Michelle Righetti.(McCarthy, Niall)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Index Exhibits to Motion For Appointment of Interim Lead Class Counsel,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1,
Att: 3 Exhibit 2,
Att: 4 Exhibit 3,
Att: 5 Exhibit 4
25 25 motion Motion Consolidate Cases Wed 03/13 2:55 PM
MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Interested Party Michelle Righetti. Responses due by 3/27/2024. (McCarthy, Niall)
Related: [-]
24 24 notice Notice Related Cases Wed 03/13 2:29 PM
NOTICE OF RELATED CASES 2:23-cv-02064-APG-DJA; 2:23-cv-01480-RFB-MDC; 2:23-cv-01537-CDS-BNW; 2:23-cv-01549-RFB-NJK; 2:23-cv-01550-CDS-NJK; 2:23-cv-01577-RFB-MDC; 2:23-cv-01698-CDS-DJA; 2:23-cv-01719-RFB-BNW; 2:23-cv-01777-CDS-BNW; 2:23-cv-01826-CDS-EJY; 2:23-cv-01981-RFB-EJY; 2:23-cv-02042-ART-BNW; 2:24-cv-00081-APG-DJA by Interested Party Michelle Righetti. . (McCarthy, Niall)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 07, 2024
23 23 4 pgs order Order on Stipulation Thu 03/07 3:36 PM
ORDER Granting22 Stipulation to Extend Time. MGM Resorts International answer due 4/10/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 3/7/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
Related: [-]
22 22 motion Stipulation Thu 03/07 11:56 AM
Fourth STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (Fourth Request) re1 Complaint,, by Defendant MGM Resorts International. (Bice, Todd) (extend) (answer)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 10, 2024
21 21 4 pgs order Order on Stipulation Wed 01/10 3:23 PM
ORDER granting20 Stipulation to Extend time for Defendant's Response to Complaint. MGM Resorts International answer due 3/11/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 1/10/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CT)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 08, 2024
20 20 motion Stipulation Mon 01/08 4:12 PM
Third STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (Third Request) To Respond re1 Complaint,, by Defendant MGM Resorts International. (Bice, Todd) (extend) (answer)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 13, 2023
19 19 4 pgs order Order on Stipulation Wed 12/13 10:57 AM
ORDER granting ECF No.18 Stipulation for Extension of Time. MGM Resorts International answer/response re ECF No.1 is due 1/11/2024 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 12/13/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DLS)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 11, 2023
18 18 motion Stipulation Mon 12/11 5:32 PM
Second STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (Second Request) To Respond re1 Complaint,, by Defendant MGM Resorts International. (Bice, Todd) (extend) (answer)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 06, 2023
17 17 notice Notice Related Cases Wed 12/06 5:03 PM
NOTICE OF RELATED CASES by Interested Party John Smallman. . (Springmeyer, Don)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 18, 2023
minord Minute Order Order on Stipulation Wed 10/18 10:27 AM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 10/18/2023. Good cause being found, IT IS ORDERED that the parties'15 Stipulation to Extend the Deadline to Respond (First Request) to the1 Complaint is GRANTED. Respondent shall have until December 12, 2023 to file. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MAW)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 17, 2023
15 15 motion Stipulation Tue 10/17 6:35 PM
STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) by Plaintiff Emily Kirwan.(Ring, Nathan) (extend) (answer)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, October 12, 2023
14 14 8 pgs order Order on Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice Thu 10/12 10:46 AM
ORDER Granting8 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice Jeff Ostrow and approving Designation of Local Counsel Nathan R. Ring. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 10/12/2023. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's e-filng system shall register on the PACER website[LINK:www.pacer.gov] (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
Related: [-]
13 13 notice Notice Related Cases Thu 10/12 10:30 AM
NOTICE OF RELATED CASES 2:23-cv-01480-JAD-VCF, 2:23-cv-01537-CDS-BNW, 2:23-cv-01549-RFB-NJK, 2:23-cv-01550-CDS-NJK, 2:23-cv-01577-JAD-VCF by Interested Party David Terezo. . (Devereaux-Gonzalez, Ruthann)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 11, 2023
12 12 6 pgs order Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Thu 10/12 9:13 AM
ORDER Granting10 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Gary M. Klinger withdrawn from the case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 10/11/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
Related: [-]
11 11 6 pgs order Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Thu 10/12 9:12 AM
ORDER Granting9 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. J. Gerard Stranch IV withdrawn from the case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 10/11/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 09, 2023
10 10 motion Motion Withdraw as Attorney Mon 10/09 4:58 PM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Gary Klinger for Plaintiff Emily Kirwan. Responses due by 10/23/2023.(Ring, Nathan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, October 06, 2023
9 9 motion Motion Withdraw as Attorney Fri 10/06 4:50 PM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by J. Gerard Stranch, IV for Plaintiff Emily Kirwan. Responses due by 10/20/2023.(Ring, Nathan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
8 8 motion Motion Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice - Verified Petition Fri 10/06 4:45 PM
MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Jeff Ostrow and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Nathan Ring (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number ANVDC-7452812) by Plaintiff Emily Kirwan.(Ring, Nathan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Certificate of Good Standing, Washington DC,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Certificate of Good Standing, Florida
Wednesday, October 04, 2023
7 7 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 10/04 4:41 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Emily Kirwan re1 Complaint,,. MGM Resorts International served on 9/25/2023. (Ring, Nathan)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 03, 2023
6 6 misc Certificate Interested Parties Tue 10/03 4:15 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Emily Kirwan. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Ring, Nathan)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 02, 2023
misc QC Notice Mon 10/02 7:34 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE. To date, a Certificate of Interested Parties has not been filed, pursuant to LR 7.1-1, by Emily Kirwan. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 10/9/2023. (no image attached) (KF)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 25, 2023
order Standing Order Mon 09/25 9:02 AM
STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Richard F. Boulware, II. Judge Boulware's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink:[LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov] . (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
Related: [-]
notice Notice Desig of Local Counsel & VP Mon 09/25 9:45 AM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Gary M. Klinger, J. Gerard Stranch IV, Jeff Ostrow to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website -[LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov] . Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the PACER website www.pacer.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 10/9/2023. (no image attached) (AMMi)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 22, 2023
2 2 service Summons Issued Fri 09/22 2:06 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to MGM Resorts International re1 Complaint. (AMMi)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 21, 2023
1 1 46 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 09/21 5:54 PM
COMPLAINT against MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL (Filing fee $402 receipt number BNVDC-7435443) by Emily Kirwan. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 10/1/2023. Proof of service due by 12/20/2023. (Ring, Nathan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons,
Att: 3 Certificate of Interested Parties
utility Assign Judges in Civil Case Fri 09/22 2:01 PM
Case randomly assigned to Judge Richard F. Boulware, II and Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts. (AMMi)
Related: [-]