Florida Southern District Court
Judge:Robert N Scola, Jr
Referred: Jonathan Goodman
Case #: 1:23-cv-23631
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Cause35:0271 Patent Infringement
Case Filed:Sep 21, 2023
Terminated:Jun 05, 2024
Last checked: Thursday Mar 21, 2024 7:40 AM EDT
Defendant
The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A
Defendant
12pegleg
Defendant
2016dani86
Defendant
9enjoyshopping
Defendant
AIIYME Store
Defendant
Acme Approved
Defendant
Amazing China Products
Defendant
BETA BOX
Defendant
BOTE LLC
Defendant
Beautiful & Bold Aesthetics LLC
Defendant
Cao ruixin
Defendant
Forever Beauty House Store
Defendant
Fuarscs Beauty Official Store
Defendant
Hchenyu Store
Defendant
ITME Store
Defendant
Jones N Panda Corp
Defendant
Kikuu
Defendant
Lola Beauty
Defendant
LonRon Co.Ltd
Defendant
LotusHaze
Defendant
Lucky Lemon Market
Defendant
Lucky-minfan
Defendant
Mg fashion love
Defendant
Ofunuobeautymachine
Defendant
PaintByNumberUK
Defendant
Quisque Ornare Inc
Defendant
Victor Hugo Rodriguez
Defendant
Sevenstore
Defendant
Shiner Store
Defendant
Shopping Factory Store
Defendant
SkinAngelLLC
Defendant
VASYL Flagship store
Defendant
XingZhouHe
Defendant
Zhou Daweidedian
Defendant
aawqq
Defendant
adrs7
Defendant
alpha_toner
Defendant
alv-ala-x6hs5bo
Defendant
anything_here
Defendant
armor_of_god
Defendant
aseel75
Defendant
baozousports01
Defendant
basop6
Defendant
beatrix2
Defendant
bestowal
Defendant
bevjhb
Defendant
bfrda
Defendant
bgeed
Defendant
bgrft
Defendant
breble66
Defendant
bttr88
Defendant
buirnce
Defendant
bvbcuw
Defendant
bvvfcf
Defendant
bxhtqb
Defendant
ccfft
Defendant
cffzz
Defendant
cfghy
Defendant
cfgtre
Defendant
cftde
Defendant
cftgff
Defendant
cggmk
Defendant
ctufqi
Defendant
dapperica
Defendant
darknessseagull25
Defendant
davkpj
Defendant
dawdigiacom0
Defendant
ddyzvy
Defendant
dealwithzeal
Defendant
dffrft
Defendant
diana11
Defendant
diejck
Defendant
dina51
Defendant
djife32
Defendant
dldl123123
Defendant
dslf44
Defendant
ecffl
Defendant
ecmuyn
Defendant
edmki
Defendant
eloif69
Defendant
emnru230
Defendant
erinog
Defendant
eurj18
Defendant
fasr87
Defendant
femf95f
Defendant
finelivingcollections
Defendant
fitzgerald2
Defendant
fmmaoe2
Defendant
fnilleks
Defendant
foigj55
Defendant
fploikk
Defendant
fswnn33
Defendant
fuvlkb
Defendant
gamertechz
Defendant
gogetter8719
Defendant
gufl8006
Defendant
healthiswealth-tyler
Defendant
hftfcn
Defendant
hgwdf625
Defendant
homematecollection
Defendant
hover8
Defendant
jade86
Defendant
jass2965
Defendant
jg-trading
Defendant
jguyhxz10
Defendant
jiche96
Defendant
jlyx
Defendant
jobob-treasures
Defendant
kiki2
Defendant
kinseibeauty4
Defendant
kun6
Defendant
kunminghuireng Co. ltd
Defendant
lcmj2018au
Defendant
ldsf26
Defendant
liliooo
Defendant
linsh0p
Defendant
lowcost-10
Defendant
lsclot
Defendant
luckylemonmarket
Defendant
luxury.china
Defendant
mark776
Defendant
mastertoner
Defendant
maxam78
Defendant
mbz-24*de
Defendant
mbz-24de
Defendant
mcenterprises_llc
Defendant
meyanbeautymachine2
Defendant
mhstore77
Defendant
migasol
Defendant
nadalghait0
Defendant
nare8196
Defendant
ngyhe
Defendant
nycunitedgoods
Defendant
okif0fe
Defendant
oklkuz
Defendant
perpv94
Defendant
ploik
Defendant
plpaa
Defendant
positiveshopnr1
Defendant
pvbwcc
Defendant
quak11
Defendant
quanbai66
Defendant
ramireariadn-0
Defendant
ruiqi06
Defendant
rumaxtrade
Defendant
sbisnc
Defendant
shmcg-7339
Defendant
shopcom2000
Defendant
slf51gs
Defendant
smyy9
Defendant
solyansoutlet
Defendant
star61172
5716 Mossberg Drive
New Port Richey, FL 34655
Defendant
steffanief13
Defendant
stylemebri
Defendant
suiningaitufuzhuangdian
Defendant
sunlin1120
Defendant
szzas
Defendant
takelovehome
Defendant
tandzik9
Defendant
tdbsmarketplace
Defendant
teresbenedic5
Defendant
useeisell
Defendant
vmotorv
Defendant
vmxixhs300
Defendant
watchbandspot
Defendant
wedswty68
Defendant
wedswty998
Defendant
wenfindsmore
Defendant
wisithuru_product
Defendant
xovke
Defendant
xxlb
Defendant
yao07
Defendant
yolandlor-0
Defendant
you07
Defendant
youe
Defendant
yyi89578
Defendant
zaneo
Defendant
zhucai33
Defendant
zongtian
Plaintiff
Foreo Inc.
Represented By
Jason Scott Zack
Boies, Schiller & Flexner LLP
contact info
Rossana Baeza
Boies Schiller Flexner LLP
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
ArzariBeauty
Terminated: 02/16/2024
Defendant
BellesSecrets
Terminated: 02/07/2024
Defendant
Childlike Innocence
Terminated: 02/16/2024
Defendant
CkeyiN Official
Terminated: 02/16/2024
Defendant
Fun-Home-914
Terminated: 02/16/2024
Defendant
Good Choice
Terminated: 02/16/2024
Defendant
Good Day
Terminated: 02/02/2024
Defendant
JFieldsCo
Terminated: 02/13/2024
6107 Belcrest Street
Houston, TX 77033
Defendant
JT Home Store
Terminated: 02/02/2024
Defendant
Li HB Store
Terminated: 02/02/2024
Defendant
Moajaza
Terminated: 02/06/2024
Defendant
The Skin Shop
Terminated: 02/16/2024
Defendant
acost6169
Terminated: 02/09/2024
Defendant
actionhousebabes
Terminated: 12/27/2023
Defendant
altatac
Terminated: 02/14/2024
Defendant
anyvolume
Terminated: 01/19/2024
Defendant
artf.mo0
Terminated: 02/16/2024
Defendant
baboonia
Terminated: 12/18/2023
Defendant
bk18_shop
Terminated: 01/05/2024
Defendant
blondechick55
Terminated: 02/16/2024
Defendant
boygirlsnew-02
Terminated: 02/16/2024
Defendant
businessbezo
Terminated: 02/16/2024
Defendant
cnydeals315
Terminated: 02/16/2024
Defendant
curbsidrandom
Terminated: 02/16/2024
12609 Davan Drive
Silver Spring, MD 20904
Defendant
cyberoutlet14
Terminated: 02/16/2024
Defendant
deals4real-0
Terminated: 02/16/2024
Defendant
derel_57
Terminated: 02/16/2024
Defendant
dmcove27
Terminated: 02/16/2024
Defendant
eclipsefastpitch2
Terminated: 02/16/2024
Defendant
eufaulagirl
Terminated: 02/16/2024
Defendant
gladidavi2
Terminated: 02/16/2024
Defendant
gotogoodsllc
Terminated: 02/07/2024
Defendant
imud39
Terminated: 02/16/2024
Defendant
inthemeadow
Terminated: 02/16/2024
Defendant
jedigirl10
Terminated: 02/16/2024
Defendant
jemsbyjen
Terminated: 02/07/2024
Defendant
jkatang
Terminated: 02/16/2024
Defendant
jlmays84
Terminated: 02/16/2024
Defendant
kenn.johns
Terminated: 02/16/2024
Defendant
lovinglightcandles
Terminated: 02/16/2024
Defendant
mimocompr
Terminated: 02/16/2024
Defendant
nannyrocks120
Terminated: 02/16/2024
Defendant
oebristol
Terminated: 02/16/2024
Defendant
ottostore
Terminated: 02/16/2024
Defendant
outleth74
Terminated: 02/16/2024
Defendant
rodcogroup
Terminated: 02/16/2024
Defendant
shop_purple
Terminated: 02/16/2024
Defendant
shopcrownhouse
Terminated: 02/16/2024
Defendant
sita-ram (22)
Terminated: 02/16/2024
Defendant
storageauctionpirate
Terminated: 02/16/2024
Defendant
sunken_treasure
Terminated: 02/16/2024
250 Arbor Glen Drive Apt. 304
East Lansing, MI 48823
Defendant
taiyuanhuiguaisaish-0
Terminated: 02/16/2024
Defendant
theezay
Terminated: 03/01/2024
Defendant
thetajan
Terminated: 02/16/2024
Defendant
thisiskatherine
Terminated: 02/16/2024
Defendant
triciatre_4
Terminated: 02/16/2024
Defendant
unixskin
Terminated: 02/16/2024
1601 Valley View Dr
College Station, TX 77840
Defendant
vallimerick
Terminated: 02/16/2024
Defendant
waggcomputer
Terminated: 02/16/2024
Defendant
wallscloset04
Terminated: 02/16/2024
Defendant
yanksfan12345
Terminated: 02/16/2024
Defendant
zwgf
Terminated: 02/16/2024

GPO Nov 15 2023
e attached document for full details. (amb) Modified to Unseal per DE 43 on 12/11/2023 (amb).ORDER granting 6 Ex Parte Motion. VideoConference Hearing set for 11/27/2023 09:00 AM before Senior District Judge Robert N Scola Jr.. Responses due by 11/22/2023 Signed by Senior District Judge Robert N Scola, Jr on 11/14/2023. Se
GPO Nov 15 2023
ORDER granting 7 Ex Parte Motion. Signed by Senior District Judge Robert N Scola, Jr on 11/14/2023. See attached document for full details. (amb) Modified to Unseal per DE 43 on 12/11/2023 (amb).
GPO Dec 11 2023
ORDER Granting Application for Preliminary Injunction. The Court convened a hearing on December 11, 2023, at which only counsel for the Plaintiff was present and available to present evidence supporting the Application. The Defendants have not formally responded to the Application, nor made any filings in this case, or appeared in this matter either individually or through counsel. Because the Plaintiff has satisfied the requirements for the issuance of a preliminary injunction, the Court grants the Application for a preliminary injunction. (ECF No. 6). This Order shall remain in effect during the pendency of this action, or until further order of the Court. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 65(c), the Plaintiff shall maintain its previously posted bond in the amount of Ten Thousand Dollars and Zero Cents ($10,000.00), as payment of damages to which Defendants may be entitled for a wrongful injunction or restraint, during the pendency of this action, or until further Order of the Court. In the Courts discretion, the bond may be subject to increase should an application be made in the interest of justice. Signed by Senior Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 12/11/2023. See attached document for full details. (nan)
GPO Apr 15 2024
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 99 Plaintiff's MOTION for Default Judgment. Objections to R&R due by 4/22/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman on 4/15/2024. See attached document for full details. (cpa)
GPO May 14 2024
127] Report and Recommendations on 99 Motion for Default Judgment,,, filed by Foreo Inc., 127 Report and Recommendations. Certificate of Appealability: No Ruling. Final judgment is entered in favor of Plaintiff Foreo and against the Defaulting Defendants. The bond posted by Plaintiff in the amount of $10,000.00 is hereby ordered to be released by the Clerk. Signed by Senior Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 5/14/2024. See attached document for full details. ORDER ADOPTING MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 99 Motion for Default Judgment,,, filed by Foreo Inc., 127 Report and Recommendations ; granting in part and denying in part 99 Motion for Default Judgment ; Adopting [ (nan).

Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Friday, December 27, 2024
140 140 misc Satisfaction of Judgment Fri 12/27 12:00 PM
SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT re133 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations,,,, Order on Motion for Default Judgment,,,, Order on Report and Recommendations,,, as to Defendant No. 79 (Amazing China Products) by Foreo Inc. (Fundora, Nicole)
Related: [-]