Nebraska District Court
Case #: 8:23-cr-00195
Case Filed:Sep 19, 2023
Last checked: Friday Sep 22, 2023 3:35 AM CDT
Defendant
Kristin M. Uhing (1)
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
John E. Higgins
U.S. Attorney'S Office - Omaha
contact info

GPO Nov 07 2023
ORDER granting Defendant's UNOPPOSED MOTION to Extend Pretrial Motion Deadline14 as to Kristin M. Uhing. Pretrial Motion Deadline continued to 12/15/2023. The time between 11/6/2023 and 12/15/2023, shall be deemed excludable time in any computation of time under the requirement of the Speedy Trial Act. Failing to timely object to this order as provided under this court's local rules will be deemed a waiver of any right to later claim the time should not have been excluded under the Speedy Trial Act. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (JAB)
GPO Dec 18 2023
ORDER granting Defendant's UNOPPOSED MOTION to Extend Pretrial Motion Deadline16 as to Kristin M. Uhing. Pretrial Motion Deadline extended to January 19, 2024. The time between December 15, 2023 and January 19, 2024, shall be deemed excludable time in any computation of timeunder the requirement of the Speedy Trial Act. Failing to timely object to this order as provided under this court's local rules will be deemed a waiver of any right to later claim the time should not have been excluded under the Speedy Trial Act. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (JAB)
GPO Jan 22 2024
ORDER - Defendant's Unopposed Motion to Extend Pretrial Motion Deadline, (Filing No. 18), is granted as to Kristin M. Uhing. Pretrial motions shall be filed by February 16, 2024. In accordance with 18 U.S.C. § 3161(h)(7)(A), the Court finds that the ends of justice will be served by granting this motion and outweigh the interests of the public and the defendant in a speedy trial. Any additional time arising as a result of the granting of this motion, that is, the time between January 19, 2024 and February 16, 2024, shall be deemed excludable time in any computation of time under the requirement of the Speedy Trial Act. Failure to grant this motion would deny counsel the reasonable time necessary for effective preparation, taking into account the exercise of due diligence, and the novelty and complexity of the case. The failure to grant this motion might result in a miscarriage of justice. 18 U.S.C. § 3161(h)(7)(A) & (B). Failing to timely object to this order as provided under this court's local rules will be deemed a waiver of any right to later claim the time should not have been excluded under the Speedy Trial Act. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LKO)
GPO Feb 20 2024
ORDER granting 20 Motion to Extend as to Kristin M. Uhing (1). Pretrial motions shall be filed by March 1, 2024. The time between February 16, 2024, and March 1, 2024, shall be deemed excludable time in any computation of time under the requirement of the Speedy Trial Act. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (ADB)
GPO Mar 08 2024
ORDER granting 23 Motion to Continue Trial as to Kristin M. Uhing. Jury Trial continued to 6/3/2024 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 4, Roman L. Hruska Federal Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, NE before Chief Judge Robert F. Rossiter Jr. The time between today's date and the anticipated trial is excluded for purposes of computing the limits under the Speedy Trial Act. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (MLF)

Docket last updated: 09/22/2023 6:34 AM CDT
Tuesday, September 19, 2023
1 1 PART 1 OF 2 - INDICTMENT with foreperson's signature redacted pursuant to the E-Government Act as to defendant Kristin M. Uhing. (NMW)
Related: [-]
2 2 PART 2 OF 2 - FOREPERSON'S SIGNATURE PAGE regarding Indictment1 as to defendant Kristin M. Uhing. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CRIMINAL PROCEDURE 49.1(e). ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD IN MULTI-DEFENDANT CASES MAY ACCESS THIS DOCUMENT. (NMW)
Related: [-]
3 3 CRIMINAL COVER SHEET as to defendant Kristin M. Uhing. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CRIMINAL PROCEDURE 49.1(a). ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD IN MULTI-DEFENDANT CASES MAY ACCESS THIS DOCUMENT. (NMW)
Related: [-]
4 4 Summons Issued (COPY) as to defendant Kristin M. Uhing regarding ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CRIMINAL PROCEDURE 49.1(a). ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD IN MULTI-DEFENDANT CASES MAY ACCESS THIS DOCUMENT. Initial Appearance set for 10/17/2023 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 6 , Roman L. Hruska Federal Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, NE before Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (NMW)
Related: [-]