Oklahoma Western District Court
Case #: 5:23-cr-00393
Case Filed:Sep 19, 2023
Last checked: Friday Sep 22, 2023 3:35 AM CDT
Defendant
Jose Eduardo Gramajo Cifuentes (2)
Defendant
Juan Carlos Gramajo Cifuentes (1)
Represented By
R Scott Adams
Adams & Associates PC
contact info
Alexa Lynn Smart
Adams & Associates, P.C.
contact info
Gary W Wood
Riggs Abney Neal Turpen Orbison Lewis-Okc
contact info
Plaintiff
United States of America
Represented By
Travis Leverett
Doj-Usao
contact info


Docket last updated: 09/22/2023 5:51 AM CDT
Wednesday, May 03, 2023
1 1 SEALED COMPLAINT as to Jose Eduardo Gramajo Cifuentes (1), Juan Carlos Gramajo Cifuentes (2). (ac) [5:23-mj-00282-STE]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Criminal Cover Sheet JOSE EDUARDO GRAMAJO CIFUENTES,
Att: 2 Criminal Cover Sheet JUAN CARLOS GRAMAJO CIFUENTES
4 4 MOTION to Seal Case by United States of America as to Jose Eduardo Gramajo Cifuentes, Juan Carlos Gramajo Cifuentes. (ac) [5:23-mj-00282-STE]
Related: [-]
5 5 ORDER granting4 Motion to Seal Case as to Jose Eduardo Gramajo Cifuentes (1), Juan Carlos Gramajo Cifuentes (2). Signed by Magistrate Judge Shon T. Erwin on 5/3/2023. (ac) [5:23-mj-00282-STE]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 22, 2023
Case unsealed as to Jose Eduardo Gramajo Cifuentes, Juan Carlos Gramajo Cifuentes (rb) [5:23-mj-00282-STE]
Related: [-]
6 6 ** SEALED DOCUMENT ** CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Juan Carlos Gramajo Cifuentes (rb) [5:23-mj-00282-STE]
Related: [-]
7 7 ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL Gary W Wood for Juan Carlos Gramajo Cifuentes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amanda Maxfield Green on 8/22/2023. (rb) [5:23-mj-00282-STE]
Related: [-]
8 8 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Amanda Maxfield Green:Initial Appearance as to Juan Carlos Gramajo Cifuentes held on 8/22/2023. Detention Hearing set for 8/25/2023 11:15 AM in Courtroom 101 before Magistrate Judge Amanda Maxfield Green. Preliminary Hearing set for 8/25/2023 11:15 AM in Courtroom 101 before Magistrate Judge Amanda Maxfield Green. (rb) [5:23-mj-00282-STE]
Related: [-]
9 9 ORDER that Rita Lyons is appointed as interpreter for dft Juan Carlos Gramajo Cifuentes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amanda Maxfield Green on 8/22/2023. (rb) [5:23-mj-00282-STE]
Related: [-]
10 10 ORDER appointing out of court interpreter for dft Juan Carlos Gramajo Cifuentes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amanda Maxfield Green on 8/22/2023. (rb) [5:23-mj-00282-STE]
Related: [-]
11 11 WRITTEN OATH of Interpreter Rita Lyons as to dft Juan Carlos Gramajo Cifuentes (rb) [5:23-mj-00282-STE]
Related: [-]
12 12 ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION as to Juan Carlos Gramajo Cifuentes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amanda Maxfield Green on 8/22/2023. (rb) [5:23-mj-00282-STE]
Related: [-]
13 13 DPPA-ORDER as to Juan Carlos Gramajo Cifuentes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amanda Maxfield Green on 8/22/2023. (rb) [5:23-mj-00282-STE]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 23, 2023
14 14 NOTICE OF HEARING as to Juan Carlos Gramajo Cifuentes. Detention Hearing set for 8/25/2023 11:15 AM in Courtroom 101 before Magistrate Judge Amanda Maxfield Green. Preliminary Hearing set for 8/25/2023 11:15 AM in Courtroom 101 before Magistrate Judge Amanda Maxfield Green. (rb) [5:23-mj-00282-STE]
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 24, 2023
15 15 ENTRY OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Gary W Wood appearing for Juan Carlos Gramajo Cifuentes (Wood, Gary) [5:23-mj-00282-STE]
Related: [-]
Friday, August 25, 2023
17 17 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Amanda Maxfield Green:Preliminary Hearing as to Juan Carlos Gramajo Cifuentes held on 8/25/2023. Detention Hearing as to Juan Carlos Gramajo Cifuentes held on 8/25/2023. Defendant detained pending trial. (rb) [5:23-mj-00282-STE]
Related: [-]
18 18 ORDER OF DETENTION PENDING TRIAL as to Juan Carlos Gramajo Cifuentes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amanda Maxfield Green on 8/25/2023. (rb) [5:23-mj-00282-STE]
Related: [-]
Monday, September 11, 2023
19 19 ENTRY OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: R Scott Adams appearing for Juan Carlos Gramajo Cifuentes (Adams, R) [5:23-mj-00282-STE]
Related: [-]
20 20 ENTRY OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Alexa Lynn Smart appearing for Juan Carlos Gramajo Cifuentes (Smart, Alexa) [5:23-mj-00282-STE]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 19, 2023
21 21 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Gary W. Wood. by Juan Carlos Gramajo Cifuentes. (Wood, Gary) [5:23-mj-00282-STE]
Related: [-]
22 22 INDICTMENT as to Juan Carlos Gramajo Cifuentes (1) count(s) 1, and Criminal Forfeiture, Jose Eduardo Gramajo Cifuentes (2) count(s) 1, and Criminal Forfeiture. (kb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Criminal Cover Sheet 1 - Juan Carlos Gramajo Cifuentes,
Att: 2 Criminal Cover Sheet 2 - Jose Eduardo Gramajo Cifuentes